Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
A-One Commercial Insurance Risk Retention Group Inc., Arboleda Alain Montoya, Le Michael, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Pecora Robert Joseph Esq., Pennington Walt, Pennington Walter Allen Esq., against A-One Commercial Insurance Risk Retention Group Inc., Arboleda Alain Montoya, United Clean Trucks Inc., represented by Bergsten Robert Troy Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Serena R. Murillo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSerena R. Murillo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 27, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Default entered as to United Clean Trucks, Inc. On the Complaint filed by Michael Le on
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Filed by: Michael Le (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Alain Montoya Arboleda (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Michael Le (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Alain Montoya Arboleda (Defendant); As to: Michael Le (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Michael Le (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Declaration of Walt Pennington; Filed by: Michael Le (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Declaration of Walt Pennington; Filed by: Michael Le (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Reply to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Filed by: Michael Le (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Final Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 24, 2022Declaration of Walt Pennington; Filed by: Michael Le (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Walt Pennington; Filed by: Michael Le (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Michael Le (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Opposition to Motion on the Pleadings; Filed by: Alain Montoya Arboleda (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Michael Le (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Walt Pennington; Filed by: Michael Le (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Complaint
Date: July 27, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: July 27, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 31, 2020PI General Order
Date: August 10, 2020Answer
Date: September 18, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: September 22, 2020Answer
Date: September 29, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF WALT PENNINGTON
Date: October 01, 2020Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: October 09, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: October 09, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF WALT PENNINGTON
Date: October 09, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: October 26, 2020Answer
Date: October 26, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: October 26, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF WALT PENNINGTON
Date: October 30, 2020Reply - REPLY TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: October 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS RELATED TO DE...)
Date: November 06, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: November 09, 2020Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: December 15, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF WALT PENNINGTON
Date: December 15, 2020Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: December 16, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF WALT PENNINGTON
Date: December 16, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: January 05, 2021Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: January 05, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: May 26, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: January 29, 2021Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - NOT ENTERED
Date: December 28, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: January 10, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: January 19, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-JURY TRIAL) OF 01/24/2022
Date: January 24, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)
Date: January 24, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Reply (to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion on the Pleadings)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Declaration (of Walt Pennington)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Related to De...))
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Intervene in Action on Behalf of United Clean Trucks, Inc.)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Walt Pennington)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Declaration (of Walt Pennington)
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date)
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Walt Pennington)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00First Amended Answer To Complaint; Request for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Declaration (of Walt Pennington)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene On Behalf of United ...))
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (- Not Entered)
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Final Status Conference) of 01/10/2022)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.