Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jacobs As Successor Trustee Of The Winonia Strickland Myles Living Trust Aeriaka Myles, Myles An Individual By And Through Her Guardian Ad Litem Aeriaka Myles Jacobs Winonia Strickland, Myles Winonia Strickland, Winona Strickland Myles As Trustee, Winonia Strickland Myles Living Trust, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Genish Jonathan M., Kussman Benjamin J., against Ajax Mortgage-Backed Securities, Catamount Properties 2018 Llc, Gregory Funding, Series 2018-G By U.S. Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank N.A., (total of 5) See All represented by Choi Julie Ann, Mase Andrew Jonathan, Shulman Jeremy E., Ryan Timothy, Zuberi Nabeel M., (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Elizabeth Allen White presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElizabeth Allen White Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management172 days |
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2019 |
CategoryBreach Of Rental/Lease Contract (Not Unlawful Detainer Or Wrongful Eviction) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions175 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Management Statement; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Winonia Strickland Myles (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Motion to Consolidate; Filed by: Winonia Strickland Myles (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens; Filed by: Winonia Strickland Myles (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Winonia Strickland Myles (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Winonia Strickland Myles (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Declaration of Demurring Party re: Meet and Confer; Filed by: Catamount Properties 2018, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Notice of Related Case) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Opposition to Motion to Consolidate; Filed by: Catamount Properties 2018, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Gregory Funding LLC Erroneously Sued As Gregory Funding (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Winonia Strickland Myles (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Signed and Filed by: Winonia Strickland Myles (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Winonia Strickland Myles (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Catamount Properties 2018, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Demurrer) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Catamount Properties 2018, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Catamount Properties 2018, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order - regarding continuance of hearing:) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Gregory Funding LLC Erroneously Sued As Gregory Funding (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Winonia Strickland Myles (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Catamount Properties 2018, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by: Winonia Strickland Myles (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Winonia Strickland Myles (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Declaration of Gerald Myles; Filed by: Winonia Strickland Myles (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Catamount Properties 2018, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Winonia Strickland Myles (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Declaration of Benjamin J. Kussman; Filed by: Winonia Strickland Myles (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Declaration of Aeriaka Jacobs; Filed by: Winonia Strickland Myles (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Declaration of Michael N. Jones; Filed by: Winonia Strickland Myles (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Winonia Strickland Myles (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Gregory Funding LLC Erroneously Sued As Gregory Funding (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: WINONIA STRICKLAND MYLES LIVING TRUST (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Gregory Funding LLC Erroneously Sued As Gregory Funding (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: Winona Strickland Myles as Trustee (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Gregory Funding LLC Erroneously Sued As Gregory Funding (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Winonia Strickland Myles (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Wells Fargo Bank (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Winonia Strickland Myles (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Winonia Strickland Myles (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Objection to Relation of Cases; Filed by: Catamount Properties 2018, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for temporary restraining order; Filed by: Winonia Strickland Myles (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order)]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: WINONIA STRICKLAND MYLES LIVING TRUST (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Motion to Quash Subpoena; Filed by: Winonia Strickland Myles (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Catamount Properties 2018, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: September 05, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 05, 2019Complaint
Date: September 05, 2019Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: September 05, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: September 10, 2019Substitution of Attorney
Date: September 12, 2019Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER
Date: September 12, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING OR...)
Date: September 12, 2019Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: October 15, 2019Notice of Related Case
Date: October 29, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: November 05, 2019Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/05/2019
Date: November 05, 2019Objection - OBJECTION TO RELATION OF CASES
Date: November 20, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: December 10, 2019Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)]
Date: November 26, 2019Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: December 10, 2019Substitution of Attorney
Date: December 12, 2019Motion to Consolidate
Date: January 14, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: January 14, 2020Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: January 21, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: February 06, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: February 10, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: February 10, 2020Reply - REPLY ISO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: February 20, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE
Date: February 24, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 24, 2020Notice - NOTICE CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: February 24, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE
Date: February 26, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF MB ISO OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TRO
Date: February 26, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 03, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 10, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: March 20, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER - REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING:)
Date: March 20, 2020Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: March 23, 2020Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS ACTION AGAINST WELLS FARGO
Date: March 23, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: March 23, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS
Date: April 02, 2020Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: May 11, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: May 11, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: May 12, 2020Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: June 05, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: June 29, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: June 29, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: DEMURRER)
Date: July 07, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: July 08, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: July 28, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: September 15, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE TO FIRST AMEND...)
