Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Garcia Alvaro, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Ellis Andrew L., Ellis Andrew Lawrence, against Bansuan M.D. Rainer, Bansuan Rainer, Behavioral Health Services Inc. A California Corp, Bhs - American Recovery Center, Bhs - American Recovery Center A Business Form Unknown, (total of 9) See All represented by Chang Chiayu V., Holm Margaret M., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Daniel M. Crowley presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management329 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions90 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Continuing Demurrer) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Alvaro Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Order Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Order Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Alvaro Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Son Le (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Rainer Bansuan (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: BHS - American Recovery Center, (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES, INC., a California Corp (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Tuan D. Nguyen (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Alvaro Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-03T00:00:00Order Final Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Alvaro Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Order Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Order As to the Court's Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: May 23, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Alvaro Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-02T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Alvaro Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-28T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-27T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Alvaro Garcia (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2023-05-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-05-09T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Alvaro Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-28T00:00:00Order Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-08T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: Rainer Bansuan (Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-03T00:00:00Order Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-09T00:00:00Order Court's Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Order Tentative Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Complaint
Date: December 19, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: December 19, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: December 19, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: January 29, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: January 31, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 06, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: February 11, 2020Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: February 21, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CONTINUING DEMURRER)
Date: March 18, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/17/2020
Date: April 17, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 17, 2020Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: July 17, 2020Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER
Date: July 17, 2020Notice of Status Conference and Order
Date: August 06, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: September 01, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE RE CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER
Date: September 09, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF FOURTH CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANTS DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: September 02, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: September 28, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: September 28, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: September 29, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: September 30, 2020Order - ORDER COURT'S TENTATIVE RULING
Date: October 19, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: October 26, 2020Amended Complaint
Date: November 06, 2020Order - ORDER TENTATIVE RULING
Date: November 12, 2020Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: December 08, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: December 08, 2020Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: December 08, 2020Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: January 19, 2021Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: January 19, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10))
Date: January 27, 2021Objection - OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S UNTIMELY OPPOSITION
Date: January 22, 2021Order - ORDER TENTATIVE RULING
Date: January 27, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: January 29, 2021Order - ORDER FOR DEMURRER
Date: January 29, 2021Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)
Date: February 16, 2021Separate Statement
Date: February 19, 2021Motion to Quash
Date: February 24, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION FOR MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA
Date: February 24, 2021Separate Statement
Date: February 24, 2021Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: March 16, 2021Motion to Quash
Date: March 17, 2021Notice of Status Conference and Order
Date: April 05, 2021Separate Statement
Date: March 17, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: May 06, 2021Order - ORDER TENTATIVE RULING
Date: May 10, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: May 13, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: May 14, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARINGS
Date: June 04, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS OFF CALENDAR
Date: June 24, 2021Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: June 29, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: July 28, 2021Separate Statement
Date: August 05, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: August 16, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: August 23, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE
Date: September 02, 2021Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (3RD)
Date: September 09, 2021Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: September 09, 2021Separate Statement
Date: September 09, 2021Separate Statement
Date: September 23, 2021Order - ORDER TENTATIVE RULING
Date: October 05, 2021Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: November 05, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 05, 2021Unknown - EX PARTE PROPOSED ORDER
Date: November 19, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION .)
Date: November 19, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER MOTION FOR ORDER RELIEVING RESPON...)
Date: December 14, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: January 10, 2022Order - ORDER FINAL RULING
Date: January 10, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO COMPEL AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS OFF CALENDAR
Date: January 27, 2022Brief - BRIEF PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENT BRIEF TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: May 13, 2022Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: May 19, 2022Order - ORDER AS TO THE COURT'S TENTATIVE RULING
Date: June 07, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: June 07, 2022Answer
Date: June 24, 2022Motion for Protective Order
Date: June 27, 2022Separate Statement
Date: June 28, 2022Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: June 28, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: July 01, 2022Unknown - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER (EFILING)
Date: September 12, 2022Separate Statement
Date: October 21, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION [COMBINED] TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS TO COMPEL
Date: October 26, 2022Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM WAIVER
Date: November 02, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION SUPPLEMENTAL OPP TO PLTFS MTC FURTHER RESPONSES TO RFP SET TWO
Date: November 21, 2022Order - ORDER TENTATIVE RULING
Date: December 06, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: December 08, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: December 09, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: December 15, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF AMENDED MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: December 27, 2022Motion for Summary Adjudication - MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AMENDED NOTICE
Date: December 27, 2022Separate Statement
Date: December 27, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: February 23, 2023Separate Statement
Date: February 28, 2023Exhibit List
Date: February 28, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: March 02, 2023Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: March 09, 2023Separate Statement
Date: March 09, 2023Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: March 29, 2023Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: March 28, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: March 29, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: April 03, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: April 05, 2023Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: May 23, 2023Notice of Settlement
