Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MOHSEN FERDOSI VS SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS, INC.
On August 20, 2020 an other personal injury/property damage/wrongful death (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge William A. Crowfoot presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 20, 2020
Last Refreshed
October 17, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk
Category
Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Personal Injury
Status
Voluntary Dismissal
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Overview
Causes of Action
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department U, Bernie C. LaForteza, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Bernie C. LaForteza |
|
August 17, 2023 | hearing |
Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal |
|
February 17, 2022 | hearing |
Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Non-Jury Trial Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department U, Bernie C. LaForteza, Presiding Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Bernie C. LaForteza |
|
February 03, 2022 | hearing |
Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Final Status Conference Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department U, Bernie C. LaForteza, Presiding Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Bernie C. LaForteza |
|
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department U, Bernie C. LaForteza, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Bernie C. LaForteza |
|
June 03, 2021 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | On the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Mohsen Ferdosi on , entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Mohsen Ferdosi as to the entire action |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department U, Bernie C. LaForteza, Presiding Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: Bernie C. LaForteza |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department U, Bernie C. LaForteza, Presiding Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Judge: Bernie C. LaForteza |
|
May 26, 2021 | hearing | Case Management Conference scheduled for in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
May 26, 2021 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk |
|
May 26, 2021 | Notice of Settlement | ||
May 18, 2021 | hearing | Pursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department U, Bernie C. LaForteza, Presiding Case Management Conference - Held - Continued Case Management Conference - Held - Continued Judge: Bernie C. LaForteza |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Mohsen Ferdosi (Plaintiff) |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Case Management Conference) | |
April 07, 2021 | hearing | Case Management Conference scheduled for in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
April 07, 2021 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) | ||
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: Mohsen Ferdosi (Cross-Defendant) |
|
March 22, 2021 | Case Management Statement | ||
March 22, 2021 | hearing |
Case Management Statement Filed by Mohsen Ferdosi (Cross-Defendant) |
|
March 19, 2021 | hearing | Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Mohsen Ferdosi (Cross-Defendant) |
|
March 19, 2021 | Substitution of Attorney | ||
March 19, 2021 | hearing |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Mohsen Ferdosi (Cross-Defendant) |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Mohsen Ferdosi (Plaintiff) |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration of Counsel in Support of Demurrer; Filed by: Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
March 18, 2021 | Demurrer - without Motion to Strike | ||
March 18, 2021 | Declaration - DECLARATION OF COUNSEL IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER | ||
March 18, 2021 | Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) | ||
March 18, 2021 | Memorandum of Points & Authorities | ||
March 18, 2021 | hearing |
Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
March 18, 2021 | hearing |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
March 18, 2021 | hearing |
Declaration (of Counsel in Support of Demurrer) Filed by Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
March 18, 2021 | hearing |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Address for Thomas Patrick Long (Attorney) updated | |
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Association of Attorney; Filed by: Mohsen Ferdosi (Cross-Defendant) |
|
March 16, 2021 | Association of Attorney | ||
March 16, 2021 | hearing |
Association of Attorney Filed by Mohsen Ferdosi (Cross-Defendant) |
|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: Mohsen Ferdosi (Plaintiff) |
|
March 15, 2021 | Case Management Statement | ||
March 15, 2021 | hearing |
Case Management Statement Filed by Mohsen Ferdosi (Plaintiff) |
|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint (1st); Filed by: Mohsen Ferdosi (Plaintiff); As to: Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
February 16, 2021 | Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST) | ||
February 16, 2021 | hearing |
Amended Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by Mohsen Ferdosi (Plaintiff) |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department U - Hon. Bernie C. LaFortezaeffective ; Reason: Inventory Transfer | |
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Mohsen Ferdosi (Plaintiff) |
|
February 04, 2021 | Notice of Ruling | ||
February 04, 2021 | hearing |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Mohsen Ferdosi (Plaintiff) |
|
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
