Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Nash John, Nash Michael, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Clark William, against Williams Rosie, represented by Murphy Brandon C., Murphy Brandon Charles, Royston Gregory Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Colin P. Leis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeColin P. Leis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2020 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Declaration of Notice; Filed by: Michael Nash (Plaintiff); As to: Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Opposition TO MOTION FOR SANCTIONS; Filed by: Michael Nash (Plaintiff); John Nash (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Michael Nash (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Continuance of Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: Michael Nash (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Order Defendant's motion to Dismiss; Signed and Filed by: Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-28T00:00:00Reply Defendant's Reply to Opposition to Motion for Sanctions; Filed by: Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-11T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Court
Date: 2023-03-06T00:00:00Updated -- Motion to Dismiss: Filed By: Rosie Williams (Defendant); Result: Denied ; Result Date:
Date: 2023-02-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: March 28, 2022Substitution of Attorney
Date: March 28, 2022Declaration of Notice
Date: March 28, 2022Motion for Sanctions
Date: May 20, 2022Proof of Service by Mail
Date: May 23, 2022Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens
Date: June 03, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SANCTIONS
Date: July 05, 2022Notice - NOTICE COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SANCTIONS
Date: July 05, 2022Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SANCTIONS
Date: July 11, 2022Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: July 18, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: July 19, 2022Motion to Dismiss
Date: July 26, 2022Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING EXPUNGEMENT OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION
Date: September 29, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: January 20, 2023Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/20/2023
Date: January 20, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: February 24, 2023Notice of Ruling
Date: February 27, 2023Order - ORDER DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: February 28, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS; FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: February 28, 2023Order - Dismissal
Date: March 06, 2023Notice of OSC - NOTICE OF OSC (NAME EXTENSION) DISMISSAL HEARING
Date: April 03, 2023Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss; Filed by: Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter; Signed and Filed by:
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Notice of Recordation of Lis Pendens; Filed by: Michael Nash (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: John Nash (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Declaration of Notice; Filed by: Michael Nash (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Michael Nash (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00On the Complaint filed by Michael Nash, et al. on , Default entered on , Vacated - .
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Filing Proof of Service; Filed by: Michael Nash (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2023-02-27T00:00:00Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens; Filed by: Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions; Filed by: Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Opposition to demurrer of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint; Filed by: Michael Nash (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Michael Nash (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens; Filed by: Michael Nash (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Default entered as to Rosie Williams; On the Complaint filed by Michael Nash, et al. on
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Michael Nash (Plaintiff); John Nash (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Default Prove Up Hearing; Hearing on Motion for Protective Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: entry of default)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Notice (of Filing Proof of Service) Filed by Michael Nash (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Michael Nash (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Michael Nash (Plaintiff); John Nash (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order Filed by Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Motion for Protective Order) Filed by Michael Nash (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Michael Nash (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Michael Nash (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service As T...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Default Prove Up Hearing)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Michael Nash (Plaintiff); John Nash (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens Filed by Michael Nash (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: entry of default judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Michael Nash (Plaintiff); John Nash (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Notice (of Recordation of Lis Pendens) Filed by Michael Nash (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens Filed by Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Order Granting Expungement of Notice of Pendency of Action Filed by Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-20T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens by Defendant Rosie W...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Opposition (to demurrer of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint) Filed by Michael Nash (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) Filed by Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by John Nash (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions by Defendant Rosie Williams a...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re dismissal of unserved/unnamed D...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss Filed by Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Michael Nash (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Michael Nash (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Opposition (TO MOTION FOR SANCTIONS) Filed by Michael Nash (Plaintiff); John Nash (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Michael Nash (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-20T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment Filed by Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to File...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) Filed by Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Declaration of Notice Filed by Michael Nash (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Reply (Defendant's Reply to Opposition to Motion for Sanctions) Filed by Rosie Williams (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-11T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by Michael Nash (Plaintiff); John Nash (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time on ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Declaration of Notice Filed by Michael Nash (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: entry of default))
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service As T...))
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Opposition (to demurrer of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Notice (of Recordation of Lis Pendens)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY REGARDING IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY REGARDING Meet and confer)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF ',S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT AND/OR DEFAULT JUDGMENT;)
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Default Prove Up Hearing; Hearing on Motion for Protective Order))
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Notice (of Filing Proof of Service)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: entry of default judgment))
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Declaration of Notice
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...))
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to File Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...) of )
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Default Prove Up Hearing))
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time on ...))
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Declaration of Notice
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...))
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Complaint)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Order Shortening Time on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Reply (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT AND/OR DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFFS, OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SIRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Extension of Time to File Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Demurrer to Plaintiffs' Complaint)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to File...))
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Notice (of Recordation of Lis Pendens)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service As T...))
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Notice (of Filing Proof of Service)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY REGARDING Meet and confer)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY REGARDING IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: entry of default))
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF ',S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT AND/OR DEFAULT JUDGMENT;)
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Default Prove Up Hearing))
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: entry of default judgment))
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Default Prove Up Hearing; Hearing on Motion for Protective Order))
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...))
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Reply (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT AND/OR DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Demurrer to Plaintiffs' Complaint)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Extension of Time to File Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...))
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFFS, OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SIRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Complaint)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Opposition (to demurrer of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.