Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hogan Mark, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Winter Douglas Davis, against City Of Los Angeles, represented by Cadena Christopher, Rim Susan, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Patricia Nieto presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management200 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2020 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Complaint
Date: January 24, 2020Answer; Filed by: City of Los Angeles, (Defendant); As to: Mark Hogan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Mark Hogan (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles, (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: City of Los Angeles, (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Opposition to Plaintiff's Pitchess Motion; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mark Hogan (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles, (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Mark Hogan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Unavailability; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant); As to: Mark Hogan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees MARK HOGAN; Filed by: Mark Hogan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment; Filed by: Mark Hogan (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Notice of Motion; Filed by: Mark Hogan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re Related) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Unavailability; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Complaint
Date: January 24, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: January 24, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 24, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: January 24, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: February 18, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: February 21, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES MARK HOGAN
Date: February 19, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE RELATED)
Date: March 10, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/29/2020
Date: April 29, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 29, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: July 27, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: August 11, 2020Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: August 05, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: August 11, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: November 16, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: July 08, 2021Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES’ NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL
Date: October 07, 2021Notice of Motion
Date: February 18, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: April 22, 2022Motion for Discovery of Peace Officer Personnel Records (Pitchess Motion)
Date: May 10, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S PITCHESS MOTION
Date: May 25, 2022Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: June 07, 2022Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Related) of )
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Related))
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees (MARK HOGAN)
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Notice (DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES? NOTICE OF DISASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order re Related Cases and Continued Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Trial, Pretrial, Discovery and Motion Cut-off Dates)
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability)
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Discovery of Peace Officer Personnel Re...))
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Protective Order - Confidential Designation Only)
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Motion for Discovery of Peace Officer Personnel Records (Pitchess Motion)
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR DISCOVERY OF A PEACE OFFICER PERSONNEL AND OTHER DOCUMENTS)
Date: 2022-05-25T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Pitchess Motion)
Date: 2022-05-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re Related))
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees (MARK HOGAN)
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Related) of 03/10/2020)
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/29/2020)
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Notice (of Court Order re Related Cases and Continued Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2023 | Hearing | Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 24 Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 24 Hearing on Motion to Compel (Motion to Compel Independent Medical Examiation) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Hearing on Motion to Compel (Motion to Compel Independent Medical Examiation) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party |
|
July 11, 2023 | Hearing | Pursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Independent Medical Examiation scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 24 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 24 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party |
|
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 24 Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
December 12, 2022 | Hearing |
Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Jury Trial |
|
December 08, 2022 | Hearing | Pursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 24 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 24 Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
December 05, 2022 | Hearing |
Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Final Status Conference |
|
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 24 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.