Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Taft Foster, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against West David Jr., represented by Diaz Michael Anthony, Wood Cary, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Daniel M. Crowley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel M. Crowley Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions225 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Memorandum Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum; Filed by: Foster Taft (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: David West, Jr. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Motion to Seal Redacted Exhibits; Filed by: Foster Taft (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Motion to Seal Unredacted exhibits; Filed by: Foster Taft (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: David West, Jr. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Foster Taft (Plaintiff); As to: David West, Jr. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer and Motions to Strike; Filed by: Foster Taft (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: David West, Jr. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Foster Taft (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by:
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: David West, Jr. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Foster Taft (Plaintiff); As to: David West, Jr. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: Foster Taft (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Foster Taft (Plaintiff); As to: David West, Jr. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: David West, Jr. (Defendant); As to: Foster Taft (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st); Filed by: Foster Taft (Plaintiff); As to: David West, Jr. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Motion to Seal Records (Exhibits); Filed by: Foster Taft (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Motion to Quash; Filed by: Foster Taft (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Foster Taft (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Foster Taft (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Reply Reply to Answer; Filed by: Foster Taft (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Updated -- Motion to Seal Addendum: Filed By: Foster Taft (Plaintiff); Result: Denied; Result Date:
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Motion to Seal Addendum; Filed by: Foster Taft (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Updated -- Motion to Quash: Filed By: Foster Taft (Plaintiff); Result: Denied; Result Date:
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: David West, Jr. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: Foster Taft (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Complaint
Date: January 16, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: January 16, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 16, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: January 21, 2020Memorandum - MEMORANDUM CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM
Date: January 24, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: February 11, 2020Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: March 17, 2020Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: March 17, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/22/2020
Date: April 22, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: April 27, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 22, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER AND MOTIONS TO STRIKE
Date: April 27, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 28, 2020Motion to Quash
Date: April 28, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S DEM & MTS
Date: April 28, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 30, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: June 17, 2020Association of Attorney
Date: August 11, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10))
Date: August 28, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: September 01, 2020Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: September 04, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 04, 2020Motion to Quash
Date: September 11, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 11, 2020Answer
Date: October 06, 2020Reply - REPLY REPLY TO ANSWER
Date: October 15, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 30, 2020Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH
Date: November 30, 2020Proof of Service (Renewal of Judgment)
Date: November 30, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 09, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: December 09, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER QUASH SUBPOENA)
Date: December 09, 2020Motion to Seal - MOTION TO SEAL RECORDS (EXHIBITS)
Date: April 23, 2021Motion to Seal - MOTION TO SEAL UNREDACTED EXHIBITS
Date: May 20, 2021Motion to Seal - MOTION TO SEAL ADDENDUM
Date: May 20, 2021Motion to Seal - MOTION TO SEAL REDACTED EXHIBITS
Date: May 20, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 27, 2021Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO QUASH DEFENDANT?S DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Answer)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Reply (to Defendant's Opposition to Motion to Quash)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Memorandum (Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Demurrer and Motions to Strike)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/22/2020)
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Hearing on Defendant's DEM & MTS)
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Declaration (OF SAMUEL C. JEON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO QUASH)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (Renewal of Judgment)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant's Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Plaintiff's Motion for Order Quash Subpoena))
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Motion to Seal (Records (Exhibits))
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Motion to Seal (Redacted Exhibits)
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Motion to Seal (Unredacted exhibits)
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Motion to Seal (Addendum)
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.