Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Beltran Andrew, Gonzalez Timothy, Pollard Jr. Kevin, Los Angeles Industry Inc., filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Lacour Jonathan Pierre, against Chin Didi, Cs Heritage Industry Inc., Los Angeles Industry Inc., represented by Renshaw Steven, Thomas Jeffrey Scott, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Douglas W. Stern presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDouglas W. Stern Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2020 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Reply Kevin Pollard Jr's Reply MTC RFPDs; Filed by: Kevin Pollard, Jr. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: CS HERITAGE INDUSTRY, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-12T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Andrew Beltran (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: CS HERITAGE INDUSTRY, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Kevin Pollard, Jr. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: TIMOTHY GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Reply Andrew Beltran Reply MTC RFPDs; Filed by: Andrew Beltran (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Declaration declaration of Brian Bird; Filed by: CS HERITAGE INDUSTRY, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: TIMOTHY GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Jonathan Pierre LaCour (Attorney)
Date: 2022-09-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Andrew Beltran (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Reply Timothy Gonzalez Reply to Motion to Compel; Filed by: TIMOTHY GONZALEZ (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Reply Plaintiff's Reply to Motions to Compel Interrogatories; Filed by: TIMOTHY GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Edith Chin Erroneously Sued As Didi Chin (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-12T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: LOS ANGELES INDUSTRY, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00Notice Notice of OSC re Dismissal; Filed by: TIMOTHY GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: TIMOTHY GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: September 21, 2020Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: October 13, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 21, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: September 21, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: February 04, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: February 10, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/10/2021
Date: February 10, 2021Answer
Date: April 09, 2021Cross-Complaint
Date: March 19, 2021Separate Statement
Date: July 06, 2021Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: July 06, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 06, 2021Separate Statement
Date: August 30, 2021Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO MOTIONS TO COMPEL INTERROGATORIES
Date: September 03, 2021Separate Statement
Date: September 07, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF BRIAN R. BIRD
Date: September 07, 2021Separate Statement
Date: September 14, 2021Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: September 14, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)
Date: September 16, 2021Reply - REPLY ANDREW BELTRAN REPLY MTC RFPDS
Date: December 06, 2021Reply - REPLY KEVIN POLLARD JR'S REPLY MTC RFPDS
Date: December 06, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: July 12, 2022Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: September 20, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: October 04, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: October 06, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF JEFFREY S. HORTON THOMAS
Date: October 25, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 31, 2022Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: October 31, 2022Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL
Date: November 21, 2022Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: December 01, 2022Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE [PROPOSED] SECOND AMENDED ANSWER
Date: December 07, 2022Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER
Date: December 19, 2022Answer
Date: December 19, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/22/2022
Date: December 22, 2022Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF OSC RE DISMISSAL
Date: December 28, 2022Order - Dismissal
Date: January 06, 2023Order - CORRECT PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION
Date: January 20, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF BRIAN R. BIRD
Date: December 06, 2021Separate Statement
Date: December 06, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL BY BELTRAN AND POLLARD
Date: December 06, 2021Reply - REPLY TIMOTHY GONZALEZ REPLY TO MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: December 07, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)
Date: December 13, 2021Cross-Complaint Filed by LOS ANGELES INDUSTRY, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Andrew Beltran (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by TIMOTHY GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Declaration (declaration of Brian Bird) Filed by CS HERITAGE INDUSTRY, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Kevin Pollard, Jr. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by TIMOTHY GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by CS HERITAGE INDUSTRY, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff's Reply to Motions to Compel Interrogatories) Filed by TIMOTHY GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by CS HERITAGE INDUSTRY, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Answer)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Joint Stipulation and Order to Dismiss Entire...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Andrew Beltran (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Edith Chin Erroneously Sued As Didi Chin (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-12T00:00:00Order - Dismissal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Reply (Timothy Gonzalez Reply to Motion to Compel) Filed by TIMOTHY GONZALEZ (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Reply (Kevin Pollard Jr's Reply MTC RFPDs) Filed by Kevin Pollard, Jr. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Jonathan Pierre LaCour (Attorney)
Date: 2022-09-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-04T00:00:00Notice (Notice of OSC re Dismissal) Filed by TIMOTHY GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-28T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by TIMOTHY GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by LOS ANGELES INDUSTRY, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Stipulation to Continue Final Status Conferenc...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-21T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by TIMOTHY GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00Reply (Andrew Beltran Reply MTC RFPDs) Filed by Andrew Beltran (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (stipulation to extend time to respond to cross complaint)
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/10/2021)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Answer (Amended answer)
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Further Responses to Requests For Admission, Set One)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (to Requests For Admission, Set One)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Declaration (declaration of Brian Bird)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff's Reply to Motions to Compel Interrogatories)
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Plaintiff's Motions to Compel RFAs)
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF BRIAN R. BIRD)
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff Andrew Beltran's Reply ISO Motion to Compel Interrogatories)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...))
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Notice (notice of inactive status)
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Reply (Andrew Beltran Reply MTC RFPDs)
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...))
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF BRIAN R. BIRD)
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to motion to compel by Beltran and Pollard)
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Reply (Timothy Gonzalez Reply to Motion to Compel)
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Reply (Kevin Pollard Jr's Reply MTC RFPDs)
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.