Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jeffrey Mor In And Through His Successor-In-Interest Jeffrey S.Reisbeck, Mor Marie, filed a(n) Elder Abuse - Torts case represented by Flint Lisa Trinh, against Brius Management Co. Inc., Montrose Springs Skilled Nursing & Wellness Center, Rechnitz Shlomo, Rockport Administrative Services Llc, Verdugo Valley Skilled Nursing & Wellness Centre Llc Dba Verdugo Valley Skilled Nursing & Wellness Centre, (total of 5) See All represented by Broomand I. Hooshie, Young Heather-Ann, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Michelle Williams Court presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichelle Williams Court Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management130 days |
Filing DateMarch 30, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeElder Abuse |
|
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles. The plaintiffs in this case are Jeffrey Mor and Marie Mor, and they are represented by attorneys from Moranlaw. The defendants named in the complaint...
Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF JOSHUA KAUFFMAN
Date: October 28, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 30, 2020Petition (Complaint)
Date: March 30, 2020Summons (on Petition)
Date: March 30, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: March 30, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: April 06, 2020Declaration (Complaint)
Date: March 30, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: April 22, 2020Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: May 08, 2020Separate Statement
Date: November 12, 2020Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: November 12, 2020Motion to Quash (Deposition Subpoena re Terri Hansen, RN)
Date: January 05, 2021Offer to Compromise and Acceptance Under Code of Civil Procedure Section 998
Date: December 22, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: December 29, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 30, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: March 30, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION
Date: March 30, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION COMPLAINT
Date: March 30, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: April 01, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: April 06, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: April 22, 2020Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: May 08, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: May 08, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: May 28, 2020Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: May 28, 2020Answer
Date: June 17, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: June 29, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CMC
Date: June 18, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 08, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: July 09, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: July 23, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: July 23, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: July 27, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: July 31, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: October 13, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: October 15, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: October 20, 2020Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF MARIE MOR
Date: October 20, 2020Motion for Protective Order
Date: October 21, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: October 21, 2020Separate Statement
Date: October 22, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: October 22, 2020Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF MARIE MOR’S VERIFIED RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY
Date: October 22, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: October 23, 2020Motion to Trifurcate
Date: October 23, 2020Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 15 REQUESTING USE OF ATTACHED JURY QUESTIONNAIRE
Date: October 28, 2020Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 17 REQUESTING 48 HOUR ADVANCE NOTICE TO WITNESSES
Date: October 28, 2020Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 16 REQUESTING PRODUCTION OF DEMONSTRATIVE EVIDENCE
Date: October 28, 2020Informal Discovery Conference
Date: October 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER)
Date: October 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC); HEARING ON EX PARTE APPL...)
Date: November 02, 2020Separate Statement
Date: November 12, 2020Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: November 12, 2020Exhibit List
Date: November 13, 2020Jury Instructions
Date: November 13, 2020Witness List
Date: November 13, 2020Statement of the Case
Date: November 13, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICAT...)
Date: November 16, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: November 13, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: December 02, 2020Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF MARIE MOR
Date: December 07, 2020Offer to Compromise and Acceptance Under Code of Civil Procedure Section 998
Date: December 22, 2020Motion to Quash - MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA TO GENEVIEVE BAUTISTA
Date: December 29, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: December 29, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: December 31, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR _______ REGARDING THE DEP...)
Date: December 29, 2020Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: December 31, 2020Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: January 04, 2021Motion to Quash - MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA
Date: January 05, 2021Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PART APPLICATION TO ADVANCE MOTION TO QUASH
Date: January 06, 2021Trial Brief
Date: January 14, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: January 15, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: January 19, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER
Date: January 19, 2021Reply - REPLY P'S REPLY TO D'S OPP
Date: January 19, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE ADVANCING MOTION TO QUASH)
Date: January 19, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION (P'S) TO D'S APP TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: January 20, 2021Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST JOINT
Date: January 28, 2021Statement of the Case - STATEMENT OF THE CASE [PROPOSED] JOINT STATEMENT OF CASE
Date: January 28, 2021Witness List - WITNESS LIST JOINT
Date: January 28, 2021Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS JOINT
Date: January 28, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: January 29, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION [PLAINTIFFS'] TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6
Date: February 03, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION [PLAINTIFFS'] TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 14
Date: February 03, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION [PLAINTIFFS'] TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 13
Date: February 03, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION [PLAINTIFFS'] TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9
Date: February 03, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION [PLAINTIFFS'] TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12
Date: February 03, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION [PLAINTIFFS'] TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3
Date: February 03, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION [PLAINTIFFS'] TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2
Date: February 03, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION [PLAINTIFFS'] TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1
Date: February 03, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION [PLAINTIFFS]' TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 17
Date: February 03, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: February 04, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: February 18, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: March 04, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 12, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS
Date: March 15, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: March 19, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: April 13, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)
Date: April 14, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Marie Mor (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re Advancing Motion to Quash) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion for Trial Prefe...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Opposition - OPPOSITION [PLAINTIFFS'] TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 16
Date: February 03, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION [PLAINTIFFS'] TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4
Date: February 03, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION [PLAINTIFFS'] TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10
Date: February 03, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION [PLAINTIFFS'] TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5
Date: February 03, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION [PLAINTIFFS'] TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7
Date: February 03, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL
Date: April 27, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: May 19, 2021Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Applicat...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re Notice of Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order; Hearing on Motion to ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR _______ REGARDING THE DEP...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena to Genevieve B...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Marie Mor (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Advancing Motion to Quash) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application Ex Part Application to Advanc...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order re Advancing Motion to Quash)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Opposition ((P's) to D's App to Continue Trial) Filed by Marie Mor (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER CONTINUING FINAL ST...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Notice of Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order to Enforce the ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Notice of Settlement) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-05-08T00:00:00Opposition (P's) to D's App to Continue Trial; Filed by: Marie Mor (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Notice (Notice of CMC)
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order to Advance Plainti...))
