Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Chi-Kan Liu, Li-Yuan Liu, Patrick Lin, Sherry Hsieh, Yeao-Nan Hsieh, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by Frank Joseph Perretta, against Jemmy Lin, May Lin, Min Chou, Patrick Lin, Rosa Wang, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Maureen A. Folan presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 28, 2015 |
CategoryOther Petition (Not Spec) Unlimited (43) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions128 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Memorandum of Costs
Date: February 19, 2020Motion: Summary Judgment/Adjudication
Date: September 04, 2018Memorandum of Costs
Date: February 13, 2020Ex Parte Application - Notice Required
Date: October 19, 2018Ex Parte Application - Notice Required
Date: September 20, 2019Minute Order
Date: December 13, 2018Minute Order
Date: March 13, 2019Motion: Compel
Date: November 09, 2017Motion: Compel
Date: May 22, 2018Hearing: Other
Date: February 13, 2018Motion: Compel
Date: September 04, 2018Motion: Compel
Date: April 12, 2018Motion: Compel
Date: January 09, 2018Order: Ex Parte
Date: October 19, 2018Order: Ex Parte
Date: August 10, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: August 10, 2018Statement: Settlement Conference
Date: October 17, 2018Ex Parte Application - Notice Required
Date: September 27, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: August 08, 2018Separate Statement
Date: August 08, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: June 18, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: September 20, 2019Minute Order
Date: October 17, 2018Ex Parte Application - Notice Required
Date: September 13, 2018Order: Ex Parte
Date: September 14, 2018Minute Order
Date: September 04, 2018Ex Parte Application - Notice Required
Date: August 29, 2018Memorandum of Costs
Date: August 30, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: May 11, 2018Response/Reply
Date: April 09, 2018Order: Ex Parte
Date: August 29, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: August 13, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: August 21, 2018Motion: Order
Date: August 29, 2018Ex Parte Application - Notice Required
Date: August 10, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: August 10, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: August 10, 2018Minute Order
Date: May 31, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: May 16, 2018Motion (Amended)
Date: May 16, 2018Ex Parte Application - Notice Required
Date: May 11, 2018Minute Order
Date: May 22, 2018Order: Show Cause
Date: May 11, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: May 11, 2018Response/Reply
Date: April 09, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: April 09, 2018Response/Reply
Date: April 09, 2018Minute Order
Date: April 12, 2018Response/Reply
Date: January 02, 2018Minute Order
Date: January 16, 2018Minute Order
Date: January 17, 2018Motion: Compel
Date: March 13, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: February 28, 2018Minute Order
Date: February 22, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: February 05, 2018Minute Order
Date: February 16, 2018Order
Date: February 14, 2018Response/Reply
Date: February 05, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: February 05, 2018Minute Order
Date: February 28, 2017Opposition/Objections
Date: January 12, 2018Order: Submitted Matter
Date: February 21, 2018Minute Order
Date: November 09, 2017Minute Order
Date: August 23, 2016Minute Order
Date: April 19, 2016Minute Order
Date: May 23, 2017Minute Order
Date: May 03, 2016Minute Order
Date: March 24, 2016Minute Order
Date: October 12, 2016Minute Order
Date: December 01, 2016Minute Order
Date: May 24, 2016Minute Order
Date: February 24, 2016Minute Order
Date: March 01, 2016Judgment
Date: February 03, 2020Separate Statement
Date: February 28, 2018Motion: Tax Costs
Date: February 28, 2020Separate Statement
Date: February 28, 2018Notice: Entry of Order
Date: August 10, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: August 13, 2018Response/Reply
Date: August 24, 2018Brief: Trial
Date: October 19, 2018Motion: Compel
Date: February 28, 2018Statement: Settlement Conference
Date: October 10, 2018Motion: Compel
Date: August 13, 2018Conference: Trial Setting
Date: September 08, 2020Opposition/Objections
Date: September 19, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: June 18, 2018Notice: Entry of Order
Date: September 07, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: July 28, 2020Response/Reply
Date: August 24, 2018Request: Judicial Notice
Date: June 18, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: June 18, 2018Conference: Trial Setting
Date: May 23, 2017Conference: Trial Setting
Date: December 11, 2018Notice: Entry of Order
Date: August 29, 2018Conference: Trial Setting
Date: February 13, 2018Motion: Summary Judgment
Date: June 18, 2018Minute Order
Date: December 10, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: June 18, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: May 09, 2018Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear
Date: December 01, 2016Notice: Entry of Order
Date: September 20, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: July 22, 2020Declaration: In Support
Date: February 28, 2018Request: Judicial Notice
Date: July 27, 2020Motion: Strike
Date: August 04, 2020Notice: Entry of Order
Date: May 11, 2018Conference: Trial Setting
Date: March 10, 2020Conference: Settlement Jury
Date: October 17, 2018Conference: Trial Setting
Date: March 12, 2019Order: Ex Parte
Date: September 20, 2019Separate Statement
Date: June 18, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: July 28, 2020Opposition/Objections
Date: August 24, 2018Conference: Trial Setting
Date: January 09, 2018Order: Ex Parte
Date: September 27, 2019Minute Order
Date: August 04, 2020Notice: Entry of Order
Date: February 04, 2020Notice: Entry of Order
Date: February 23, 2018Minute Order
Date: March 11, 2020Conference: Trial Setting
Date: May 22, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: September 19, 2018Conference: Trial Setting
Date: December 10, 2019Notice: Entry of Order
Date: April 12, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2020 | Hearing |
Motion: Strike
Judge: Department 6 |
|
September 08, 2020 | Hearing |
Conference: Trial Setting
Judge: Department 6 |
|
August 04, 2020 | Hearing |
Motion: Strike
Judge: Department 6 |
|
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections Opposition to Motion to Strike by Def Yeao-Nan Hshieh (In Per Pro) 08/04/20 & Sherry Hsieh (In Per Pro) |
|
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections Opposotion to Interpreter Fees by Plt Sherry & Yeao-Nan Hsieh (In Per Pro) |
|
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Mail | |
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request: Judicial Notice Request for Judicial Notice |
|
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration of Frank J. Perretta in Support of Opposition to Motion to Strike | |
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections Opposition to Mtn to Strike |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.