Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Garcia Jaime, Tadeo Josefina, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mikhov Steve, against Nissan North America Inc. A California Corporation, represented by Thomas Anthony S, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Teresa A. Beaudet presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTeresa A. Beaudet Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2020 |
CategoryContract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (No Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Management Statement; Filed by: JAIME GARCIA (Plaintiff); JOSEFINA TADEO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: JAIME GARCIA (Plaintiff); JOSEFINA TADEO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: JAIME GARCIA (Plaintiff); JOSEFINA TADEO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: JAIME GARCIA (Plaintiff); JOSEFINA TADEO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Complaint
Date: September 23, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: September 23, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 23, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: September 23, 2020Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: September 24, 2020Demand for Jury Trial
Date: September 23, 2020Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: September 24, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: September 24, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: October 05, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 09, 2020Answer
Date: October 28, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: December 21, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASES
Date: December 23, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: January 20, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 20, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 22, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: March 08, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 08, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 29, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: April 13, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: June 02, 2021Notice - NOTICE STATEMENT RE THE WRIT RE FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: June 14, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: June 17, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: October 14, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: November 16, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: November 23, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL
Date: December 16, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: January 12, 2022Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Notice (OF SUBMISSION OF PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASES)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Status Conference Re: Ruling on Pet...))
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Notice (STATEMENT RE THE WRIT RE FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.