Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Butler America Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Manasserian, Armen, against Baker, Cynthia, Baker, Jimmie Garrett, Jr, Bellas, Michael J, Lipkin, Mitchell C, Newbatt, Bianca, (total of 9) See All represented by Balch, Shayna H, Evans, Kathryn M, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Geck, Donna D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGeck, Donna D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 20, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty (06) |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint document is a proof of service of summons in a legal case. It is filed by Chora Young LLP, an attorney or party without an attorney, on behalf of Butler America, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company. The defendants/respondents in ...
Motion, Filed
Date: November 19, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed
Date: November 20, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: November 20, 2020Summons Issued, Filed
Date: November 20, 2020Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: December 11, 2020Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: December 18, 2020Declaration of Non-Service, Filed
Date: December 11, 2020Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: September 23, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: January 03, 2022Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: December 23, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees, Filed
Date: October 12, 2021Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: October 27, 2021Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: December 18, 2020Declaration of Non-Service, Filed
Date: January 19, 2021Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: January 15, 2021Notice, Filed
Date: September 20, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference, Filed
Date: August 18, 2021Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: January 11, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: September 23, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: November 19, 2021Demurrer, Filed
Date: January 03, 2022Motion, Filed
Date: November 19, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: January 13, 2022Motion, Filed
Date: January 04, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: December 03, 2021Objection, Filed
Date: November 24, 2021Motion: Quash
Date: December 03, 2021Motion, Filed
Date: January 04, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: November 18, 2021Separate Statement, Filed
Date: January 04, 2022Separate Statement, Filed
Date: January 04, 2022Proof of Service, Filed
Date: January 05, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: January 14, 202252666Proof009edd
Date: January 28, 202253061PLAIN012e29
Date: February 05, 202253061PLAIN00dfec
Date: February 05, 202253061DECLA026914
Date: February 05, 202253061DECLA03a4d3
Date: February 05, 202253192PROOF004a80
Date: February 09, 2022DEFS OPPO to Pltf's Ex Parte - Evans Decl
Date: February 09, 2022DEFS' OPPO to PLTF'S Ex Parte
Date: February 09, 202253162ExPar00b112
Date: February 08, 202253162Decla01539c
Date: February 08, 2022DEFS' MTN for Term Sanctions - Reply
Date: February 11, 2022DEFS Reply to MTS Pltf's SAC - DEC - Evans
Date: February 11, 2022DEFS Reply to Mtn - DEC - Evans
Date: February 11, 2022DEFS' MTS PLTF SAC - Reply
Date: February 11, 2022DEFS MTN for Sanctions - NTC of Withdrawal
Date: March 05, 202254759PLAIN00b69d
Date: March 15, 2022DEFS Reply re Demurrer to SAC
Date: March 19, 2022DEFS Oppo to PLTF MTC RFP 01 - Sep Stmt
Date: March 19, 2022DEFS Oppo to PLTF MTC RFP 01 - Memo
Date: March 19, 2022DEFS Oppo to PLTF MTC SROG 01 - Memo
Date: March 19, 2022DEFS Oppo to PLTF MTC SROG 01 - Sep Stmt
Date: March 19, 2022DEFS Oppo to PLTF MTC RFP 01 - Evans Decl
Date: March 19, 2022DEFS Oppo to PLTF MTC SROG 01 - Evans Decl
Date: March 19, 2022DEFS Reply re Demurrer to SAC - Evans Decl
Date: March 19, 2022Opposition, Filed
Date: February 08, 2022Motion
Date: February 18, 2022Reply, Filed
Date: March 18, 2022Motion: Sanctions
Date: February 25, 2022Ex Parte Application, Filed
Date: February 08, 2022Reply, Filed
Date: February 10, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: January 28, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: February 18, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: February 25, 2022Reply, Filed
Date: February 10, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: January 28, 2022Notice, Filed
Date: March 04, 2022Opposition, Filed
Date: March 18, 2022Opposition, Filed
Date: March 18, 2022DEFS MTN for Sanctions - SBS Declaration
Date: March 25, 2022DEFS MTN for Sanctions - Memo
Date: March 25, 202255669PLAIN010dd0
Date: April 02, 202255669PLAIN007f7c
Date: April 02, 2022Stipulation and Order for Continuance, Filed
Date: March 25, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: March 25, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: March 25, 2022Motion, Filed
Date: March 25, 2022Demurrer
Date: March 25, 202256386PLAIN00e047
Date: April 19, 2022DEFS Ex Parte for Reconsideration - Memo
Date: April 18, 2022DEFS Ex Parte for Reconsideration - NTC
Date: April 18, 2022DEFS Ex Parte for Reconsideration - SBS Decl
Date: April 18, 202256388PLAIN003e51
Date: April 19, 2022DEF Case Mgmt Stmt (05-06-22)
Date: April 21, 202256588CaseM0059d2
Date: April 22, 202256588Proof0195f7
Date: April 22, 202257026Proof03d798
Date: May 02, 202257026PLAIN00715c
Date: May 02, 202257026DECLA01a229
Date: May 02, 2022DEFS Oppo to PLTF Ex Parte re Cont'g HRG - KME
