Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Jacocks Stanley, Mcdonald Krystol Renee, Mcdonald Kyira Renee, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Parris Khail A., Wilson Eric Nathan, against Fieldturf Usa Inc., Wells Robert Aaron, represented by Harrison Matthew, Schonbuch Michael Neil, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Antelope Valley with Michael C. Kelley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 08, 2020 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedNovember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseAntelope Valley |
Order - ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO RECUSE JUDGE
Date: February 22, 2021Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer; Filed by: FIELDTURF USA, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Recusal) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Taking Motion off Calendar; Filed by: Robert Aaron Wells (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: FIELDTURF USA, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Brianna Mareese Jacocks (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: FIELDTURF USA, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Brianna Mareese Jacocks (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Robert Aaron Wells (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Robert Aaron Wells (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Robert Aaron Wells (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: Robert Aaron Wells (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Scheduling) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Robert Aaron Wells (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Motion for Stay of Proceedings; Filed by: Robert Aaron Wells (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Brianna Mareese Jacocks (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: FIELDTURF USA, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Robert Aaron Wells (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Robert Aaron Wells (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: December 11, 2020Answer
Date: December 14, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: December 14, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: SCHEDULING)
Date: December 21, 2020Answer
Date: December 22, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING THE COMPLAINT
Date: January 12, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 17, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: April 01, 2021Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES
Date: April 01, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: April 01, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: April 02, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: April 19, 2021Answer
Date: April 21, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: April 27, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO STAY OFF CALENDAR
Date: April 27, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION FOR JUDICIAL USE IMMUNITY OFF CALENDAR
Date: April 27, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: May 06, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: May 20, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: June 11, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: July 13, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: July 14, 2021Separate Statement
Date: July 19, 2021Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: July 20, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: July 22, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: September 03, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME ...)
Date: September 03, 2021Application - APPLICATION TO BIFURCATE
Date: September 03, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT WELLS' MIL NO. 2
Date: September 09, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT WELLS' MIL NO. 1
Date: September 09, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT WELLS' MIL NO. 3
Date: September 09, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT WELLS' MIL NO. 4
Date: September 09, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT WELLS' MIL NO. 5
Date: September 09, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER REOPENING DISCOV...)
Date: September 09, 2021Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE TO DEFENDANTS' LIABILITY INSURANCE
Date: September 13, 2021Separate Statement
Date: September 13, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION AMENDED OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT WELLS MIL NO. 4
Date: September 13, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: September 14, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER AND AN...)
Date: September 14, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: September 17, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: January 10, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: January 28, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: April 11, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: August 12, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: September 26, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: November 03, 2022Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: October 08, 2020Complaint
Date: October 08, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 08, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 08, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 28, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 16, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 18, 2020Motion for Stay of Proceedings
Date: February 17, 2021Motion for Protective Order
Date: February 17, 2021Reply - REPLY ISO APPLICATION FOR PREFERENCE; DECLARATION OF STANLEY JACOCKS
Date: February 18, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE (NOT ANTI-SLAPP) - WITHOUT DEMURR...)
Date: February 18, 2021Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A MOTION TO RECUSE JUDGE
Date: February 19, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RECUSAL)
Date: February 22, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: February 22, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RECUSAL) OF 02/22/2021
Date: February 22, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION SEEKING A PREFERENTIAL TRIAL ...)
Date: February 23, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: February 24, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 03, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 17, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO COMPEL OFF CALENDAR
Date: March 23, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: April 21, 2021Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Recusal) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for a Motion to Recuse Judge) Filed by Robert Aaron Wells (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Seeking a Preferential Trial ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Brianna Mareese Jacocks (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer Filed by FIELDTURF USA, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order Filed by Robert Aaron Wells (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Trial Preference; Hearing on Motion to ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Robert Aaron Wells (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Scheduling) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise with Specia...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Opposition (Amended to Defendant Wells MIL No. 4) Filed by Brianna Mareese Jacocks (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurr...))
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Scheduling) of )
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Further Responses to Demands for Production, Set One)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Response (to Defendant's Motion for Judicial Use of Immunity; Declaration of Khail A. Parris)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiffs' First Demand for Production)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery, Declaration of Eric N. Wilson)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Seeking a Preferential Trial ...))
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel the Second Sessi...))
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Trial Preference; Hearing on Motion to ...))
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Notice (of Taking Motion to Stay Off Calendar)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Notice (of Taking Motion off Calendar)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Stay this Action Until Resolution of the Criminal Matter)
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Order (on Ex Parte Application to Recuse Judge)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Notice (of Taking Motion to Compel OFF Calendar)
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Separate Statement (in Support of Motion to Compel Further Responses to Demands for Production, Set One)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Motion re: (for Judicial Use Immunity)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Recusal))
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Notice (of Taking Motion for Judicial Use Immunity Off Calendar)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Recusal) of )
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Regarding April 1, 2021 Hearings)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for An Order Requiring an Ind...))
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Responses to Demands for ...))
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Compel Plaintiffs Depositions)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Compel Plaintiffs' Depositions; Declaration of Khail A. Parris)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Joinder to Motion (Joinder in Opposition to Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Responses to Demands for ...))
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs? Opposition to Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Compel Mental Examinations)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial and Fact Discovery as to Defendants)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Requiring an Independent Mental E...))
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of )
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of )
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for 1) an Order to Compel the...))
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial and Fact Di...))
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Separate Statement (in Support of Defendants Ex Parte)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Reopening Discov...))
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 4 to Exclude Graphic Photographs; Declaration of John R. Horstmann)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Protective Order)
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Plaintiffs' Guardian Ad Litem Stanley Jacocks' Answers to Deposition Questions)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order to Compel the Independent Physica...))
