Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Alliance United Insurance Company, Castania Michele, Mujo Santiago, Parra Enrique, Parra Rodrigo, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Carter Paul J., Mesaros Christopher Paul, against Ean Holdings Llc, Ean Holdings Llc., Gaines Davon, Garcia Leticia, Johnson Joshua, (total of 10) See All represented by Armstrong Robert, Case Anthony, Miller Adam Isaac, Reisinger Robert, Reisinger Robert Lee, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Stephen I. Goorvitch presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen I. Goorvitch Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Continuance of OSC re Stay of Discovery; Filed by: Joshua Cabryon Johnson (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Joshua Cabryon Johnson (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: EAN Holdings, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Davon Gaines (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Motion to Compel Plaintiffs' Attendance at Depositions; Filed by: Joshua Cabryon Johnson (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: EAN Holdings, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Alliance United Insurance Company (Plaintiff in Intervention)
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: EAN Holdings, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: EAN Holdings, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Bianca Angela Nava Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: EAN Holdings, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Joshua Cabryon Johnson (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Intervene; Filed by: Bianca Angela Nava Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Bianca Angela Nava Garcia (Defendant); Leticia Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Joshua Cabryon Johnson (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Motion to Consolidate; Filed by: Bianca Angela Nava Garcia (Defendant); Leticia Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: Joshua Cabryon Johnson (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Joshua Cabryon Johnson (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Bianca Angela Nava Garcia (Defendant); Leticia Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: EAN Holdings, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: EAN Holdings, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Motion to Compel Plaintiffs' Attendance at Depositions; Filed by: Joshua Cabryon Johnson (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Lorena L. Salazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: EAN Holdings, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Davon Gaines (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: EAN Holdings, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Joshua Cabryon Johnson (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Other - Tentative Ruling Final Order Overruling Demurrer; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Bianca Navagarcia (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Lorena L. Salazar (Plaintiff); Santiago Mujo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Tentative Ruling and Final Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: EAN Holdings, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Tentative Ruling and Final Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Complaint in Intervention; Filed by: Alliance United Insurance Company (Plaintiff in Intervention)
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: EAN Holdings, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Alliance United Insurance Company (Plaintiff in Intervention)
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Lorena L. Salazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Tentative Ruling and Final Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Lorena L. Salazar (Plaintiff); Santiago Mujo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Lorena L. Salazar (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Lorena L. Salazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Lorena L. Salazar (Plaintiff)
Date: March 20, 2023Case Management Statement; Filed by: Joshua Cabryon Johnson (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: September 09, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 09, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: September 09, 2019Complaint
Date: September 09, 2019PI General Order
Date: September 26, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: October 07, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: October 07, 2019Demand for Jury Trial
Date: November 04, 2019Answer
Date: November 04, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)
Date: December 10, 2019Notice of Related Case
Date: December 10, 2019Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: February 06, 2020Notice - NOTICE THAT HEARING FOR MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY AS TO DEFENDANT
Date: April 24, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER TO STAY DISCOVERY)
Date: June 29, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: August 14, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF OSC RE STAY OF DISCOVERY
Date: October 05, 2020Brief - BRIEF STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT IN ADVANCE OF OSC RE STAY OF DISCOVERY
Date: October 14, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STAY OF DISCOVERY)
Date: October 21, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE MATTERS
Date: January 13, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE)
Date: January 21, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: January 25, 2021Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS' ATTENDANCE AT DEPOSITIONS
Date: February 04, 2021Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: February 04, 2021Brief - BRIEF STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT RE OSC RE STAY OF DISCOVERY (3-8-21)
Date: March 03, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND DISCOVERY STAY
Date: March 15, 2021Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: March 22, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 22, 2021Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFS
Date: April 28, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: May 05, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: June 08, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 12, 2021Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: June 08, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: June 17, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 22, 2021Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: June 22, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: June 22, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: June 23, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: June 24, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: July 02, 2021Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: July 08, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ADVANCEMENT OF DEMURRER HEARING
Date: July 08, 2021Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS' ATTENDANCE AT DEPOSITIONS
Date: July 12, 2021Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: July 12, 2021Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' DECLARATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS
Date: August 03, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: August 06, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS' ATTENDANCE AT DEPOSITIONS
Date: August 09, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: August 12, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: September 14, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: September 16, 2021Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFS
Date: September 20, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: September 20, 2021Other - - OTHER - TENTATIVE RULING FINAL ORDER OVERRULING DEMURRER
Date: September 28, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; CASE MANAGEME...)
