Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Skucas, Deborah, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Vazirinejad, Mirali, against County Of San Mateo, Does 1 To 100, Inclusive, State Of California Acting By And Through Department Of Transportation, State Of California Department Of Transportation, represented by Gonzalez, Jose, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Foiles, Robert D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2020 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Management Statement
Date: November 24, 2021Notice of Reassignment for All Purposes
Date: February 05, 2021Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: July 20, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: April 05, 2021Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties)
Date: May 10, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: April 06, 2021Answer (Unlimited)
Date: February 09, 2021Case Management and Trial Setting Statement
Date: November 24, 2021Statement of Non-Agreement
Date: October 21, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: June 29, 20213.Proposed Order to Continue Trial Date
Date: April 11, 20221.Stipulation to Continue Trial Date
Date: April 11, 20222.Cover Sheet
Date: April 11, 20224.28.22 Notice of Entry of Order
Date: April 28, 20226.14.22 Notice of Unavailability
Date: June 14, 2022Proposed Order Received
Date: April 11, 2022Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: December 14, 2021PROPOSED ORDER COVER SHEET
Date: April 11, 2022Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial
Date: December 14, 2021Notice of Unavailability of Counsel
Date: June 14, 2022Notice of Entry of Order
Date: April 28, 2022Affidavit of Mailing
Date: April 26, 2022Order
Date: April 26, 2022Stipulation
Date: April 11, 2022Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: October 28, 2021Summons Issued / Filed
Date: December 09, 2020Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: January 12, 2021Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: April 05, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: April 21, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: December 10, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: April 07, 2021Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: December 13, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: April 21, 2021ADR Referral
Date: July 01, 2021Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: January 14, 2021Complaint
Date: December 09, 2020Proposed Order w Cover Sheet
Date: September 16, 2022Stipulation to Continue Trial Date - signed WITH pos
Date: September 16, 20229.21.22 Notice of Entry of Order 2
Date: September 21, 2022State's Memorandum of Points + Authorities
Date: February 11, 2023State's Separate Statement
Date: February 11, 2023Proof of Service
Date: February 11, 2023Proposed Order
Date: February 11, 2023State's Notice + Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: February 11, 20232154425_1_State_s_Index_of_Evidence_2
Date: February 11, 20232154425_2_Proof_of_Service
Date: February 11, 20232.17.23 State's Amended Notice + Motion
Date: February 17, 20234.3.23 Notice of Settlement
Date: April 04, 20234.19.23 Request for Dismissal - signed
Date: April 19, 2023Proposed Order Received
Date: September 16, 20224.25.23 State's Notice of Entry of Dismissal
Date: April 25, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 09, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event | 4.25.23 State's Notice of Entry of Dismissal | |
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event | 4.19.23 Request for Dismissal - signed | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | 4.3.23 Notice of Settlement | |
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event | 2.17.23 State's Amended Notice + Motion | |
February 11, 2023 | Docket Event | State's Memorandum of Points + Authorities | |
February 11, 2023 | Docket Event | State's Separate Statement | |
February 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
February 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
February 11, 2023 | Docket Event | State's Notice + Motion for Summary Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.