Date: September 30, 2020Separate Statement
Date: January 25, 2021Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: January 25, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 25, 2021Separate Statement
Date: April 01, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: April 26, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: April 16, 2021Notice - NOTICE RELEASE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION
Date: May 05, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: August 11, 2021Separate Statement
Date: August 13, 2021Notice - NOTICE COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE
Date: August 13, 2021Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: August 13, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANTS’ EX PARTE APPLICAT...)
Date: September 08, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GREGORY FUNDINGS EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: September 20, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CLARIFICATION OF THE COUR...)
Date: September 21, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: September 29, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF NEW AND CONTINUED DATES
Date: October 04, 2021Notice of Related Case
Date: October 14, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHAEL N. JONES
Date: October 15, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF GERALD MYLES
Date: October 15, 2021Motion to Quash - MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA
Date: October 15, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN J. KUSSMAN
Date: October 15, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF AERIAKA JACOBS
Date: October 15, 2021Separate Statement
Date: October 15, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: October 15, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ERRATA RE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: October 15, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)
Date: October 18, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR NOVEMBER 17, 2021
Date: October 19, 2021Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR PLAINTIFF
Date: October 22, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ERIC AYLES FOR DEFENDANT GREGORY FUNDING, LLC
Date: October 22, 2021Separate Statement
Date: October 22, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: October 22, 2021Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANTS’ EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF GERALD MYLES
Date: October 22, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF COURT’S ORDER RE: RELATED CASES
Date: October 25, 2021Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANTS’ EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF AERIKA JACOBS
Date: October 22, 2021Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING NOTICE OF COURT RULING
Date: October 26, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: October 27, 2021Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: October 27, 2021Motion for Protective Order
Date: October 28, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER
Date: October 28, 2021Objection - OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF ANDREW MASE
Date: October 29, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 29, 2021Response - RESPONSE TO STATEMENT
Date: October 29, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF JONATHAN M. GENISH
Date: October 29, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: October 29, 2021Response - RESPONSE TO EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS
Date: October 29, 2021Objection - OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF ERIC AYLES
Date: October 29, 2021Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: October 29, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: DECLARATION OF JONATHAN M. GENISH
Date: November 01, 2021Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: November 01, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 01, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 02, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 04, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 04, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA
Date: November 09, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 10, 2021Informal Discovery Conference
Date: November 12, 2021Brief - BRIEF DEFENDANTS’ INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE BRIEF
Date: November 12, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RESCHEDULING OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)
Date: November 15, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: November 17, 2021Reply - REPLY REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: November 17, 2021Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: November 17, 2021Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing
Date: November 23, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; HEARING ON M...)
Date: November 24, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: November 29, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: November 24, 2021Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: November 30, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 30, 2021Separate Statement
Date: December 01, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF JONATHAN M. GENISH
Date: December 01, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN J. KUSSMAN
Date: December 01, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: December 03, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF JONATHAN M. GENISH
Date: December 03, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN J. KUSSMAN
Date: December 03, 2021Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: December 07, 2021Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: December 08, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ORDER PERMITTING MENTAL EXAMINATION
Date: December 14, 2021Notice of Continuance
Date: December 17, 2021Reply - REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR ORDER PERMITTING MENTAL EXAMINATION
Date: December 20, 2021Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)
Date: December 21, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: December 22, 2021Separate Statement
Date: December 22, 2021Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE 1 RE EXCLUSION OF REFERENCE TO PRIOR BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS
Date: December 22, 2021Motion to Quash
Date: December 22, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 22, 2021Motion to Quash
Date: December 23, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2
Date: January 04, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS’ OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER TWO
Date: January 04, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS’ OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER FOUR
Date: January 04, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6
Date: January 04, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1
Date: January 04, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9
Date: January 04, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS’ OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER SIX
Date: January 04, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4
Date: January 04, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5
Date: January 04, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3
Date: January 04, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10
Date: January 04, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS’ OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER FIVE
Date: January 04, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7
Date: January 04, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 05, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ANDREW MASE IN SUPPORT OF THE EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: January 06, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 06, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: January 06, 2022Reply - REPLY REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7
Date: January 10, 2022Reply - REPLY REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4
Date: January 10, 2022Reply - REPLY REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8
Date: January 10, 2022Reply - REPLY REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1
Date: January 10, 2022Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE FOUR AND FIVE
Date: January 10, 2022Witness List
Date: January 10, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANDREW MASE REGARDING JOINT AND DISPUTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Date: January 10, 2022Statement of the Case
Date: January 10, 2022Jury Instructions
Date: January 10, 2022Reply - REPLY REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2
Date: January 10, 2022Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST JOINT
Date: January 10, 2022Reply - REPLY REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3
Date: January 10, 2022Reply - REPLY REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5
Date: January 10, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 11, 2022Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEBRUARY 9, 2022
Date: January 11, 2022Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE TO APPEAR AT TRIAL
Date: January 12, 2022Motion for Terminating Sanctions
Date: January 12, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: February 14, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 26, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE BY: DEFENDANTS...)
