Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
De Plascencia, Alicia Zamudio vs. Enloe Medical Center
A (23) Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Butte County. Judge Stephen E. Benson presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 31, 2020
Last Refreshed
August 30, 2023
Filing Location
Butte County, CA
Category
(23) Unlimited Other PI/PD/WD
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
General Torts
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a personal injury, property damage, and wrongful death case filed by Alicia Zamudio De Plascencia against Enloe Medical Center and Does 1 to 25. The case number is 20CV01506. The jurisdiction of the case is not specified. The co…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Management Conference
Date: Jul 13, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: Jul 12, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: Jun 22, 2022Jury Trial
Date: Jun 13, 2022Trial Readiness Conference
Date: Jun 09, 2022Settlement Conference
Date: Apr 15, 2022Proof of Mailing
Date: Apr 13, 2022Stipulation and Order
Date: Apr 12, 2022Settlement Conference Statement
Date: Apr 08, 2022Notice of Rescheduling
Date: Jan 05, 2022Substitution of Attorney
Date: Mar 02, 2021Notice of Rescheduling
Date: Feb 10, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: Jan 27, 2021Minute Order
Date: Jan 27, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: Jan 08, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: Jan 08, 2021Notice of Reassignment
Date: Jan 05, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: Dec 29, 2020Answer - Response - Denial - Unlimited
Date: Aug 31, 2020Proof of Service of Summons Filed
Date: Aug 21, 2020Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference
Date: Aug 03, 2020Complaint
Date: Jul 31, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: Jul 31, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: Jul 31, 2020Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Case Management Statement Case Management Conference Resetting Jury Trial Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney as to Sergio Garcia Jury Trial 5 Day Estimate Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney as to Sergio Garcia Trial Readiness Conference 5 Day Estimate Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Candela, Michael P |
|
April 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Settlement Conference Statement Settlement Conference Judge: Candela, Michael P |
|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial Stipulation and Order Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Settlement Conference Statement Settlement Conference Statement |
|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Rescheduling | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney as to Sergio Garcia Substitution of Attorney |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Rescheduling | |
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Case Management Statement Case Management Conference Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Reassignment of All Purpose Judge Notice of Reassignment Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response/Denial Answer - Response - Denial - Unlimited |
|
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Enloe Medical Center Proof of Service of Summons Filed |
|
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference
Judge: Glusman, Robert A |
|
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons Issued and Filed | |
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet |