Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bradford Stephanie, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Bryant James Albert, Diggs Rodney S., against Does 1-25 Inclusive, Sina Julie, University Of California Regents, represented by Cortez Elvira, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Susan Bryant-Deason presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSusan Bryant-Deason Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2020 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: University of California Regents (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: University of California Regents (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Stephanie Bradford (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Julie Sina (Defendant); As to: Stephanie Bradford (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Stephanie Bradford (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Stephanie Bradford (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: University of California Regents (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 24, 2020Complaint
Date: August 24, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 24, 2020Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: August 28, 2020Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: September 02, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CASE REASSIGNMENT UPON CCP 170.6 CHALLENGE)
Date: September 02, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: September 24, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 02, 2020Answer
Date: November 30, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: January 07, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 07, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: January 08, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 08, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)
Date: January 20, 2021Answer
Date: February 18, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE SELECTION OF A MEDIATOR)
Date: March 04, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE SELECTION OF A MEDIATOR)
Date: April 29, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: July 28, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: September 22, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: January 04, 2022Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: January 05, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: February 09, 2022Declaration and Order re: Advance Jury Fees
Date: May 13, 2022Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re Selection of a Mediator)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Case Reassignment Upon CCP 170.6 Challenge)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Answer Filed by Julie Sina (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Stephanie Bradford (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Stephanie Bradford (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Stephanie Bradford (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Stephanie Bradford (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Answer Filed by University of California Regents (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Stephanie Bradford (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by University of California Regents (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Stephanie Bradford (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Declaration and Order re: Advance Jury Fees Filed by Stephanie Bradford (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Stephanie Bradford (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Stephanie Bradford (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re Selection of a Mediator)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Stephanie Bradford (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by University of California Regents (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial) Filed by Stephanie Bradford (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Case Reassignment Upon CCP 170.6 Challenge) of )
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference;))
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference;) of )
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re Selection of a Mediator))
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Case Reassignment Upon CCP 170.6 Challenge))
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re Selection of a Mediator))
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Declaration and Order re: Advance Jury Fees
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Case Reassignment Upon CCP 170.6 Challenge) of 09/02/2020)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Case Reassignment Upon CCP 170.6 Challenge))
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference;) of 01/20/2021)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re Selection of a Mediator))
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re Selection of a Mediator))
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/28/2021)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference;))
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.