Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Capital Equity Management Group Inc, filed a(n) Fraud: Unlimited case represented by Dyer, Dustin J, Esq., Dyer Law Firm, against Brenda Gillum, Carter, Mary Rose, Carter, William Keith, Castleberry, George, Castleberry, Richard, (total of 27) See All represented by Brunn &Amp; Flynn, Benbrook, Bradley A, Esq., Hendrickson, Kurt D, Esq., Parish, William H, Esq., Sahota, Mahanvir S, Esq., (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Silveira, Marie Sovey presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management122 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2017 |
CategoryFraud: Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2024 |
||
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Request for Dismissal - Entire Action
Date: August 10, 2021Proposed Judgment/Order
Date: December 26, 2018Notice of Change of Firm Name and/or Address
Date: November 27, 2018Declaration
Date: September 11, 2017Proof of Service
Date: October 16, 2017Declaration
Date: June 09, 2017Proof of Service
Date: January 27, 2020Case Management Conference Statement
Date: February 16, 2018Notice of Demurrer
Date: June 09, 2017Case Management Conference Statement
Date: May 19, 2017Case Management Conference Statement
Date: December 11, 2018Minute Order- Reassignment
Date: January 19, 2021Case Management Conference Statement
Date: May 26, 2017Case Management Conference Statement
Date: September 23, 2020Stipulation and Order
Date: February 04, 2019Notice
Date: February 26, 2018Declaration
Date: January 27, 2020Order
Date: February 01, 2018Order Granted
Date: August 13, 2018Opposition to Motion
Date: July 07, 2017Substitution of Attorney
Date: February 18, 2020Declaration
Date: October 16, 2017Ex Parte Application
Date: December 05, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: March 17, 2021Reply to Opposition
Date: February 11, 2020Stipulation & Order to Continue a Hearing
Date: December 03, 2019Law and Motion Filed
Date: March 07, 2017Notice of Motion & Motion
Date: January 27, 2020Reply to Opposition
Date: April 06, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: September 05, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: April 04, 2017Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 27, 2020Case Management Conference Statement
Date: November 17, 2017Case Management Conference Statement
Date: February 16, 2018Substitution of Attorney
Date: February 18, 2020Order Granted
Date: September 25, 2019Case Management Conference Order
Date: March 05, 2018Declaration
Date: December 05, 2017Case Management Conference Statement
Date: May 02, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: May 04, 2017Case Management Conference Statement
Date: December 20, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: September 05, 2017Notice
Date: November 22, 2017Notice
Date: April 10, 2017Opposition
Date: December 05, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: March 17, 2021Case Management Conference Statement
Date: December 28, 2018Points and Authorities
Date: March 24, 2017Notice of Motion & Motion
Date: September 11, 2017Declaration
Date: September 05, 2017Notice of Motion & Motion
Date: September 08, 2017Declaration
Date: June 05, 2017Proof of Service - Mail
Date: September 06, 2018Case Management Conference Statement
Date: May 03, 2019Reply to Opposition
Date: March 30, 2017Proposed Order
Date: October 19, 2018Minute Order
Date: October 17, 2017Notice
Date: September 16, 2020Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: August 12, 2021Case Management Conference Statement
Date: August 24, 2018Notice
Date: June 09, 2017Order Granted
Date: June 19, 2019Opposition
Date: March 24, 2017Declaration
Date: March 17, 2021Declaration
Date: April 04, 2017Demurrer
Date: September 11, 2017Minute Order
Date: December 06, 2017Proof of Service
Date: July 07, 2017Reply to Opposition
Date: July 13, 2017Proof of Service
Date: September 05, 2017Minute Order
Date: January 09, 2019Objection
Date: February 11, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: February 18, 2020Amended Complaint
Date: August 04, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: June 09, 2017Case Management Conference Statement
Date: May 19, 2017Case Management Conference Statement
Date: December 20, 2019Demurrer
Date: June 09, 2017Advance Jury Fee (Non-Refundable)
Date: May 19, 2017Notice
Date: May 26, 2017Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 03, 20201st Appearance Fees- Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: February 03, 2017Fees Mediation/Sanctions
Date: June 06, 2017Case Management Conference Statement
Date: April 30, 2019Case Management Conference Statement
Date: September 06, 2019Case Management Conference Statement
Date: September 30, 2020Proposed Judgment/Order
Date: August 08, 2018Case Management Conference Statement
Date: May 06, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: September 11, 2017Case Management Conference Order
Date: January 14, 2019Case Management Conference Statement
Date: November 01, 2017Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 27, 2020Minute Order
Date: September 19, 2017Stipulation and Order
Date: October 25, 2018Objection
Date: February 03, 2020Case Management Conference Statement
Date: August 21, 2018Case Management Conference Statement
Date: January 26, 2018Case Management Conference Order
Date: December 04, 2017Substitution of Attorney
Date: February 18, 2020Stipulation & Order to Continue a Hearing
Date: October 02, 2019Request for Dismissal - Party Only
