Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
G&N Marinewerks Inc. A California Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Conway Michael, against Namdar Bijan Aka Bijan Gianni Namdar, represented by Wall William J., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Jon R. Takasugi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJon R. Takasugi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management112 days |
Filing DateJune 18, 2020 |
CategoryFraud (No Contract) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: G&N MARINEWERKS INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: G&N MARINEWERKS INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Declaration William J. Wall in response to OSC; Filed by: Bijan Namdar (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: G&N MARINEWERKS INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Complaint
Date: June 18, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: June 18, 2020Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: June 18, 2020Answer
Date: July 27, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: October 08, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: April 15, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: April 28, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 28, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 04, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: December 06, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (FURTHER))
Date: March 17, 2023Summons (on Complaint) Filed by G&N MARINEWERKS INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by G&N MARINEWERKS INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by G&N MARINEWERKS INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Answer Filed by Bijan Namdar (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Sanction ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by G&N MARINEWERKS INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute; O...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by G&N MARINEWERKS INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Complaint Filed by G&N MARINEWERKS INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by G&N MARINEWERKS INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Declaration (William J. Wall in response to OSC)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 10/08/2020)
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Michael J. Conway re Order to Show Case)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute; O...))
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Sanction ...))
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Declaration (William J. Wall in response to OSC) Filed by Bijan Namdar (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2023 | Hearing |
Department 17 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) |
|
December 15, 2023 | Hearing |
Department 17 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Trial Setting Conference |
|
July 27, 2023 | Hearing | Post-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
July 27, 2023 | Hearing | Trial Setting Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17 | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Post-Mediation Status Conference; Final Status Conference) | |
July 27, 2023 | Hearing | Final Status Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
July 27, 2023 | Hearing | Non-Jury Trial (3-5 day estimate) scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on | |
July 27, 2023 | Hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17 | |
April 24, 2023 | Hearing |
Department 17 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Non-Jury Trial |
|
April 13, 2023 | Hearing |
Department 17 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Final Status Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.