Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cbc Settlement Funding Llc, filed a(n) Other Civil Petition (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Scharg Erin Marie, against Dickerson T., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Yolanda Orozco presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeYolanda Orozco Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 20, 2020 |
CategoryOther Civil Petition (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Hearing on Petition]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Declaration Explaining Payees Remaining Payments; Filed by: CBC Settlement Funding, LLC (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 20, 2020Petition - PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS
Date: October 20, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 20, 2020Notice of Hearing on Petition
Date: October 21, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION]
Date: October 21, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 13, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SE...)
Date: December 16, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/18/2020
Date: December 18, 2020Unknown - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: December 18, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: December 18, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION EXPLAINING PAYEES REMAINING PAYMENTS
Date: December 29, 2020Order - ORDER ORDER APPROVING TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS
Date: January 12, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by CBC Settlement Funding, LLC (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Petition Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by CBC Settlement Funding, LLC (Petitioner)
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Hearing on Petition]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition for Approval of Transfer of Structured Se...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Petition for Approval of Transfer o...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Petition
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/18/2020)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition for Approval of Transfer of Structured Se...))
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Hearing on Petition])
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Petition (for Approval of Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Declaration (Explaining Payees Remaining Payments -[Hrg: 1/12/2021])
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.