February 02, 2021 | Notice of Ruling | ||
February 02, 2021 | hearing |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
January 29, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | Case Number: 20STCV31803 Hearing Date: January 29, 2021 Dept: U 1. Plaintiff has not pled facts that support a special relationship that would require Defendant to make any specific disclosures about ... | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - without Mot...) | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Jane Hong-Elsey #11975; Filed by: Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Demurrer - without Motion to Strike: Filed By: Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Defendant); Result: Sustained with Leave to Amend; Result Date: |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department U, Bernie C. LaForteza, Presiding Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Held Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Held Judge: Bernie C. LaForteza |
|
January 29, 2021 | hearing | Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
January 29, 2021 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department U, Bernie C. LaForteza, Presiding Case Management Conference - Held - Continued Case Management Conference - Held - Continued Judge: Bernie C. LaForteza |
|
January 29, 2021 | Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice | ||
January 29, 2021 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOT...) | ||
January 29, 2021 | Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE JANE HONG-ELSEY #11975 | ||
January 29, 2021 | hearing |
Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401 Case Management Conference |
|
January 29, 2021 | hearing |
Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401 Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike |
|
January 29, 2021 | hearing |
Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Jane Hong-Elsey #11975) Filed by Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department U, Bernie C\. LaForteza, Presiding Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Held Judge: Bernie C. LaForteza |
|
January 29, 2021 | hearing |
Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - without Mot...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
January 29, 2021 | hearing |
Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department U, Bernie C\. LaForteza, Presiding Case Management Conference - Held - Continued Judge: Bernie C. LaForteza |
|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
January 08, 2021 | Case Management Statement | ||
January 08, 2021 | Notice of Posting of Jury Fees | ||
January 08, 2021 | hearing |
Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
January 08, 2021 | hearing |
Case Management Statement Filed by Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: Mohsen Ferdosi (Plaintiff) |
|
January 07, 2021 | hearing |
Case Management Statement Filed by Mohsen Ferdosi (Plaintiff) |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: Mohsen Ferdosi (Cross-Defendant) |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Mohsen Ferdosi (Cross-Defendant) |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer; Filed by: Mohsen Ferdosi (Cross-Defendant) |
|
January 04, 2021 | Notice of Posting of Jury Fees | ||
January 04, 2021 | Answer | ||
January 04, 2021 | hearing |
Case Management Statement Filed by Mohsen Ferdosi (Cross-Defendant) |
|
January 04, 2021 | hearing |
Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Mohsen Ferdosi (Cross-Defendant) |
|
January 04, 2021 | hearing |
Answer Filed by Mohsen Ferdosi (Cross-Defendant) |
|
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Disassociation of Attorney; Filed by: Mohsen Ferdosi (Plaintiff) |
|
December 30, 2020 | Disassociation of Attorney | ||
December 30, 2020 | hearing |
Disassociation of Attorney Filed by Mohsen Ferdosi (Plaintiff) |
|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Amended Notice of Demurrer by Schneider National Carriers, Inc. Filed by: Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Mohsen Ferdosi (Plaintiff) |
|
December 14, 2020 | hearing | Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U | |
December 14, 2020 | Notice - NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF DEMURRER BY SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS, INC. | ||
December 14, 2020 | hearing |
Notice (Amended Notice of Demurrer by Schneider National Carriers, Inc.) Filed by Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
December 08, 2020 | hearing | Case Management Conference scheduled for in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Reassignment to Independent Calendar Court) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated -- Non-Jury Trial: Location changed from Department W to Department U | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department U - Hon. Theresa M. Traber; Reason: Deemed PI Complicated | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk |
|
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated -- Final Status Conference: Location changed from Department W to Department U | |
December 08, 2020 | hearing | Final Status Conference scheduled for in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
December 08, 2020 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated -- Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal: Location changed from Department W to Department U | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Court Order Reassignment to Independent Calendar Court) | |
December 08, 2020 | hearing | Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding Court Order Court Order Judge: Virginia Keeny |
|
December 08, 2020 | Notice of Case Management Conference | ||