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 4 to preclude Defendant from denying liability; Declaration of Rene E Ucros)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for a Protective Order and an...))
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Opposition (Non-opposition to Defendant Wells' MIL No. 4)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time ...))
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant Wells' MIL No. 2)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for a Protective Order Preclu...))
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant Wells' MIL No. 1)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Reopening Discov...))
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Opposition (Non-opposition to Defendant Wells' MIL No. 5)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 7 to Preclude Argument that Defendant Failed to Take Responsibility)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 6 to Exclude Evidence or Reference to the Size and Wealth of the Parties)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Opposition (Amended to Defendant Wells MIL No. 4)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 8 to Exclude Introduction of Coroner and Autopsy Photographs of Decedent)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 1 to Exclude Reference to Defendants' Liability Insurance)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant Wells' MIL No. 3)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Scheduling) of 12/21/2020)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Scheduling))
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Seeking Preferential Trial Date)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Notice (of Errata Regarding the Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for a Motion to Recuse Judge)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurr...))
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Reply (ISO Application for Preference; Declaration of Stanley Jacocks)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Mary Webb #4347)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Seeking a Preferential Trial ...))
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Regarding April 1, 2021 Hearings)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Notice (of Taking Motion for Judicial Use Immunity Off Calendar)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Response (to Defendant's Motion for Judicial Use of Immunity; Declaration of Khail A. Parris)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Notice (of Taking Motion to Stay Off Calendar)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiffs' First Demand for Production)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel the Second Sessi...))
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Responses to Demands for ...))
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Responses to Demands for ...))
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs? Opposition to Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Compel Mental Examinations)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Compel Plaintiffs' Depositions; Declaration of Khail A. Parris)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Compel Plaintiffs Depositions)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Joinder to Motion (Joinder in Opposition to Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 07/14/2021)
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for An Order Requiring an Ind...))
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Robert Aaron Wells (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Notice (of Taking Motion off Calendar) Filed by Robert Aaron Wells (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Notice (of Taking Motion for Judicial Use Immunity Off Calendar) Filed by Robert Aaron Wells (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Answer Filed by FIELDTURF USA, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Scheduling)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Recusal)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Robert Aaron Wells (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Answer Filed by Robert Aaron Wells (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Order (on Ex Parte Application to Recuse Judge) Filed by Robert Aaron Wells (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurr...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by FIELDTURF USA, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Notice (of Taking Motion to Stay Off Calendar) Filed by Robert Aaron Wells (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Motion re: (for Judicial Use Immunity) Filed by Robert Aaron Wells (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Motion for Stay of Proceedings Filed by Robert Aaron Wells (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Robert Aaron Wells (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Answer Filed by Robert Aaron Wells (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel the Second Sessi...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Separate Statement (in Support of Defendants Ex Parte) Filed by Robert Aaron Wells (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial and Fact Di...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by FIELDTURF USA, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for An Order Requiring an Ind...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Reopening Discov...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Protective Order) Filed by FIELDTURF USA, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Requiring an Independent Mental E...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Responses to Demands for ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for 1) an Order to Compel the...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Responses to Demands for ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order to Compel the Independent Physica...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Brianna Mareese Jacocks (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by FIELDTURF USA, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Brianna Mareese Jacocks (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Reopening Discov...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for a Protective Order and an...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for a Protective Order Preclu...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Advance the Hearing Date o...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-08T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Scheduling))
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Mary Webb #4347)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Seeking Preferential Trial Date)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for a Motion to Recuse Judge)
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Motion for Stay of Proceedings
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Notice (of Errata Regarding the Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Reply (ISO Application for Preference; Declaration of Stanley Jacocks)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for 1) an Order to Compel the...))
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Separate Statement (in Support of Defendants Ex Parte)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Protective Order)
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial and Fact Di...))
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 07/22/2021)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Requiring an Independent Mental E...))
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order to Compel the Independent Physica...))
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Reopening Discov...))
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Plaintiffs' Guardian Ad Litem Stanley Jacocks' Answers to Deposition Questions)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 4 to Exclude Graphic Photographs; Declaration of John R. Horstmann)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time ...))
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant Wells' MIL No. 2)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Opposition (Non-opposition to Defendant Wells' MIL No. 5)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Opposition (Non-opposition to Defendant Wells' MIL No. 4)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 7 to Preclude Argument that Defendant Failed to Take Responsibility)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant Wells' MIL No. 1)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Opposition (Amended to Defendant Wells MIL No. 4)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for a Protective Order and an...))
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant Wells' MIL No. 3)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 6 to Exclude Evidence or Reference to the Size and Wealth of the Parties)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 1 to Exclude Reference to Defendants' Liability Insurance)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for a Protective Order Preclu...))
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Reopening Discov...))
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 8 to Exclude Introduction of Coroner and Autopsy Photographs of Decedent)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 4 to preclude Defendant from denying liability; Declaration of Rene E Ucros)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Recusal) of 02/22/2021)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Recusal))
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Order (on Ex Parte Application to Recuse Judge)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Notice (of Taking Motion off Calendar)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Notice (of Taking Motion to Compel OFF Calendar)
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery, Declaration of Eric N. Wilson)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Trial Preference; Hearing on Motion to ...))
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Separate Statement (in Support of Motion to Compel Further Responses to Demands for Production, Set One)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Stay this Action Until Resolution of the Criminal Matter)
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Further Responses to Demands for Production, Set One)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Motion re: (for Judicial Use Immunity)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial and Fact Discovery as to Defendants)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.