Date: May 03, 2022DEFS Oppo to PLTF Ex Parte re Cont'g HRG Date
Date: May 03, 2022Ex Parte Application, Filed
Date: April 18, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: April 18, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: April 08, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: April 18, 2022Motion: Compel
Date: April 08, 2022Opposition, Filed
Date: May 02, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: May 02, 2022Ex Parte Order, Filed
Date: April 20, 2022Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: May 05, 2022DEFS MTN for Sanctions - Notice
Date: March 25, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: February 10, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: February 08, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: March 18, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: February 10, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: September 22, 2021Notice of Removal to Federal Court, Filed
Date: January 04, 2021Complaint, Filed
Date: November 20, 2020Declaration, Filed
Date: January 03, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: September 22, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: November 30, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: January 04, 2022Notice, Filed
Date: January 04, 2021Amended Complaint, Filed
Date: November 15, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: November 18, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: September 20, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: November 19, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: November 05, 2021Proof of Electronic Service, Filed
Date: January 27, 2022Opposition, Filed
Date: February 04, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: February 04, 2022Proof of Service, Filed
Date: February 08, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: February 08, 2022Ex Parte Order, Filed
Date: February 09, 2022Opposition, Filed
Date: March 14, 2022Separate Statement, Filed
Date: March 18, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: March 18, 2022Separate Statement, Filed
Date: March 18, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: March 18, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: March 25, 2022Reply, Filed
Date: April 01, 2022Reply, Filed
Date: April 01, 2022Opposition, Filed
Date: April 18, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: April 21, 2022Opposition, Filed
Date: April 18, 2022Ex Parte Application, Filed
Date: May 02, 2022Proof of Electronic Service, Filed
Date: April 21, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: May 02, 2022Proof of Service, Filed
Date: May 02, 2022Ex Parte Order, Filed
Date: May 11, 2022Stipulation and Order for Continuance, Filed
Date: May 31, 202263598PLAIN005130
Date: September 17, 202263598Reque01c2c4
Date: September 17, 2022Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: August 09, 2022Opposition, Filed
Date: September 16, 2022Request Dismiss Entire Action Without Prejudice, Filed
Date: September 16, 2022DEFS MTN for Sanctions - Reply
Date: September 23, 2022DEFS Memo of Costs - Evans Decl
Date: October 04, 2022DEFS Memo of Costs - Packet
Date: October 04, 2022Reply, Filed
Date: September 22, 2022Memorandum of Costs (Summary), Filed
Date: October 04, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed
Date: September 27, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: October 04, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: September 26, 2022Opposition, Filed
Date: November 18, 2021Reply, Filed
Date: November 24, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: November 19, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: November 19, 2021Reply, Filed
Date: November 24, 2021Opposition, Filed
Date: November 18, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: October 08, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: November 05, 2021Motion, Filed
Date: November 05, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: October 08, 2021Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: October 05, 2021Demurrer, Filed
Date: September 22, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: September 22, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: September 20, 2021Order, Filed
Date: August 17, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: March 26, 2021Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed
Date: November 30, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
February 17, 2023 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Motion for Sanctions Tentative not yet posted, please check again.
Judge: Judge Donna Geck |
|
January 13, 2023 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Motion: Sanctions Tentative not yet posted, please check again.
Judge: Judge Donna Geck |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion: Sanctions
Judge: Geck, Donna D |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFS Memo of Costs - Evans Decl | |
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFS Memo of Costs - Packet | |
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEFS Memo of Costs - Packet Memorandum of Costs (Summary), Filed |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
DEFS Memo of Costs - Evans Decl Declaration, Filed of Kathryn M. Evans in Support of Defendants' Memorandum of Costs |
|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Demurrer
Judge: Geck, Donna D |
|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion: Quash Service of Summons for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Judge: Geck, Donna D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.