Case Last Refreshed: 13 hours ago
Guevara Pedro, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Chung Edward Hyun, Lipeles Kevin A, Schelly Thomas Henry, against La Casa Building Contractors Inc., Munoz And Dba La Casa Building Contractors Doe 1 Salvador Hernandez Dba La Casa Building Contractors, Munoz Doe 1 Salvador Hernandez Dba La Casa Building Contractors, represented by Klosk Michael J, Leone Fernando, Levine John, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Lia R. Martin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLia R. Martin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2020 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice of Ruling; Filed by: La Casa Building Contractors, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by: La Casa Building Contractors, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Declaration OF THOMAS H. SCHELLY; Filed by: Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Opposition to Def La Casa's MTQ Service of Summons; Filed by: Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Salvador Hernandez Munoz (Doe 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Motion to Quash; Filed by: Salvador Hernandez Munoz (Doe 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Motion to Quash; Filed by: La Casa Building Contractors, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by: La Casa Building Contractors, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: La Casa Building Contractors, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Salvador Hernandez Munoz (Doe 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by: Salvador Hernandez Munoz (Doe 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Court ORDER on Defendant Salvador Munoz’s Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-22T00:00:00Declaration THS Decl ISO PI's Opp to MTQ- Munoz; Filed by: Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: La Casa Building Contractors, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by: La Casa Building Contractors, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: La Casa Building Contractors, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-08T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-11-27T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by: La Casa Building Contractors, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: February 13, 2024Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by: La Casa Building Contractors, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2024-01-08T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff); As to: LA CASA BUILDING CONTRACTORS INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: La Casa Building Contractors, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by: Salvador Hernandez Munoz (Doe 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation; Filed by: Salvador Hernandez Munoz (Doe 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Order - Court's ORDER on Defendant Salvador Munoz?s Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Salvador Hernandez Munoz (Doe 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Motion to Quash; Filed by: La Casa Building Contractors, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-04-26T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration of THS ISO PI's Opp to Def's MTQ- La Casa; Filed by: Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: La Casa Building Contractors, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-04-03T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons Filed by La Cas...)
Date: 2023-04-05T00:00:00Objection to Declaration; Filed by: La Casa Building Contractors, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-04-26T00:00:00Opposition to Def Munoz's MTQ; Filed by: Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Motion to Quash; Filed by: La Casa Building Contractors, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Declaration of Tom ISO Opp; Filed by: Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: Salvador Hernandez Munoz (Doe 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2024-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-08T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by: La Casa Building Contractors, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Declaration ISO Mtn for Reconsideration; Filed by: Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-15T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons Filed by Defend...)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons Filed by Defend...)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Opposition Plaintiff's Opp to Def's MTQ; Filed by: Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-04-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-09-26T00:00:00Motion to Quash Publication; Filed by: Salvador Hernandez Munoz (Doe 1) (Defendant)
Date: February 13, 2024Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: La Casa Building Contractors, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2024-01-08T00:00:00Declaration of Thomas H. Schelly RE Def's MTQ; Filed by: Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-30T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons Filed by Defend...)
Date: 2023-04-04T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by: Salvador Hernandez Munoz (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Declaration ISO PI's Opp to Def's MTQ; Filed by: Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-04-20T00:00:00Court's Order on Defendant Salvador Munoz's Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-10-31T00:00:00Objection to Evidence; Filed by: La Casa Building Contractors, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-04-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration; Filed by: Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-15T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons Filed by Defend...)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Declaration (OF THOMAS H. SCHELLY IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH)
Date: June 06, 2022Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: December 04, 2020Complaint
Date: December 04, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 04, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: December 04, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: December 07, 2020Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: December 30, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: January 08, 2021Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: January 07, 2021Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: January 14, 2021Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: February 24, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: January 10, 2022Substitution of Attorney
Date: January 20, 2022Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 08, 2022Notice - NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE AND PROOFS OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: March 18, 2022Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: April 01, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: April 11, 2022Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: April 11, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: April 14, 2022Unknown - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: April 27, 2022Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 06, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF THOMAS H. SCHELLY IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Declaration - DECLARATION THS DECL ISO PI'S OPP TO MTQ- MUNOZ
Date: June 09, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA
Date: June 09, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEF MUNOZ'S MTQ
Date: June 09, 2022Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 09, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; ...)
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation
Date: June 20, 2022Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION TO QUASH
Date: June 28, 2022Substitution of Attorney
Date: August 11, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: August 15, 2022Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: October 04, 2022Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: November 08, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 08, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE OF D...)
