Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
1World Online, Inc., A California Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ahn, Mimi, against Blockchain Generation, An Unknown Business Entity, Does1 Through 50,Inclusive, Grimm, Matthew, represented by Marotta, Paul David, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Foiles, Robert D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 06, 2020 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Joinder
Date: September 29, 20202022-11-21 Stipulation for Entry of Judgment
Date: November 21, 20222022-11-21 Proposed Judgment
Date: November 21, 20222022-11-21 Declaration ISO Interest
Date: November 21, 20222022-11-21 M. Ahn Dec. ISO Entry of Proposed Judgment
Date: November 21, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: April 29, 2020Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: April 29, 2020Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: July 07, 2020Stipulation & Order
Date: July 30, 2020Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action
Date: October 18, 2022Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal
Date: November 16, 2022Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action
Date: November 16, 2022Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal
Date: October 04, 2022Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal
Date: October 20, 20222022-11-21 Declaration ISO Interest
Date: November 28, 20222022-11-21 Proposed Judgment
Date: November 28, 20222022-11-21 M. Ahn Dec. ISO Entry of Proposed Judgment
Date: November 28, 20222022-11-21 Stipulation for Entry of Judgment
Date: November 28, 20222022-12-02 Memorandum of Costs
Date: December 03, 2022Complaint
Date: March 06, 2020Notice of Reassignment for All Purposes
Date: February 03, 2021Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: December 03, 2020Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case
Date: August 26, 2020Joinder
Date: July 08, 2020Case Management Order
Date: July 02, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: June 24, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: June 18, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: April 29, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: April 29, 2020Demurrer to
Date: April 29, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 06, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action
Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
|
December 03, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022-12-02 Memorandum of Costs | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022-11-21 Declaration ISO Interest | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022-11-21 Proposed Judgment | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022-11-21 M. Ahn Dec. ISO Entry of Proposed Judgment | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022-11-21 Stipulation for Entry of Judgment | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022-11-21 Stipulation for Entry of Judgment | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022-11-21 Proposed Judgment | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022-11-21 Declaration ISO Interest | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022-11-21 M. Ahn Dec. ISO Entry of Proposed Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.