Date: May 23, 2023Separate Statement; Filed by: Alvaro Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Continuing Demurrer) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Alvaro Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd)) Filed by Alvaro Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Son Le (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Alvaro Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Alvaro Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO STRIKE PUNI...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted Filed by Alvaro Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strik...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Rainer Bansuan (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Notice (Notice of taking Motion to Compel depositions off calendar) Filed by Alvaro Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Alvaro Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st)) Filed by Alvaro Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Alvaro Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE RE CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER) Filed by Alvaro Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by BHS - American Recovery Center, (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Order (Court's Tentative Ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Alvaro Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Continuing Demurrer)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Transferring Complicated Personal Injury Case to ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Alvaro Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel PRODUCTION OF AN AUTHORIZATION FO...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Unavailability) Filed by Alvaro Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Tuan D. Nguyen (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by Alvaro Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF MOTION AND ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Order (As to the Court's Tentative Ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Alvaro Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-28T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by Alvaro Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by Alvaro Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Alvaro Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Responses to Spe...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF MOTION AND ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Order (Final Ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Alvaro Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application .)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (3rd)) Filed by Alvaro Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Motion for Order Relieving Respon...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application APPLICATION TO ADVANCE HEARIN...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-01T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Alvaro Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES, INC., a California Corp (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Hearing on M...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses G FUR...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses G FUR...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Notice (Notice Of Third Continuance Of Hearing On Demurrer And Motion To Strike)
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Continuing Demurrer))
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (STIPULATION TO FURTHER EXTEND TIME TO FILE PLAINTIFF'S 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO STRIKE PUNI...))
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference and Order
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Strike)
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion to Strike Portions of First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Demurrer)
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of )
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Continuing Demurrer) of )
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Objection (To Plaintiff's Untimely Opposition)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Transferring Complicated Personal Injury Case to ...))
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Notice (of Second Continuance of Hearing on Defendants Demurrer and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Notice (OF RESCHEDULED HEARINGS)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Order (Court's Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Order (AMENDED [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (stipulation to extend time to file 3rd amended complaint)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strik...))
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Responses to Spe...))
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of )
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Ex Parte Proposed Order
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application .))
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Opposition (plaintiff's opposition to defendant's ex parte to advance hearing on motion to strike)
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation for Entry of Protective Order [Proposed] Order)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Notice (OF TAKING MOTION TO COMPEL AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS OFF CALENDAR)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (3rd))
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Motion for Order Relieving Respon...))
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Order (Final Ruling)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Brief (Plaintiff's Supplement brief to Opposition to Motion to Strike)
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF MOTION AND ...))
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Unavailability)
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Continuing Demurrer) of 03/18/2020)
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Continuing Demurrer))
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Notice (of Second Continuance of Hearing on Defendants Demurrer and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Strike)
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/17/2020)
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Demurrer)
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Transferring Complicated Personal Injury Case to ...))
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Notice (Notice Of Third Continuance Of Hearing On Demurrer And Motion To Strike)
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Fourth Continuance of hearing on defendants Demurrer and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE RE CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strik...))
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Order (AMENDED [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Order (Court's Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel PRODUCTION OF AN AUTHORIZATION FO...))
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Objection (To Plaintiff's Untimely Opposition)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Demurrer to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion to Strike Portions of First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Order (for Demurrer)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 01/29/2021)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration For Motion to Quash Subpoena)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Order ((PROPOSED) ORDER FOR MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO STRIKE PUNI...))
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Notice (OF RESCHEDULED HEARINGS)
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (stipulation to extend time to file 3rd amended complaint)
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Notice (Notice of taking Motion to Compel depositions off calendar)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE)
Date: 2021-09-02T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (STIPULATION TO FURTHER EXTEND TIME TO FILE PLAINTIFF'S 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (3rd))
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Responses to Spe...))
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Motion for Order Relieving Respon...))
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Order (Final Ruling)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation for Entry of Protective Order [Proposed] Order)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 01/10/2022)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application .))
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Notice (OF TAKING MOTION TO COMPEL AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS OFF CALENDAR)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Opposition (plaintiff's opposition to defendant's ex parte to advance hearing on motion to strike)
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Alvaro Garcia (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Notice (Notice of taking Motion to Compel depositions off calendar)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Order ((PROPOSED) ORDER FOR MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration For Motion to Quash Subpoena)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Order (Tentative Ruling)
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Fourth Continuance of hearing on defendants Demurrer and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE RE CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Order (for Demurrer)
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-09-01T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Transferring Complicated Personal Injury Case to ...) of )
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Demurrer to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-01-14T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel PRODUCTION OF AN AUTHORIZATION FO...))
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.