Date: March 15, 2021Case Management Conference Statement
Date: February 28, 2018Stipulation and Order
Date: April 02, 2019Case Management Conference Statement
Date: January 02, 2019Proof of Service
Date: November 22, 2017Substitution of Attorney
Date: February 18, 2020Order Granted
Date: December 03, 2019Opposition
Date: February 03, 2020Notice of Motion & Motion
Date: September 05, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: March 17, 2021Stipulation & Order to Continue a Hearing
Date: June 21, 2019Order Granted
Date: February 09, 2018Case Management Conference Statement
Date: November 17, 2017Case Management Conference Statement
Date: December 17, 2019Demurrer
Date: April 04, 2017Notice
Date: April 10, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: June 09, 2017Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: February 03, 2017Minute Order
Date: July 20, 2017Law and Motion Filed
Date: April 04, 2017Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 24, 2017Proof of Service
Date: March 07, 2017Stipulation and Order
Date: February 13, 2018Notice of Demurrer
Date: June 09, 2017Proof of Service
Date: October 16, 2017Proposed Order
Date: May 04, 2018Reply to Opposition
Date: July 13, 2017Fees Mediation/Sanctions
Date: May 19, 2017Declaration
Date: March 24, 2017Declaration
Date: March 07, 2017Case Management Conference Statement
Date: August 22, 2019Demurrer
Date: September 05, 2017Advance Jury Fee (Non-Refundable)
Date: June 06, 2017Law and Motion Filed
Date: April 10, 2017Opposition
Date: October 16, 2017Case Management Conference Statement
Date: May 22, 2017Stipulation and Order
Date: May 08, 2018Notice of Dropped Hearing
Date: May 10, 2017Case Management Conference Order
Date: June 05, 2017Notice
Date: March 10, 2017Notice of Hearing
Date: April 04, 2017Notice of Demurrer
Date: September 12, 2017Answer
Date: March 06, 2017Case Management Conference Statement
Date: October 09, 2020Opposition
Date: February 03, 2020Notice of Demurrer
Date: September 12, 2017Summons
Date: February 03, 2017Substitution of Attorney
Date: February 18, 2020Order Granted
Date: November 27, 2017Ex Parte Application
Date: October 16, 2017Notice of Change of Address
Date: May 30, 2017Proof of Service
Date: May 26, 2017Order Granted
Date: April 02, 2019Declaration
Date: July 07, 2017Notice of Demurrer
Date: September 11, 2017Notice of Demurrer
Date: September 05, 2017Order Granted
Date: April 10, 2017Proof of Service
Date: June 09, 2017Stipulation and Order
Date: August 16, 2018Stipulation and Order
Date: November 28, 2017Request for Dismissal - Party Only
Date: March 15, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 17, 2021Demurrer
Date: June 09, 2017Declaration
Date: February 11, 2020Proof of Service
Date: December 05, 2017Notice
Date: June 09, 2017Notice of Motion & Motion
Date: September 11, 2017Case Management Conference Order
Date: September 10, 2018Notice
Date: September 06, 2018Order Granted
Date: April 14, 2017Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 05, 2017Case Management Conference Statement
Date: September 09, 2019Notice of Motion & Motion
Date: September 05, 2017Opposition
Date: December 05, 2017Civil Complaint
Date: February 03, 2017Minute Order
Date: April 07, 2017Proof of Service
Date: September 05, 2017Answer
Date: May 17, 2017Proof of Service
Date: June 09, 2017Civil Case Cover Sheet - Plaintiff(s)
Date: February 03, 2017Case Management Conference Statement
Date: August 24, 2018Proof of Service
Date: February 18, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: January 27, 2020Demurrer
Date: September 05, 2017Proof of Service
Date: April 06, 2017Objection
Date: March 17, 2021Opposition
Date: February 06, 2020Case Management Conference Statement
Date: September 25, 2020Notice of Motion & Motion
Date: September 08, 2017Law & Motion
Date: July 20, 2017Case Management Conference
Date: April 26, 2021Motion for Joinder
Date: April 01, 2021Demurrer
Date: April 01, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: October 13, 2020Motion for Joinder
Date: July 01, 2020Demurrer
Date: April 03, 2019Motion for Joinder
Date: April 03, 2019Demurrer
Date: January 09, 2019Case Management Conference
Date: September 10, 2018Motion for Joinder
Date: January 09, 2019Demurrer
Date: July 01, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: June 05, 2017Law & Motion
Date: April 07, 2017Case Management Conference
Date: March 05, 2018Case Management Conference
Date: May 20, 2019Case Management Conference
Date: January 06, 2020Motion: Other Pre-Disposition
Date: February 20, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: September 23, 2019Case Management Conference
Date: January 14, 2019Demurrer
Date: July 20, 2017Exparte Appointment Hearing
Date: December 06, 2017Case Management Conference
Date: December 04, 2017Exparte Appointment Hearing
Date: October 17, 2017Demurrer
Date: February 20, 2020Motion for Joinder
Date: February 20, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Entire Action | |
April 26, 2021 | Hearing | Case Management Conference | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Salter, Timothy W |
|
April 01, 2021 | Motion for Joinder | ||
April 01, 2021 | Demurrer | ||
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Demurrer
Judge: Silveira, Marie Sovey |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Joinder
Judge: Silveira, Marie Sovey |
|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities | |
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points and Authorities |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.