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Motion for Trial Preference
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Advance Plaintiff's Motion for Trial Preference)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Order (re Ex Parte Application for Order to Advance Plaintiff's Motion for Trial Preference)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Declaration (of IHB)
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion)
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion for Trial Prefe...))
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order (Precluding the Deposition of Steven Stroll)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for order shortening time to hear Defendants' Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO ...))
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Marie)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Motion to Compel (DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF MARIE MOR)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Order to specifically set hearing date for P's Motion to Compel Deposition)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 17 REQUESTING 48 HOUR ADVANCE NOTICE TO WITNESSES)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE LAY WITNESS OPINION AT TRIAL; DECLARATION OF HEATHER-ANN T. YOUNG)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 15 REQUESTING USE OF ATTACHED JURY QUESTIONNAIRE)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 12 TO LIMIT EXPERTS TO OPINIONS EXPRESSED AT THEIR DEPOSITIONS)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 16 REQUESTING PRODUCTION OF DEMONSTRATIVE EVIDENCE)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER TO SPECIFICALLY SET...))
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order))
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC); Hearing on Ex Parte Appl...))
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Order Advancing the Hearing Dates of Plaintiffs Motions to Compel)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Applicat...))
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF MARIE MOR)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order; Hearing on Motion to ...))
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Deposition Subpoena to Genevieve Bautista)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR _______ REGARDING THE DEP...))
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Opposition (P's Supplemental Opposition)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Notice (DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF MARIE MOR OFF CALENDAR)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Advance Motion to Quash)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application Ex Part Application to Advanc...))
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Order continuing Final Status Conference and Trial)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Advancing Motion to Quash) of 01/19/2021)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Reply (P's Reply to D's Opp)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order re Advancing Motion to Quash))
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA TO GENEVIEVE BAUTISTA)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Opposition ((P's) to D's App to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena to Genevieve B...))
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER CONTINUING FINAL ST...))
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Witness List (JOINT)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Exhibit List (JOINT)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Jury Instructions (JOINT)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Statement of the Case ([PROPOSED] JOINT STATEMENT OF CASE)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Opposition ([Plaintiffs'] to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 16)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Opposition ([Plaintiffs]' to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 17)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Opposition ([Plaintiffs'] to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 1)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Opposition ([Plaintiffs'] to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 7)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Opposition ([Plaintiffs'] to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 4)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Opposition ([Plaintiffs'] to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 5)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Opposition ([Plaintiffs'] to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 3)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Opposition ([Plaintiffs'] to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 10)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Opposition ([Plaintiffs'] to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 2)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Opposition ([Plaintiffs'] to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 9)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Opposition ([Plaintiffs'] to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 13)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Opposition ([Plaintiffs'] to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 12)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Opposition ([Plaintiffs'] to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 6)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Opposition ([Plaintiffs'] to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 14)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order to Enforce the ...))
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Notice of Settlement))
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Notice of Settlement) of 04/14/2021)
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Order to Show Cause re Dismissal)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC); Hearing on Ex Parte Appl...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order to Advance Plainti...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER TO SPECIFICALLY SET...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Deposition of Joshua Kauffman) Filed by Marie Mor (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Motion to Compel (PLAINTIFF MARIE MOR?S VERIFIED RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Motion to Compel (PLAINTIFF MARIE MOR?S RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, NOS. 101 AND 103)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Motion to Trifurcate
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO ...))
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Deposition of Joshua Kauffman)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Deposition Subpoena)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Part Application to Advance Motion to Quash)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO ...))
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.