Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Amos Financial Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Weber Edward T., against 1 Through 25 Inclusive Does, Keybank National Association A Corporation, Morales Fernando, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. As Nominee For Quicken Loans Inc. Its Successors And Assigns, Pope Lawrence E. Sr., (total of 7) See All represented by Abbott Thomas Nathaniel, Pittaluga Stephanie Anne, Steele John Christopher, Ching Eric, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Armen Tamzarian presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 22, 2020 |
CategoryOther Real Property (Not Eminent Domain, Landlord/Tenant, Foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice Notice of Case Reassignment; Filed by: Amos Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Lawrence E. Pope, Sr. (Defendant); Nicole E. Pope (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Amos Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Amos Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Notice of Non Entry of Default; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Amos Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Disclaimer OF INTEREST; Filed by: Keybank National Association, a corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Order Trial Preparation; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Notice of Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Fernando Morales (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Order Trial Preparation]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Opposition TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; Filed by: Fernando Morales (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Amos Financial, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 22, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 22, 2020Complaint
Date: October 22, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 22, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 28, 2020Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: October 28, 2020RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL RE: NTC OF OSC RE PROOF OF SERVCIE AND NTC OF CMC
Date: November 18, 2020Notice of Appearance
Date: December 08, 2020Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: January 06, 2021Disclaimer - DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST
Date: December 23, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 14, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: January 14, 2021Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: January 14, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: January 14, 2021Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: January 14, 2021Answer
Date: January 15, 2021Answer
Date: January 25, 2021Application for Publication
Date: January 26, 2021Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing
Date: February 01, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: February 03, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: February 16, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: February 11, 2021Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: February 16, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: February 16, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: March 01, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 04, 2021Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: March 04, 2021Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 04, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: April 23, 2021Notice of Rejection - Miscellaneous Judgments - NOTICE OF NON ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Date: April 26, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: May 14, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: May 07, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)
Date: June 08, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED OSC RE. DISMISSAL
Date: September 21, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: June 08, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: September 21, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: December 16, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: December 16, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 11, 2022Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: January 20, 2022Notice of Motion
Date: January 20, 2022Proof of Service by Mail
Date: January 20, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: January 20, 2022Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARINGS
Date: January 26, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER TRIAL PREPARATION]
Date: January 26, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: January 26, 2022Order - ORDER TRIAL PREPARATION
Date: January 26, 2022Answer
Date: January 31, 2022Unknown - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: February 01, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)
Date: February 16, 2022Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 16, 2022Disclaimer - DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 10, 2022Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: February 16, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING (CMC & OSC RE. POS/DEFAULTS)
Date: October 10, 2022Motion to Enforce Settlement
Date: October 21, 2022Proof of Service by Mail
Date: October 24, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT
Date: November 15, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: November 18, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF EDWARD T. WEBER IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE. FAILURE TO FILE POS
Date: November 18, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT)
Date: December 01, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: February 09, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL (re: ntc of osc re proof of servcie and ntc of cmc)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Disclaimer (OF INTEREST)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Application for Publication
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation for Leave to File First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Order for Publication (for Fernando)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (NOTICE OF RULING AND OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Answer (TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Non Entry of Default
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Hearing)
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Settlement))
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUED OSC RE. DISMISSAL)
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Notice of Settlement) of 06/08/2021)
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Order (Trial Preparation)
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Hearings)
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Order Trial Preparation])
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Disclaimer (OF INTEREST TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation for Leave to File First Amended Complaint; Order Thereon)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.