Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hsieh Xxxxxx, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Lin Hans, against Tang Ying Tai, represented by Oakley Randal Scott, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Serena R. Murillo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSerena R. Murillo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 09, 2020 |
CategoryIntentional Bodily Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (E.G., Assault, Battery, Vandalism, Etc.) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Complaint; Filed by: xxxxxx Hsieh (Plaintiff); As to: Ying Tai Tang (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: xxxxxx Hsieh (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Ying Tai Tang (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: xxxxxx Hsieh (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: xxxxxx Hsieh (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: xxxxxx Hsieh (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Ying Tai Tang (Defendant); As to: xxxxxx Hsieh (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Ruling on Submitted Matter (Non-Jury Trial); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-23T00:00:00Election to Forgo Affidavit (CCP 170.6); Filed by: xxxxxx Hsieh (Plaintiff); Ying Tai Tang (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: xxxxxx Hsieh (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00Declaration in support of motion to seal; Filed by: xxxxxx Hsieh (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-23T00:00:00Declaration Hans Lin; Filed by: xxxxxx Hsieh (Plaintiff)
Date: April 11, 2023Trial Transfer Order as to Judge Uzcategui, Van Nuys Dept. Q, OTR forthwith (in person); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: xxxxxx Hsieh (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: xxxxxx Hsieh (Plaintiff); As to: Ying Tai Tang (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Plaintiff's List of Exhibits; Filed by: xxxxxx Hsieh (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: xxxxxx Hsieh (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Motion to Seal documents; Filed by: xxxxxx Hsieh (Plaintiff)
Date: April 11, 2023Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: xxxxxx Hsieh (Plaintiff); As to: Ying Tai Tang (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: xxxxxx Hsieh (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of , Ruling on Submitted Matter; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-23T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st); Filed by: xxxxxx Hsieh (Plaintiff); As to: Ying Tai Tang (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-23T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: xxxxxx Hsieh (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-23T00:00:00Motion to Seal Documents; Filed by: xxxxxx Hsieh (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-23T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: November 09, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 09, 2020Complaint
Date: November 09, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: November 09, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 16, 2020PI General Order
Date: December 08, 2020Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: December 21, 2020Answer - ANSWER AMENDED ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: January 27, 2021Answer
Date: January 22, 2021Notice of Change of Firm Name - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND ADDRESS
Date: February 28, 2022Statement of the Case
Date: April 20, 2022Witness List
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: April 20, 2022Exhibit List - PLAINTIFF'S LIST OF EXHIBITS
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: April 25, 2022Exhibit List
Date: May 02, 2022Trial Brief
Date: May 02, 2022Statement of the Case
Date: May 02, 2022Witness List
Date: May 02, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; NON-JURY TRIAL)
Date: May 05, 2022Witness List
Date: May 23, 2022Exhibit List
Date: May 23, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; NON-JURY TRIAL)
Date: June 01, 2022Affidavit - ELECTION TO FORGO AFFIDAVIT (CCP 170.6)
Date: June 01, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)
Date: June 02, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: June 23, 2022Judgment
Date: June 23, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: June 23, 2022Notice of Ruling - RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER (NON-JURY TRIAL)
Date: June 23, 2022Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: July 05, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO SEAL
Date: March 23, 2023Motion to Seal - MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENTS
Date: March 23, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER TO SEAL DOCUMENTS)
Date: April 04, 2023Motion to Seal - MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENTS
Date: April 11, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION HANS LIN
Date: April 11, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Plaintiff's List of Exhibits
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Non-Jury Trial))
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Answer (AMENDED ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Election to Forgo Affidavit (CCP 170.6)
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial))
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Non-Jury Trial))
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name (Notice of Change of Firm Name and Address)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.