Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Parzivand Daniel M., Zelener Ilana, Zelener Jacqueline, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Tokar Paul, against All Persons Unknown Claiming Any Legal Or Equitable Right Title Estate Lien Or Interest..., All Persons Unknown Claiming Any Legal Or Equitable Right Title Estate Lien Or Interest In The Property Described In The Complaint, Parzivand Daniel M., Parzivand Jacqueline, represented by Kent Terry, Youngman Lauren Olivia, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Gail Killefer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGail Killefer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 14, 2020 |
CategoryOther Real Property (Not Eminent Domain, Landlord/Tenant, Foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: September 08, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: March 11, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: March 21, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 21, 2022Separate Statement
Date: March 21, 2022Objection - OBJECTION TO EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: March 21, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF TERRY J. KENT OPPOSING MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: March 21, 2022Objection - OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S NEW EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN REPLY
Date: March 30, 2022Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY AJUDICATION
Date: March 30, 2022Request for Judicial Notice - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE SUPPLEMENTAL
Date: March 30, 2022Separate Statement
Date: March 30, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: April 04, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION)
Date: April 04, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: April 15, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: April 29, 2022Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE
Date: April 29, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: May 02, 2022Judgment
Date: May 03, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: May 03, 2022Complaint in Intervention
Date: May 03, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 03, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT
Date: May 16, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF TERRY J. KENT IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER
Date: May 27, 2022Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: May 27, 2022Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: May 27, 2022Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: June 08, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: June 27, 2022Objection - OBJECTION TO EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION
Date: July 01, 2022Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: July 01, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: July 01, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: July 11, 2022Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: July 28, 2022Order
Date: August 02, 2022Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: August 09, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: August 29, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: September 08, 2022Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: September 08, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 08, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/13/2022
Date: September 13, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: September 13, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE
Date: September 20, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION
Date: October 06, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION
Date: October 06, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: October 06, 2022Informal Discovery Conference - JOINT INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE BRIEF
Date: October 07, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: October 11, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR FEES
Date: October 11, 2022Objection - OBJECTION TO EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION
Date: October 11, 2022Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION
Date: October 11, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF TERRY J. KENT IN OPPOSITION
Date: October 11, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA
Date: October 14, 2022Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: October 14, 2022Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: October 17, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: October 17, 2022Reply - REPLY TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Date: October 18, 2022Order - RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES
Date: October 25, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES)
Date: October 25, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: October 28, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF TERRY J. KENT IN SUPPORT OF FEES MOTION
Date: October 31, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: October 31, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: October 31, 2022Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: October 31, 2022Order - ORDER RE MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS
Date: November 15, 2022Unknown - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER (EFILING)
Date: November 15, 2022Complaint in Intervention
Date: November 17, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: January 26, 2023Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO RETAIN 664.6 JURISDICTION
Date: January 27, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: January 27, 2023Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/27/2023
Date: January 27, 2023Unknown - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: January 28, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: February 10, 2021Motion for Leave to Intervene
Date: February 10, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: February 24, 2021Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: March 08, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 10, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO INTERVENE
Date: March 15, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO INTERVENE
Date: March 15, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 15, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE)
Date: March 26, 2021Complaint in Intervention
Date: March 31, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF RULING RE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE IN ACTION
Date: April 01, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER
Date: April 06, 2021Answer
Date: April 30, 2021Notice of Related Case
Date: May 12, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 28, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: June 18, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: July 08, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL
Date: July 21, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: August 13, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/13/2021
Date: August 13, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF POST MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: August 30, 2021Brief - BRIEF COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: October 13, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: October 13, 2021Separate Statement
Date: October 13, 2021Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: October 13, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 01, 2022Opposition to Motion to Intervene; Filed by: Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Jacqueline Parzivand (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Declaration In Support Of Opposition to Motion to Intervene; Filed by: Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order; Filed by: Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff); Jacqueline Parzivand (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Jacqueline Parzivand (Cross-Defendant); As to: Daniel M. Parzivand (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Objection to Plaintiff's New Evidence Submitted in Reply; Filed by: Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice SUPPLEMENTAL; Filed by: Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Reply TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY AJUDICATION; Filed by: Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Opposition to Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment; Filed by: Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Jacqueline Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Updated -- Judgment: Filed By: Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date:
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Complaint in Intervention; Filed by: Jacqueline Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Declaration of Terry J. Kent in support of Demurrer; Filed by: Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Objection to Evidence in Opposition; Filed by: Daniel M. Parzivand (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-07-01T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Richard C. Griswold (Non-Party)
Date: 2022-07-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Daniel M. Parzivand (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-07-01T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Motion to Strike; Filed by: Daniel M. Parzivand (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-07-01T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Jacqueline Parzivand (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-27T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Daniel M. Parzivand (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-07-11T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Objection to Evidence in Opposition; Filed by: Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Demurrer and Motion to Strike; Filed by: Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Jacqueline Zelener (Plaintiff in Intervention)
Date: 2022-10-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Reply TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS; Filed by: Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-18T00:00:00Declaration of Terry J. Kent in Opposition; Filed by: Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Opposition to Motion for Fees; Filed by: Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Motion to Strike; Filed by: Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: July 14, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 14, 2020Complaint
Date: July 14, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: July 14, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: July 23, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: August 06, 2020Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: July 23, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 31, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: August 31, 2020Answer
Date: August 31, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: September 09, 2020Answer
Date: October 14, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: November 17, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: December 28, 2020Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: January 11, 2021Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: January 11, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 12, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 14, 2021Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR NON-PARTICIPATION
Date: January 25, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR NON-PARTICIPATION)
Date: January 26, 2021Case Management Order
Date: January 28, 2021Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Daniel M. Parzivand (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Updated -- Motion for Attorney Fees: Filed By: Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date:
Date: 2022-10-25T00:00:00Complaint in Intervention; Filed by: Jacqueline Zelener (Plaintiff in Intervention)
Date: 2022-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: Daniel M. Parzivand (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order (eFiling); Filed by: Richard C. Griswold (Non-Party)
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff); Jacqueline Zelener (Plaintiff in Intervention)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 27, 2023Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Terry Kent (Attorney)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Answer Filed by Ilana Zelener (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Answer Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Order on Stipulation for Non-Participation)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Rescheduling Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Stipulation and Protective Order Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication Filed by Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff); Jacqueline Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Answer Filed by Jacqueline Parzivand (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Intervene) Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order) Filed by Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff); Jacqueline Parzivand (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Answer Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Complaint in Intervention Filed by Jacqueline Parzivand (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-03-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Declaration (In Support Of Opposition to Motion to Intervene) Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Re: Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application) Filed by Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Specially Set Hearing on M...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Compendium of Exhibits in Support of Motion for Summary Adjudication Filed by Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Jacqueline Parzivand (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Related Cases Re Ilana Zelener v. Da...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Jacqueline Parzivand (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-27T00:00:00Objection (to Evidence in Opposition) Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-07-01T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment) Filed by Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial Date) Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-07-11T00:00:00Statement Re Proposed Order and Interlocutory Judgment Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (to File First Amended Complaint) Filed by Jacqueline Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Strike) Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-07-01T00:00:00Ruling on Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint in Intervention Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-11T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-07-01T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees Filed by Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Summary Adjudication) Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion for Summary Adjudication) Filed by Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint In Interventio...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Declaration (of Terry J. Kent in support of Demurrer) Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Judgment Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Complaint in Intervention Filed by Jacqueline Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Objection (to Plaintiff's New Evidence Submitted in Reply) Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: submission of proposed judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Jacqueline Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-03T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Interlocutory Judgment) Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Second Objection to Plaintiff's New Evidence Submitted Reply Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Jacqueline Zelener (Plaintiff in Intervention)
