Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Friant Water Authority, A California Joint Powers Authority, Glenn-Colusa Irrigation District, A California Irrigation District, Natomas Central Mutual Water Company, A California Water Company, Reclamation District 108, A California Reclamation District, River Garden Farms Company, A Business Entity, (total of 8) See All filed a(n) 43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) case represented by Neuhaus, Lauren V., against California Department Of Fish And Wildlife, A California State Agency, California Department Of Water Resources, A California State Agency, represented by Moffat, Corey, Rowan, Carolyn N., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHamilton, Jeffrey Y. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management135 days |
Filing DateMay 04, 2020 |
Category43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Stipulation and Order filed
Date: October 13, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 26, 2021Notice Filed
Date: January 07, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: December 16, 2020Case Management Statement Filed
Date: January 25, 2021Notice Filed
Date: September 14, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: August 25, 2020Notice Filed
Date: October 13, 2020Notice Filed
Date: September 28, 2020Case Management Statement Filed
Date: September 11, 2020Notice Filed
Date: June 18, 2020Petition - Writ of Mandate
Date: May 04, 2020Order Received for Signature
Date: October 09, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 13, 2020Notice Filed
Date: November 10, 2020Notice Filed
Date: October 19, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: September 16, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: September 21, 2020Case Management Statement Filed
Date: September 04, 2020Case Management Statement Filed
Date: September 03, 2020Stipulation and Order filed
Date: August 27, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Continued Case Management Conference | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Continued Case Management Conference | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment From Chambers re: Continued Case Management Conference |
|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement Filed | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Notice Filed Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order |
|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Order assigning Coordiation Trial Judge |
|
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment From Chambers re: Continued Case Management Conference |
|
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
November 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Notice Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.