Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Casa Real Properties Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Long H.G., against Elmore Norris, Smith Reginald L, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Thomas D. Long presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 11, 2019 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer/Residential (Not Drugs Or Wrongful Eviction) (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Answer; Filed by: REGINALD L SMITH (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S COPY OF GRANT DEED; Filed by: CASA REAL PROPERTIES, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: REGINALD L SMITH (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Request to Waive Additional Court Fees (Superior Court); Filed by: REGINALD L SMITH (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Complaint - Complaint
Date: March 11, 2019Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: March 11, 2019Answer - Answer
Date: March 18, 2019Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: March 26, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: March 26, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: March 26, 2019Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial - Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial
Date: March 28, 2019Other - (name extension) - PLAINTIFF'S COPY OF GRANT DEED
Date: April 19, 2019Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer
Date: April 19, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (COURT TRIAL - FAILURE TO APPEAR)
Date: April 19, 2019Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession
Date: April 29, 2019Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession
Date: April 29, 2019Writ - Return - Writ - Return
Date: August 07, 2019Answer; Filed by: REGINALD L SMITH (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S COPY OF GRANT DEED; Filed by: CASA REAL PROPERTIES, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Request to Waive Additional Court Fees (Superior Court); Filed by: REGINALD L SMITH (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: REGINALD L SMITH (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ - Return ( Wholly Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied | |
August 07, 2019 | Writ - Return - Writ - Return | ||
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Application for Writ of Possession; Filed by: CASA REAL PROPERTIES, LLC (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 25.00 | |
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession; Issued by: CASA REAL PROPERTIES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: NORRIS ELMORE (Defendant); REGINALD L SMITH (Defendant) | |
April 29, 2019 | Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession | ||
April 29, 2019 | Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession | ||
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession; Issued by: CASA REAL PROPERTIES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: NORRIS ELMORE (Defendant); REGINALD L SMITH (Defendant) | |
April 22, 2019 | Hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
April 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/20/2019 in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/22/2019 | |
April 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Default judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff CASA REAL PROPERTIES, LLC against Defendant NORRIS ELMORE on the Complaint filed by CASA REAL PROPERTIES, LLC on for a total of $0.00. Any credit or accrued costs on one judgment in this case shall apply to all judgments in this case.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 715 W 58TH ST, LOS ANGELES, CA 90037 is granted for plaintiff(s);; Lease Agreement under which the property is held is hereby forfeited. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.