Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gonzalez Dora, Lopez Maria, Progress Place, Rivera Angelica, Rivera Elizabeth, (total of 8) See All filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Biggins Chad Esq., against Cepeida Eva, Estrada Nick Joseph Aka Nico Estrada Molina, represented by Mojarro Jacob, Mojarro Jacob I., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Barbara Marie Scheper presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarbara Marie Scheper Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 17, 2020 |
CategoryOther Real Property (Not Eminent Domain, Landlord/Tenant, Foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Reply to Opposition to Demurrer; Filed by: Eva Cepeida (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-05T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Continuance) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Eva Cepeida (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Progress Place (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Eva Cepeida (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter;) of , Tentative Decision; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Updated -- Motion for Protective Order: Filed By: Eva Cepeida (Defendant); Result: Denied; Result Date:
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Declaration of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension; Filed by: Eva Cepeida (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Eva Cepeida (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) AMENDED; Filed by: Eva Cepeida (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Eva Cepeida (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Eva Cepeida (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Notice of informal discovery conference; Filed by: Progress Place (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Eva Cepeida (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Eva Cepeida (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Progress Place (Plaintiff); As to: Eva Cepeida (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Tentative Decision; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Opposition to Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: Dora Gonzalez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: Eva Cepeida (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Progress Place (Plaintiff); As to: Eva Cepeida (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Eva Cepeida (Defendant); As to: Progress Place (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Eva Cepeida (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Eva Cepeida (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Eva Cepeida (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance NOA B328170; Filed by: Clerk
Date: May 24, 2023Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: Eva Cepeida (Appellant)
Date: 2023-03-23T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: Jose Rivera (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal 2ND AMENDED; Filed by: Clerk
Date: April 24, 2023Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed B328170; Filed by: Clerk
Date: September 15, 2023Declaration Decl. re OSC; Filed by: Jose Rivera (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-27T00:00:00Opposition to Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: Eva Cepeida (Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-27T00:00:00Reply Reply re Motion for Attorney's Fees; Filed by: Jose Rivera (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-30T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued NOA ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Eva Cepeida (Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-30T00:00:00Complaint
Date: August 17, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 25, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION
Date: October 16, 2020Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: November 16, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 17, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE)
Date: December 07, 2020Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: December 29, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: December 29, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: January 14, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: December 30, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION
Date: February 01, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE
Date: February 22, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE;)
Date: February 22, 2021Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: March 03, 2021Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: March 04, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 04, 2021Motion for Protective Order
Date: March 09, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: March 10, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 19, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: March 22, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: March 22, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: March 26, 2021Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)
Date: April 14, 2021Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: April 14, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)
Date: June 04, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: August 02, 2021Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: September 22, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: October 12, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: October 21, 2021Notice - NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER
Date: October 22, 2021Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER
Date: October 28, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; CASE MANAGEM...)
Date: November 03, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: July 21, 2022Exhibit List
Date: September 02, 2022Witness List
Date: September 02, 2022Answer
Date: September 12, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL; FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; NON-APPEARANCE CAS...)
Date: September 12, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)
Date: September 30, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL;)
Date: November 29, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER;)
Date: December 07, 2022Declaration - TENTATIVE DECISION
Date: December 07, 2022Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: January 09, 2023Judgment
Date: January 05, 2023Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: February 28, 2023Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: March 16, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 23, 2023Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/23/2023
Date: March 23, 2023Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES
Date: March 27, 2023Declaration - DECLARATION DECL. RE OSC
Date: March 27, 2023Reply - REPLY REPLY RE MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES
Date: March 30, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 30, 2023Appeal - Notice of Default Issued - APPEAL - NOTICE OF DEFAULT ISSUED NOA 03/13/23
Date: April 03, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES;)
Date: April 10, 2023Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Eva Cepeida (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Continuance)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Progress Place (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Continuance) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Progress Place (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Progress Place (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension) Filed by Eva Cepeida (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Eva Cepeida (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Eva Cepeida (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by Eva Cepeida (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Service o...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Tentative Decision Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Eva Cepeida (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Managem...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-03T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Eva Cepeida (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter;) of , Tentative Decision) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order Filed by Eva Cepeida (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ((Non-Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Dora Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Maria Lopez (Plaintiff); Jose Rivera (Plaintiff) et al.
Date: 2022-09-02T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (AMENDED) Filed by Eva Cepeida (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Eva Cepeida (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-07T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Demurrer) Filed by Eva Cepeida (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Service o...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by Eva Cepeida (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Eva Cepeida (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Minute Order ((Non-Jury Trial; Final Status Conference; Non-Appearance Cas...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Receipt of Request for Statemen...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-05T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Dora Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Maria Lopez (Plaintiff); Jose Rivera (Plaintiff) et al.
Date: 2022-09-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Notice (of informal discovery conference) Filed by Progress Place (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Eva Cepeida (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Informal Discovery Conference;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Answer Filed by Eva Cepeida (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-05T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Protective Order) Filed by Dora Gonzalez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Minute Order ((Non-Jury Trial;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) DEFE...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Continuance))
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Continuance) of 12/07/2020)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Notice (of informal discovery conference)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring or Moving Party in Support of Automatic Extension)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (AMENDED)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Informal Discovery Conference;))
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Declaration (OF DEMURRING OR MOVING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION)
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) DEFE...))
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Demurrer)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference;))
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Service o...))
Date: 2021-08-19T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE)
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Notice (in support of Opposition to Demurrer)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Service o...))
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.