Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Arata, Laura, Peninsula Open Space Trust, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Galanter, Tamara S, against Arata, Laura, Arata, Louis J., Arata, Marie Joanne, Does 1-20, John And Grace Arata 2004 Trust, (total of 7) See All represented by Choi, Eric H., Levinson, Benjamin R., Pollak, Corey M., Wiegel, Andrew J, Wiegel, Ansrew J, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Fineman, Nancy L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFineman, Nancy L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 03, 2020 |
Category(26) Unlimited Other Real Property |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is filed by the Peninsula Open Space Trust (POST) against Redwood Trust Deed Services, Inc. and other defendants. The complaint alleges that Redwood Trust Deed Services intends to conduct a trustee sale of a portion of the Arata Ranch,...
Cross Complaint
Date: July 24, 2020Order
Date: August 03, 2020Answer
Date: August 10, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: October 29, 2020Declaration
Date: August 17, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: September 23, 2020Answer (Unlimited)
Date: July 24, 2020Declaration
Date: September 23, 2020Case Management Order
Date: September 22, 2020Demurrer to Cross-Complaint
Date: September 23, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: September 24, 2020Demurrer to Cross-Complaint
Date: September 24, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: October 22, 2020Declaration
Date: September 24, 2020Declaration in Opposition
Date: October 22, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: February 03, 2021Objection
Date: April 12, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: April 19, 2021Order
Date: May 12, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: February 11, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: March 01, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: February 09, 2021Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties)
Date: May 26, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: March 05, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: March 01, 2021Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Date: November 05, 2020Answer (Unlimited)
Date: June 16, 2020Complaint
Date: June 03, 2020Answer (Unlimited)
Date: July 20, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: July 27, 2020Plaintiff's Brief re:
Date: October 29, 2020Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Date: July 27, 2020Objection
Date: October 30, 2020Preliminary Injunction
Date: August 20, 2020Answer (Unlimited)
Date: July 28, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: February 11, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: November 09, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: November 04, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: November 12, 2020Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division
Date: November 03, 202010 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: June 01, 2021Answer (Unlimited)
Date: December 24, 2020Demurrer to Amended Cross-Complaint
Date: February 11, 2021Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: December 10, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: January 25, 2021Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: January 15, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: April 06, 2021Stipulation & Order
Date: November 10, 2021Declaration
Date: March 05, 2021Demurrer to
Date: December 10, 2020Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties)
Date: June 09, 2021Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Date: November 24, 2021Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: June 14, 2021Notice
Date: November 24, 2021Notice_of_Change_of_Address_Levinson
Date: January 20, 2022MPA ISO Fee Motion
Date: April 15, 2022Clark Decl ISO Fee Motion
Date: April 15, 2022Exhibits A-M Clark Decl ISO Fee Motion
Date: April 15, 2022Notice and Fee Motion
Date: April 15, 2022Exhibits N-AA Clark Decl ISO Fee Motion
Date: April 15, 2022Schmidt Decl ISO Fee Motion
Date: April 15, 2022Prop Order Re Fee Motion
Date: April 15, 2022POS Fee Motion
Date: April 15, 2022Amended Prop Order Re Fees
Date: April 20, 2022Decl. of AJW in Opposition to Fee Motion
Date: June 21, 2022Decl. of GRP in Opposition to Fee Motion
Date: June 21, 2022Final_Arata_Opposition_t_on_for_Attorney_Fees
Date: June 21, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: June 03, 2020Summons Issued / Filed
Date: June 03, 2020Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: July 08, 2020Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: July 08, 2020Proposed Order Received
Date: July 27, 2020Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: July 08, 2020Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: August 17, 2020Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: July 27, 2020Proposed Order Received
Date: August 17, 2020Ex Parte Application
Date: August 03, 2020Stipulation
Date: October 02, 2020Affidavit of Mailing
Date: September 22, 2020Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: September 24, 2020Stipulation & Order
Date: August 19, 2020Notice of Entry of Order
Date: October 28, 2020Advanced Jury Fee Defendant Non-Refundable
Date: September 22, 2020Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: September 23, 2020Amended Cross-Complaint
Date: November 03, 2020Application
Date: November 16, 2020Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: October 22, 2020Order
Date: October 06, 2020Hearing on Demurrer
Date: November 17, 2020Proposed Order Received
Date: November 16, 2020Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: October 30, 2020Proposed Order Received
Date: November 16, 2020Answer
Date: November 09, 2020Undertaking
Date: November 25, 2020Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of
Date: November 30, 2020Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: January 25, 2021Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: February 11, 2021Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: December 03, 2020Notice of Hearing re
