Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
County Of Los Angeles, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Hashmall Jennifer Mira, Miller Louis R., against City Of Bell Gardens, City Of Lynwood, City Of Norwalk, represented by Alvarez-Glasman Arnold M., Litfin Todd, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with James C. Chalfant presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 23, 2020 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: CITY OF BELL GARDENS (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Michael Campion; Filed by: CITY OF BELL GARDENS (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Order -Decision on application for preliminary injunction: granted in part; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: CITY OF NORWALK (Respondent)
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: April 23, 2020Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: April 23, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 23, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION
Date: April 23, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: April 23, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 23, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: April 23, 2020Notice of Appearance
Date: April 24, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 24, 2020Notice of Motion
Date: April 24, 2020Brief - BRIEF AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: April 24, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 27, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Date: April 28, 2020Order - ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRO AND SETTING OSC RE P.I.
Date: April 28, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED PETITION AND COMPLAINT
Date: May 01, 2020Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: May 01, 2020Notice of Related Case
Date: May 01, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: May 04, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 04, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MICHAEL CAMPION
Date: May 04, 2020Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: May 04, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: May 05, 2020Order - ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRO AND SETTING OSC RE P.I.
Date: May 06, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: June 05, 2020Brief - CALIFORNIA GOVERNOR GAVIN NEWSOM’S AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF
Date: June 23, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: June 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)
Date: July 21, 2020Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER ISSUING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Date: July 22, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: August 04, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: October 01, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: November 10, 2020Stipulation for Judgment
Date: January 04, 2021Judgment
Date: January 07, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: January 11, 2021Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer; Filed by: CITY OF BELL GARDENS (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Motion; Filed by: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Summons (on Petition) Filed by COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Summons (on First Amended Petition and Complaint) Filed by COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PETITIONER, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, FO...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Notice (of Trial Setting Conference) Filed by COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by CITY OF NORWALK (Respondent)
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Minute Order ((EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PETITIONER, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, FO...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer Filed by CITY OF BELL GARDENS (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Order ([Proposed] Order Issuing Preliminary Injunction) Filed by COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by CITY OF BELL GARDENS (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Notice of Entry of Judgment and Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Michael Campion) Filed by CITY OF BELL GARDENS (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Order (-Decision on application for preliminary injunction: granted in part) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order - Stipulation to Continue Trial Date and Associat...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment) Filed by COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Petitioner)
Date: January 11, 2021Request for Judicial Notice Filed by COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order) Filed by CITY OF NORWALK (Respondent)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PETITIONER, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, FO...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Stipulation for Judgment Filed by COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order Issuing Preliminary Injunction) Filed by COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Judgment Filed by COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Petitioner)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Summons (on First Amended Petition and Complaint)
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Brief (Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of City of Bell Gardens Mayor Alejandra Cortez)
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Notice (of Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause)
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Michael Campion)
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Order (GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRO AND SETTING OSC RE P.I.)
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Petition (Petition for Writ of Mandate; Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief)
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Minute Order ((EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PETITIONER, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, FO...))
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Declaration (Supplemental Declaration of Louis R. Miller in Support of Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Minute Order ((EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PETITIONER, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, FO...))
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Reply (In Support of County of Los Angeles' Ex Parte Application For Temporary Restraining Order)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Summons (on Petition)
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Amended Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Order ([Proposed] Order Issuing Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Order (-Decision on application for preliminary injunction: granted in part)
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (AS TO RESPONDENTS CITY OF BELL GARDENS AND CITY OF LYNWOOD ONLY)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation to Continue Trial Setting Conference; [Proposed] Order)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause)
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PETITIONER, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, FO...))
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Order (STIPULATION TO CONTINUE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION DATE AND ASSOCIATED DATES)
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order - Stipulation to Continue Trial Date and Associat...))
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION))
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00CALIFORNIA GOVERNOR GAVIN NEWSOM?S AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Order (granting ex parte application for tro and setting osc re p.i.)
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order Issuing Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.