Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Eichman, Ron, Li, Lin, Zheng, Da Qing, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Adams, Michael E., against Amazing Wok, Does 1 To 20, Liao, Lisa Lin, Li, Lin, Lin, Xi Fen, (total of 6) See All represented by Sherman, Lee A., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Fineman, Nancy L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFineman, Nancy L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 15, 2020 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Last RefreshedApril 11, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is filed by Ron Eichman against defendants XI FIN LIN, LISA LIN LIAO, LIN LI, DA QING ZHENG, AMAZING WOK, and DOES 1 through 20. Ron Eichman alleges that on August 19, 2018, while he was a customer at the defendants' restaurant located...
9563506182024d2f
Date: April 09, 2024956350618201340f
Date: April 09, 20249563506182006e94
Date: April 09, 2024RESPONSE TO OSC (March 14 '24)
Date: March 15, 2024Complaint
Date: June 15, 2020Answer (Unlimited)
Date: July 22, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: November 18, 2020Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: December 10, 2020Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel
Date: January 12, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: October 08, 2020Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: February 08, 2021Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel
Date: January 12, 2021Cross Complaint
Date: July 22, 2020Request For Dismissal
Date: November 06, 2020Motion to Compel Further
Date: March 09, 2021Answer (Unlimited)
Date: August 17, 2020Separate Statement
Date: January 12, 2021Motion to Compel Production of Documents
Date: March 09, 2021Motion to Compel Further
Date: March 09, 2021Notice
Date: January 15, 2021Notice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case
Date: March 04, 2021Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action
Date: May 13, 2021Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action
Date: October 13, 2021Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Further Responses
Date: January 12, 2021Separate Statement
Date: January 12, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: January 12, 2021Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action
Date: July 06, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: January 12, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: January 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | 9563506182024d2f | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | 956350618201340f | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | 9563506182006e94 | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO OSC (March 14 '24) | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action 10/13/2021 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action Judge: Fineman, Nancy L. |
|
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Party appeared by audio and/or video Attorney Michael Adam for Plaintiff and Attorney Shawn Prado for Defendants |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney as to Former Attorney: CHRISTOPHER W GOODROENew Attorney: MICHAEL E ADAMS Substitution of Attorney as to Former Attorney: CHRISTOPHER W GOODROE New Attorney: MICHAEL E ADAMS |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action 07/06/2021 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - 10/13/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - 10/13/2021 at 9:00 a.m. |
|
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action 05/13/2021 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action Judge: Reyna, Renee C. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.