Date: January 29, 2021Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: December 10, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: February 04, 2021Request
Date: October 29, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: May 05, 2021Notice
Date: April 12, 2021ADR Referral
Date: May 05, 2021Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: January 10, 2022Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: June 10, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: December 30, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: April 15, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: April 21, 2021Substitution of Attorney as to
Date: August 02, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: December 22, 2021Proposed Order Received
Date: November 24, 2021Affidavit of Mailing
Date: November 10, 2021Proposed Order Received
Date: October 29, 2021Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: November 10, 2021Substitution of Attorney as to
Date: December 21, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: February 10, 2022Proposed Order Received
Date: April 15, 2022Proposed Order Received
Date: April 20, 2022Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Date: February 04, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: December 22, 2021Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: October 29, 2021Exhibit List
Date: April 15, 2022Motion
Date: April 15, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: January 10, 2022Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: March 02, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: June 21, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: February 28, 2022Exhibit List
Date: April 15, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: April 15, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 03, 2020Stipulation
Date: August 17, 2020Request to Enter Default
Date: September 30, 2020Request
Date: October 01, 2020Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: November 09, 2020Proposed Order Received
Date: October 02, 2020Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of
Date: November 30, 2020Order
Date: November 18, 2020Hearing on Demurrer
Date: March 12, 2021Hearing on Demurrer
Date: April 23, 2021Substitution of Attorney as to
Date: July 20, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: December 21, 2021Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: May 27, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: April 15, 2022Notice of Change of Address of Attorney
Date: January 20, 2022Final_Motion_Leave_to_File_Cross_Complaint_1_
Date: June 23, 2022Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of
Date: August 10, 2020Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: November 16, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: October 29, 2021Motion for Leave to File
Date: June 23, 2022Declaration in Opposition
Date: June 20, 2022Notice of Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: June 23, 2022Reply MPA ISO Fees Motion
Date: June 24, 2022POS Reply ISO Fees Motion
Date: June 24, 2022Prop Order re Attorneys Fees and Costs
Date: June 24, 2022Clark Supp Dec ISO Fees Motion
Date: June 24, 2022Final_Motion_Leave_to_Fi_oss_Complaint_1_1_1_
Date: June 27, 2022Declaration_of_Peter_Kim_with_POS_2_
Date: June 27, 2022SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY W POS
Date: June 30, 2022Proposed Order Received
Date: June 24, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: June 24, 2022Substitution of Attorney as to
Date: June 30, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: June 27, 2022Amended Notice of Motion and Motion to
Date: June 27, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: June 24, 2022Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: June 24, 2022Declaration in Reply
Date: October 29, 2020Notice of Entry of Order
Date: June 22, 2021Notice of Entry of Order
Date: November 19, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 11, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: July 27, 2020Notice of Entry of Order
Date: November 19, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 23, 2020Notice
Date: December 03, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: October 22, 2020Notice
Date: October 29, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: July 31, 2020Declaration
Date: April 09, 2021Order
Date: November 19, 2020Notice of Entry of Order
Date: August 04, 2020POST Case Management Statement
Date: August 04, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: August 04, 2022CMS_POS
Date: August 10, 2022Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: July 01, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: August 10, 2022Prop Order Relating Cases
Date: August 23, 2022Notice of Entry of Order Relating Cases
Date: August 26, 2022POST Case Management Statement
Date: August 29, 20225839-231 - Ntc Association - FSF
Date: September 12, 2022mc050 signed 20civ02349
Date: December 05, 2022POST Request for Dismissal
Date: December 27, 2022POST Notice of Entry of Dismissal
Date: January 03, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: September 22, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: July 31, 2020Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division
Date: July 24, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event | POST Notice of Entry of Dismissal | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | POST Request for Dismissal | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Leave
Judge: Foiles, Robert D |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | mc050 signed 20civ02349 | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Attorney Fees PER LR Judge: Foiles, Robert D |
|
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Attorney Fees
Judge: Foiles, Robert D |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | 5839-231 - Ntc Association - FSF | |
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event | POST Case Management Statement | |
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Judge: Foiles, Robert D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.