Date: February 27, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: March 02, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 06, 2020Answer
Date: April 17, 2020Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS
Date: April 24, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY RE: MEET AND CONFER
Date: May 11, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER MOTION FOR ORDER UNDER CCP 2032.3...)
Date: December 28, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: December 28, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: December 30, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS’ OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER THREE
Date: January 04, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER EIGHT
Date: January 04, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER SEVEN
Date: January 04, 2022Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: January 05, 2022Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: January 05, 2022Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for temporary restraining order)
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Or...))
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/05/2019)
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Objection (to Relation of Cases)
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Court Order)])
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Motion to Consolidate
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Reply (ISO Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS GREGORY FUNDING AND U.S. BANK?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Notice ( Continuance of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Consolidate)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Opposition (Catamount Properties 2018, LLC's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate)
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Opposition ( to Motion to Consolidate)
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Declaration (of MB ISO Opposition to Ex Parte Application for TRO)
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike by: Defendants...))
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion by Plaintiff, to Consolidate Cases or, in t...))
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order - regarding continuance of hearing:) of 03/20/2020)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order - regarding continuance of hearing:))
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Dismiss Action Against Wells Fargo)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Notice ( OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS)
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/06/2020)
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations])
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring Party re: Meet and Confer)
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 05/12/2020)
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Demurrer) of 07/07/2020)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Demurrer))
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Hearing On Defendant Catamount Propertie 2018, LLC's Demurrer)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike to first amend...))
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant Catamount Properties 2018, LLC's Demurrer to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-01-25T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Notice (Compendium of Evidence)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GREGORY FUNDINGS EX PARTE APPLICATION)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application DEFENDANTS? EX PARTE APPLICAT...))
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00DEFENDANTS? EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00DEFENDANTS? EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CLARIFICATION OF THE COURT?S MINUTE ORDER DATED SEPTEMBER 8, 2021
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR CLARIFICATION OF THE COUR...))
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Notice (of New and Continued Dates)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ERRATA RE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Subpoena)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Declaration (of Aeriaka Jacobs)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Declaration (of Gerald Myles)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Declaration (of Michael N. Jones)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Declaration (of Benjamin J. Kussman)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Notice of Related Case))
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Stipulation and Protective Order Regarding Th...))
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR NOVEMBER 17, 2021)
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Notice of Related Case) of 10/18/2021)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Motion for Order (APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR PLAINTIFF)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Objection (DEFENDANTS? EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF WINONIA STRICKLAND MYLES)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Objection (DEFENDANTS? EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF AERIKA JACOBS)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Objection (DEFENDANTS? EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN J. KUSSMAN)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Eric Ayles for Defendant Gregory Funding, LLC)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Objection (DEFENDANTS? EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF GERALD MYLES)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Declaration (OF ANDREW MASE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR PLAINTIFF)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF COURT?S ORDER RE: RELATED CASES)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Notice of Court Ruling)
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order)
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Notice (OF ERRATA RE: DECLARATION OF JONATHAN M. GENISH)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration of Eric Ayles)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-11-02T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; Hearing on Ex Parte A...))
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA)
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Brief (DEFENDANTS? INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE BRIEF)
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Rescheduling of Informal Discovery Conference))
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to the Appointment of Aeriaka Myles Jacobs as Guardian Ad Litem)
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Reply (REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS)
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Winonia)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Hearing on M...))
