Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Anait Safrazbekian Family Trust And Sherman Oaks Congregate Center Inc. A California Corporation, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Block Dennis P, Meyer Lin M., against Ahs Healthcare Partners Inc. A California Corporation, Avetisyan Lusine, represented by Gerges Motaz, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Jon R. Takasugi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJon R. Takasugi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management183 days |
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2020 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Entry of Default Judgment) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Dennis P Block (Attorney)
Date: 2022-11-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: August 17, 2020Notice - NOTICE HEARING ON OSC RE ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: August 27, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: August 27, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: March 09, 2021Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment
Date: March 18, 2021Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)
Date: March 18, 2022Writ - Return
Date: May 26, 2022Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: November 08, 2022Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: November 08, 2022Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES )
Date: November 09, 2022Writ - Return
Date: February 07, 2023Complaint
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Entry of Default Judgment) of 10/28/2020)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles))
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-05-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...))
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review to Check Court File for Defendant'...))
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Entry of Default Judgment))
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Lusine Avetisyan (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 26, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: February 26, 2020Complaint
Date: February 26, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: February 26, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: April 28, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: April 28, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: May 07, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: May 07, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: May 08, 2020Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: May 14, 2020Answer
Date: June 08, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: July 02, 2020Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: September 03, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: October 28, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: December 10, 2020Default Judgment
Date: January 07, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: January 07, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: January 25, 2021Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT
Date: January 25, 2021Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: February 01, 2021Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)
Date: February 17, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: June 17, 2021Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: August 18, 2021Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)
Date: September 02, 2021Writ - Return
Date: September 23, 2021Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: March 03, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Notice (Hearing on OSC re Entry of Default Judgment)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Default Judgment
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (The Second Cause of Action for Fraud; DOES 1 through 100, inclusive)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-05-08T00:00:00Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.