Date: September 28, 2021Answer
Date: October 07, 2021Separate Statement
Date: October 12, 2021Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: October 12, 2021Separate Statement
Date: January 14, 2022Motion for Leave to Intervene
Date: January 26, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: February 02, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/02/2022
Date: February 02, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: February 08, 2022Other - - TENTATIVE RULING AND FINAL ORDER
Date: February 08, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT BIANCA ANGELA NAVA GARC...)
Date: February 08, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO COMPEL
Date: February 23, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: March 08, 2022Other - - TENTATIVE RULING AND FINAL ORDER
Date: March 08, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE)
Date: March 10, 2022Other - - TENTATIVE RULING AND FINAL ORDER
Date: March 10, 2022Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: March 14, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: March 14, 2022Demand for Jury Trial
Date: March 14, 2022Complaint in Intervention
Date: March 14, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/29/2022
Date: April 29, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 29, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: May 10, 2022Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: May 25, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: July 15, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: July 19, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: July 26, 2022Notice of Change of Handling Attorney
Date: August 03, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: August 03, 2022Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: August 04, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: August 09, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: January 18, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: October 14, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: February 22, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: February 22, 2023Notice of Continuance
Date: March 20, 2023Request for Dismissal
Date: March 30, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: March 30, 2023PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Leticia Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order: Notice of Related Case) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Joshua Cabryon Johnson (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Bianca Angela Nava Garcia (Defendant); Leticia Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Motion to Consolidate Filed by Bianca Angela Nava Garcia (Defendant); Leticia Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Lorena L. Salazar (Plaintiff); Santiago Mujo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by EAN Holdings, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Stay of Discovery)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Manageme...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by EAN Holdings, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by Joshua Cabryon Johnson (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Michele Castania (Plaintiff); Rodrigo Parra (Plaintiff); Enrique Parra (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Michele Castania (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Joshua Cabryon Johnson (Defendant); Bianca Angela Nava Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Answer Filed by Joshua Johnson (Defendant); Bianca Navagarcia (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order: Notice of Related Case) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Answer Filed by Davon Gaines (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Lorena L. Salazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Lorena L. Salazar (Plaintiff); Santiago Mujo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Leticia Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Bianca Angela Nava Garcia (Defendant); Leticia Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: November 04, 2019Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/15/2020
Date: April 15, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 15, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: October 27, 2020Motion to Consolidate
Date: December 23, 2020Brief - BRIEF STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT RE OSC RE STAY OF DISCOVERY (1-5-21)
Date: December 29, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STAY OF DISCOVERY)
Date: January 05, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: January 13, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed by Joshua Cabryon Johnson (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other to Stay Discovery)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Other - (Tentative Ruling Final Order Overruling Demurrer) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Lorena L. Salazar (Plaintiff); Santiago Mujo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by EAN Holdings, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Answer Filed by EAN Holdings, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by EAN Holdings, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by EAN Holdings, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by EAN Holdings, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Stay of Discovery)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order: Notice of Related Case)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Answer Filed by Leticia Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Bianca Navagarcia (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Joshua Cabryon Johnson (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Bianca Angela Nava Garcia (Defendant); Leticia Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Joshua Cabryon Johnson (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by EAN Holdings, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by EAN Holdings, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Lorena L. Salazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Michele Castania (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Joshua Cabryon Johnson (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Joshua Cabryon Johnson (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Lorena L. Salazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by EAN Holdings, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Notice (OF ADVANCEMENT OF DEMURRER HEARING) Filed by EAN Holdings, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Davon Gaines (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Intervene Filed by Bianca Angela Nava Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Non-Opposition to Motions to Compel Filed by EAN Holdings, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Bianca Angela Nava Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Tentative Ruling and Final Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Lorena L. Salazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Alliance United Insurance Company (Plaintiff in Intervention)
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Alliance United Insurance Company (Plaintiff in Intervention)
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Tentative Ruling and Final Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Lorena L. Salazar (Plaintiff); Santiago Mujo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Tentative Ruling and Final Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Complaint in Intervention Filed by Alliance United Insurance Company (Plaintiff in Intervention)
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by EAN Holdings, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Defendant Bianca Angela Nava Garc...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by EAN Holdings, LLC. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Lorena L. Salazar (Plaintiff); Santiago Mujo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses crs 2...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Lorena L. Salazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Joshua Cabryon Johnson (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Lorena L. Salazar (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Mandatory Settlement Conference stipu...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Bianca Angela Nava Garcia (Defendant); Leticia Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF NO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE MATTERS)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Brief (Status Conference Statement re OSC re Stay of Discovery (3-8-21))
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order: Notice of Related Case))
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Granting the Motion to Stay Discovery as to Defendant Joshua Cabryon Johnson)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order: Notice of Related Case) of )
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Notice (of no oppo)
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Motion to Consolidate
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFS)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Notice (That Hearing for Motion to Stay Discovery as to Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Answer Filed by Joshua Cabryon Johnson (Defendant); Bianca Angela Nava Garcia (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Joshua Cabryon Johnson (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Notice (OF ADVANCEMENT OF DEMURRER HEARING)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Notice (of No Opposition to Motion to Stay Discovery as to Defendant Joshua Cabryon Johnson)
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Stay of Discovery))
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Stay of Discovery))
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Brief (Status Conference Statement in Advance of OSC re Stay of Discovery)
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate))
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT;)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other to Stay Discovery))
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Motion re: (to Stay Discovery)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Stay of Discovery; Trial Setting Conf...))