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Declaration (of Benjamin J. Kussman)
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Declaration (of Jonathan M. Genish)
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Deposition Subpoena for Production of Business Records and Request for Sanctions)
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Declaration (of Benjamin J. Kussman)
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Declaration (of Jonathan M. Genish)
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Deposition Subpoena for Personal Appearance and Request for Sanctions)
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Winonia)
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ORDER PERMITTING MENTAL EXAMINATION)
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Reply (BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR ORDER PERMITTING MENTAL EXAMINATION)
Date: 2021-12-20T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Motion in Limine (5 RE EXCLUSION OF REFERENCE TO PLAINTIFFS USE OF 2039 S. VICTORIA AVE.)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NUMBER THREE (3) TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF PLAINTIFFS? ALLEGED INCREASED PROPERTY TAXES)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NUMBER TWO (2) TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF PLAINTIFFS? ALLEGED LOSS OF RENTAL INCOME)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NUMBER FIVE (5) TO EXCLUDE DR. JARROD CARROL AS A WITNESS AT TRIAL)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NUMBER FOUR (4) TO EXCLUDE DR. MONIKA LEE AS A WITNESS AT TRIAL)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (1 RE EXCLUSION OF REFERENCE TO PRIOR BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (4 RE EXCLUSION OF REFERENCE TO GERALD MYLES DESIGNATION AS A VEXATIOUS LITIGANT)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (3 RE EXCLUSION OF REFERENCE TO PLAINTIFFS ASSETS OTHER THAN 2039 S. VICTORIA AVE.)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (8 RE EXCLUSION OF REFERENCE TO CERTAIN MEDICAL RECORDS WITHOUT PROPER FOUNDATION)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (2 RE EXCLUSION OF REFERENCE TO SOURCE OF FUNDS USED TO PAY OFF PLAINTIFFS LOAN)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (6 RE EXCLUSION OF REFERENCE TO IMPROPER CHARACTER EVIDENCE)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (7 RE EXCLUSION OF TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANTS DESIGNATED PSYCHIATRIC EXPERT)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Motion for Order under CCP 2032.3...))
Date: 2021-12-28T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (OF ROSTY G. GORE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS? OMNIBUS REPLY BRIEF)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (STIPULATION UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 2032.320(C))
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Opposition (DEFENDANTS? OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS? MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER FOUR)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Opposition (DEFENDANTS? OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS? MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER THREE)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted; He...))
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Opposition (DEFENDANTS? OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS? MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER TWO)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Opposition (DEFENDANTS? OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS? MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER FIVE)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Opposition (DEFENDANTS? OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS? MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER SIX)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFFS? MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER SEVEN)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFFS? MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER EIGHT)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFFS? MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER ONE)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (STIPULATION REGARDING CLAIMS FOR PHYSICAL INJURIES)
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF ANDREW MASE IN SUPPORT OF THE EX PARTE APPLICATION)
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO ADVANCE HEARING DATES ON D...))
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Reply (Reply in Support of Motion in Limine No. 5)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Reply (Reply in Support of Motion in Limine No. 3)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Reply (Reply in Support of Motion in Limine No. 8)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Reply (Reply in Support of Motion in Limine No. 2)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Declaration (OF MICHAEL N. JONES REGARDING JOINT AND DISPUTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Reply (Reply in Support of Motion in Limine No. 1)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Exhibit List (JOINT)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Declaration (OF ANDREW MASE REGARDING JOINT AND DISPUTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Reply (Reply in Support of Motion in Limine No. 7)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Reply (Reply in Support of Motion in Limine No. 4)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEBRUARY 9, 2022)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Reply (IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE FOUR AND FIVE)
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Motion for Terminating Sanctions
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Notice (PLAINTIFFS NOTICE TO APPEAR AT TRIAL)
Date: 2022-01-12T00:00:00Response (to Statement)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration of Andrew Mase)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Declaration (of Jonathan M. Genish)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Opposition (to Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Hearing On Defendant Catamount Propertie 2018, LLC's Demurrer)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant Catamount Properties 2018, LLC's Demurrer to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GREGORY FUNDINGS EX PARTE APPLICATION)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ERRATA RE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Opposition (to Request for Judicial Notice)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration of Eric Ayles)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Declaration (of Jonathan M. Genish)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Notice (OF ERRATA RE: DECLARATION OF JONATHAN M. GENISH)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Objection (to Declaration of Andrew Mase)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Response (to Statement)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Response (to Evidentiary Objections)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Response (to Evidentiary Objections)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Notice (Release of Pendency of Action)
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.