December 08, 2020 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REASSIGNMENT TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) | ||
December 08, 2020 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REASSIGNMENT TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 12/08/2020 | ||
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding Court Order Judge: Virginia Keeny |
|
December 08, 2020 | hearing |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
December 08, 2020 | hearing |
Minute Order ( (Court Order Reassignment to Independent Calendar Court)) Filed by Clerk |
|
December 08, 2020 | hearing |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Reassignment to Independent Calendar Court) of 12/08/2020) Filed by Clerk |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Updated -- Final Status Conference: Location changed from Department 27 to Department W
Judge: Edward B. Moreton, Jr. |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Updated -- Non-Jury Trial: Location changed from Department 27 to Department W
Judge: Edward B. Moreton, Jr. |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Updated -- Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal: Location changed from Department 27 to Department W
Judge: Edward B. Moreton, Jr. |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Transfer of Case as PI Complicated) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Court Order Re: Transfer of Case as PI Complicated) | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | The case is placed in special status of: Deemed PI Complicated | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department W - Hon. Virginia Keeny; Reason: Deemed PI Complicated | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Jr., Presiding Court Order Court Order Judge: Edward B. Moreton Jr. |
|
December 03, 2020 | hearing |
Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Transfer of Case as PI Complicated)) Filed by Clerk |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 27, Edward B\. Moreton, Presiding Court Order Judge: Edward B. Moreton |
|
December 03, 2020 | hearing |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Transfer of Case as PI Complicated) of 12/03/2020) Filed by Clerk |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Jr., Presiding Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court Judge: Edward B. Moreton Jr. |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 27, Edward B\. Moreton, Presiding Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court Judge: Edward B. Moreton |
|
November 30, 2020 | hearing |
Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on
Judge: Edward B. Moreton, Jr. |
|
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Reply Reply In Support of Demurrer by Schneider National Carriers, Inc. Filed by: Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
November 20, 2020 | Reply - REPLY REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER BY SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS, INC. | ||
November 20, 2020 | hearing |
Reply (Reply In Support of Demurrer by Schneider National Carriers, Inc.) Filed by Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint; Filed by: Mohsen Ferdosi (Plaintiff) |
|
November 13, 2020 | Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT | ||
November 13, 2020 | hearing |
Opposition (to Defendant's Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint) Filed by Mohsen Ferdosi (Plaintiff) |
|
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Cross-Complaint; Filed by: Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Mohsen Ferdosi (Plaintiff) |
|
October 16, 2020 | hearing | Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 | |
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
October 16, 2020 | Cross-Complaint | ||
October 16, 2020 | hearing |
Cross-Complaint Filed by Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
October 16, 2020 | hearing |
Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date; Filed by: Clerk |
|
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event | PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk |
|
September 01, 2020 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE | ||
September 01, 2020 | hearing |
PI General Order Filed by Clerk |
|
September 01, 2020 | hearing |
Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date) Filed by Clerk |
|
August 21, 2020 | hearing | Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 | |
August 21, 2020 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 | |
August 21, 2020 | hearing | Final Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 | |
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Hon. Edward B. Moreton in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse | |
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint; Filed by: Mohsen Ferdosi (Plaintiff); As to: Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk |
|
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mohsen Ferdosi (Plaintiff); As to: Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Mohsen Ferdosi (Plaintiff); As to: Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
August 20, 2020 | Complaint | ||
August 20, 2020 | Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT | ||
August 20, 2020 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
August 20, 2020 | hearing |
Complaint Filed by Mohsen Ferdosi (Plaintiff) |
|
August 20, 2020 | hearing |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Mohsen Ferdosi (Plaintiff) |
|
August 20, 2020 | hearing |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk |
|
August 20, 2020 | hearing |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Mohsen Ferdosi (Plaintiff) |
|