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of OSC re Stay of Discovery)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND DISCOVERY STAY)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Brief (Status Conference Statement re OSC re Stay of Discovery (1-5-21))
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant EAN Holdings Demurrer; Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Declaration (of Eric A. Forstrom in Opposition to Defendant Joshua Johnson?s Motions to Compel)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Declaration of Adam I. Miller in Support of Defendant EAN Holdings, LLC's Omnibus Motion to Compel
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Declaration (OF ADAM I. MILLER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT EAN HOLDINGS, LLCS OMNIBUS MOTION TO COMPEL)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Manageme...))
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel Responses to Form and Special Interrogatories)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFS)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...))
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Other - (Tentative Ruling Final Order Overruling Demurrer)
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel Plaintiffs' Attendance at Depositions)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Tentative Ruling and Final Order
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Defendant Bianca Angela Nava Garc...))
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Tentative Ruling and Final Order
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Intervene
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Declaration of Eric A. Forstrom in Opposition to Defendant's Motions to Compel
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses crs 2...))
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Complaint in Intervention
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Notice of Non-Opposition to Motions to Compel
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene))
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Tentative Ruling and Final Order
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order: Notice of Related Case))
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order: Notice of Related Case) of 12/10/2019)
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Motion re: (to Stay Discovery)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Notice (of No Opposition to Motion to Stay Discovery as to Defendant Joshua Cabryon Johnson)
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/15/2020)
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Notice (That Hearing for Motion to Stay Discovery as to Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Notice (of no oppo)
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other to Stay Discovery))
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Granting the Motion to Stay Discovery as to Defendant Joshua Cabryon Johnson)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of OSC re Stay of Discovery)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Brief (Status Conference Statement in Advance of OSC re Stay of Discovery)
Date: 2020-10-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Stay of Discovery))
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Brief (Status Conference Statement re OSC re Stay of Discovery (1-5-21))
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF NO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE MATTERS)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Stay of Discovery))
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate))
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Stay of Discovery; Trial Setting Conf...))
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Brief (Status Conference Statement re OSC re Stay of Discovery (3-8-21))
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND DISCOVERY STAY)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT;)
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFS)
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/12/2021)
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Notice (OF ADVANCEMENT OF DEMURRER HEARING)
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Declaration (of Eric A. Forstrom in Opposition to Defendant Joshua Johnson?s Motions to Compel)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/22/2021)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel Plaintiffs' Attendance at Depositions)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel Responses to Form and Special Interrogatories)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...))
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Case Manageme...))
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFS)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Other - (Tentative Ruling Final Order Overruling Demurrer)
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Declaration (OF ADAM I. MILLER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT EAN HOLDINGS, LLCS OMNIBUS MOTION TO COMPEL)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses crs 2...))
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/02/2022)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Defendant Bianca Angela Nava Garc...))
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene))
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Stay of Discovery; Trial Setting Conf...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of OSC re Stay of Discovery) Filed by Joshua Cabryon Johnson (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Davon Gaines (Non-Party)
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEF EAN HOLDINGS DEMURRER;MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiffs' Declaration in Opposition to Motion to Compel Depositions)
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.