Date: February 08, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF CONT. CMC AND OSC
Date: March 29, 2023Notice - NOTICE ERRATA TO NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION
Date: March 30, 2023Reply - REPLY NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION
Date: March 30, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION OF THOMAS H. SCHELLY RE DEF'S MTQ
Date: March 30, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH
Date: March 30, 2023Notice of Limited Scope Representation
Date: April 03, 2023Substitution of Attorney
Date: April 03, 2023Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2023-04-06T00:00:00Motion to Quash - MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT
Date: April 06, 2023Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: April 11, 2023Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: April 18, 2023Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPP TO DEF'S MTQ
Date: April 20, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION ISO PI'S OPP TO DEF'S MTQ
Date: April 20, 2023Objection - OBJECTION TO EVIDENCE
Date: April 26, 2023Objection - OBJECTION TO DECLARATION
Date: April 26, 2023Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH
Date: April 26, 2023in Department 16
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00in Department 16
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00in Department 16
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00in Department 16
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00in Department 16
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00in Department 16
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00in Department 16
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Opposition (to Def La Casa's MTQ Service of Summons) Filed by Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons Filed by La Casa Building Contractors, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons Filed by Defend...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons Filed by Defend...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons Filed by Defend...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons Filed by La Casa Building Contractors, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Quash) Filed by La Casa Building Contractors, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Order (- Court's ORDER on Defendant Salvador Munoz?s Motion to Quash Service of Summons) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by La Casa Building Contractors, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Declaration (OF THOMAS H. SCHELLY) Filed by Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion to Quash Servic...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) Filed by Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) Filed by Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference) Filed by Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Tom ISO Opp) Filed by Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) Filed by Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint; ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons Filed by La Casa Building Contractors, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by La Casa Building Contractors, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Quash) Filed by La Casa Building Contractors, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service of D...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by La Casa Building Contractors, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint; ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Court ORDER on Defendant Salvador Munoz?s Motion to Quash Service of Summons Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-22T00:00:00Notice (of Errata) Filed by Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint; ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by La Casa Building Contractors, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons Filed by La Casa Building Contractors, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (of THS ISO PI's Opp to Def's MTQ- La Casa) Filed by Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint; ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by La Casa Building Contractors, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00Declaration (THS Decl ISO PI's Opp to MTQ- Munoz) Filed by Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: continuance of Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service of D...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-08T00:00:00Opposition (to Def Munoz's MTQ) Filed by Pedro Guevara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: May 13, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: June 02, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: June 16, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: June 16, 2021Notice of Limited Scope Representation
Date: June 29, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: June 29, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: June 30, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 06, 2021Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH
Date: August 16, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: August 05, 2021Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: August 23, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH SERVIC...)
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: September 08, 2021Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: September 15, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 15, 2021Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: September 22, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: October 25, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: November 08, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: November 10, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEF LA CASA'S MTQ SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: December 21, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 21, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEF SALVADOR'S MTQ SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Declaration - DECLARATION OF THOMAS H. SCHELLY
Date: December 21, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF TOM ISO OPP
Date: December 21, 2021Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH
Date: December 28, 2021Notice of Limited Scope Representation
Date: January 06, 2022in Department 16, Lia Martin, Presiding
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons Filed by Defend...))
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00in Department 16, Lia Martin, Presiding
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Order (- Court's ORDER on Defendant Salvador Munoz?s Motion to Quash Service of Summons)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00in Department 16, Lia Martin, Presiding
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Notice (OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS)
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons Filed by Defend...))
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion to Quash Servic...))
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Quash)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Amended Proof of Service for Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons Filed by Defend...))
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE)
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Order (- Court's ORDER on Defendant Salvador Hernandez Munoz?s Motion to Quash Service of Summons)
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Quash)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00in Department 16, Lia Martin, Presiding
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Opposition (to Def Munoz's MTQ)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: continuance of Case Management Conference) of )
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Quash)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Tom ISO Opp)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Declaration (THS Decl ISO PI's Opp to MTQ- Munoz)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Opposition (to Def La Casa's MTQ Service of Summons)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Special Appearance Reply of Salvador Munoz to Opposition to Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Notice (of Errata)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint; ...))
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Declaration (OF THOMAS H. SCHELLY)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Notice (AMENDED NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE AND PROOFS OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS)
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Def Salvador's MTQ Service of Summons)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint; ...))
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: continuance of Case Management Conference))
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00in Department 16, Lia Martin, Presiding
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Objection (EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF THOMAS H. SCHELLY, ESQ.)
Date: 2022-06-13T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (of THS ISO PI's Opp to Def's MTQ- La Casa)
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE)
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons Filed by Defend...))
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons Filed by Defend...))
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Notice (OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS)
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Order (- Court's ORDER on Defendant Salvador Munoz?s Motion to Quash Service of Summons)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Quash)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Quash)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Declaration (OF THOMAS H. SCHELLY)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint; ...))
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Order (- Court's ORDER on Defendant Salvador Hernandez Munoz?s Motion to Quash Service of Summons)
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Opposition (to Def La Casa's MTQ Service of Summons)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Quash)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Def Salvador's MTQ Service of Summons)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons Filed by Defend...))
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion to Quash Servic...))
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Declaration (of Tom ISO Opp)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint; ...))
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Notice (AMENDED NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE AND PROOFS OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS)
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.