Date: 2022-10-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Terry J. Kent in Opposition) Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Order Re Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs Filed by Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Fees) Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: November 10, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/01/2022
Date: March 01, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant); As to: Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Ilana Zelener (Cross-Defendant); As to: Daniel M. Parzivand (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Terry Kent (Attorney)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Daniel M. Parzivand (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Objection (to Evidence in Opposition) Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Hea...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-20T00:00:00Order Filed by Richard C. Griswold (Non-Party)
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff); Jacqueline Zelener (Plaintiff in Intervention)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-18T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by Jacqueline Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-25T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order (eFiling) Filed by Richard C. Griswold (Non-Party)
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Notice (of Errata) Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-10-31T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application Filed by Richard C. Griswold (Non-Party)
Date: 2022-07-28T00:00:00Complaint in Intervention Filed by Jacqueline Zelener (Plaintiff in Intervention)
Date: 2022-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Requesting Final Approval of ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00Notice (of Informal Discovery Conference) Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order RE: STIPULATION RE DISTRIBUTION OF SALE PROCEEDS...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-04T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to retain 664.6 Jurisdiction) Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Demurrer and Motion to Strike) Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial) Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Reply (to Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs) Filed by Ilana Zelener (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-18T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Strike) Filed by Daniel M. Parzivand (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-14T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Intervene
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Order on Stipulation for Non-Participation) of )
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Rescheduling Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)) of )
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Rescheduling Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Stipulation and Protective Order
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Order on Stipulation for Non-Participation))
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)) of )
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Related Cases Re Ilana Zelener v. Da...))
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Order (Proposed Order on Stipulation for Non-Participation)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Intervenor's Reply to Defendant/Cross-Complainant's Opposition to Motion to Intervene
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Specially Set Hearing on M...))
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Declaration (In Support Of Opposition to Motion to Intervene)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Ilana Zelener in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Compendium of Exhibits in Support of Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Post Mediation Status Conference)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Post Mediation Status Conference)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Re: Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene))
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Intervene)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Complaint in Intervention
Date: 2021-03-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Paul Tokar in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Participate in a Mandatory Settlement Conference)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Declaration (of Richardson C. Grinswold in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (re Additional Parties)
Date: 2021-03-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Notice of Related Cases Re Ilana Zelener v. Da...) of )
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial Date)
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Statement Re Proposed Order and Interlocutory Judgment
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Statement Re Order and Interlocutory Order Re Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00Response to Defendant Daniel M. Parzivand's Objection to Platiff's New Evidence Submitted in Reply
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (to File First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: submission of proposed judgment))
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00Declaration (of Terry J. Kent Opposing Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Objection (to Evidence in Opposition to Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Objection (to Plaintiff's New Evidence Submitted in Reply)
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Second Objection to Plaintiff's New Evidence Submitted Reply
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2022-03-21T00:00:00Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication))
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Objection (Second Objection to Plaintiff's New Evidence Submitted Reply)
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Reply (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY AJUDICATION)
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Order (Proposed Order on Stipulation for Non-Participation)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Order on Stipulation for Non-Participation) of 01/26/2021)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Order on Stipulation for Non-Participation))
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)) of 02/24/2021)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Rescheduling Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Intervene)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Declaration (In Support Of Opposition to Motion to Intervene)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene))
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (re Additional Parties)
Date: 2021-03-31T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/18/2021)
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/28/2021)
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Related Cases Re Ilana Zelener v. Da...))
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Participate in a Mandatory Settlement Conference)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/08/2021)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Post Mediation Status Conference)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/13/2021)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Post Mediation Status Conference)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Paul Tokar in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Specially Set Hearing on M...))
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Ilana Zelener in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Richardson C. Grinswold in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Re: Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/01/2022)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION RE ADDITIONAL PARTIES; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON)
Date: 2021-03-31T00:00:00Notice (OF RULING RE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE IN ACTION)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation and Protective Order)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.