Case Last Refreshed: 13 hours ago
Arzola Alejandro, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Yun Edward H., Yun Edward H. Esq., against At&T Mobility Services Llc, Gonzalez Betty, represented by Brown Elizabeth A., Brown Elizabeth A. Esq., Svanfeldt Jennifer, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Richard J. Burdge Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard J. Burdge Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management213 days |
Filing DateJuly 26, 2019 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Complaint
Date: July 26, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Alejandro Arzola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Alejandro Arzola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Alejandro Arzola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Alejandro Arzola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: AT&T Mobility Services LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: Alejandro Arzola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Alejandro Arzola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Peremptory Challenge) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 26, 2019Complaint
Date: July 26, 2019Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: August 05, 2019Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: August 09, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE)
Date: August 09, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: August 20, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: August 23, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 27, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 31, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: October 31, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: February 07, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: February 07, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 24, 2020Case Management Order
Date: February 24, 2020Answer
Date: April 08, 2020Separate Statement
Date: April 14, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 14, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: August 20, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: November 25, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/25/2020
Date: November 25, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 04, 2020Motion for Protective Order
Date: December 04, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A STAY OF THE DEPOSITION ...)
Date: December 07, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 22, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: December 30, 2020Notice of Settlement
Date: January 21, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/22/2021
Date: January 22, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: January 22, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: February 16, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Alejandro Arzola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Alejandro Arzola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Alejandro Arzola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Alejandro Arzola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Peremptory Challenge)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Alejandro Arzola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Remand from Federal Court Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Peremptory Challenge) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Alejandro Arzola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st) Filed by Alejandro Arzola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex Parte Application of Plaintiff, Alejandro Arzola, for a Co...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Alejandro Arzola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by AT&T Mobility Services LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:001st Amended Complaint Filed by Alejandro Arzola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) Filed by Alejandro Arzola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Alejandro Arzola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR A STAY OF THE DEPOSITION ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Alejandro Arzola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Alejandro Arzola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Alejandro Arzola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order (-[Res ID: _3281]) Filed by Alejandro Arzola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment) Filed by Alejandro Arzola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (-[Res ID: _3281]) Filed by Alejandro Arzola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Corrective Order Filed by Alejandro Arzola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Alejandro Arzola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (-[Res ID: _3281]) Filed by Alejandro Arzola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Alejandro Arzola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Answer Filed by Betty Gomez Erroneously Sued As Betty Gonzalez (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Alejandro Arzola (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR A STAY OF THE DEPOSITION ...))
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Notice (DEFENDANTS? AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES LLC AND BEATRIZ GOMEZ?S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Corrective Order
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex Parte Application of Plaintiff, Alejandro Arzola, for a Co...))
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order))
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Peremptory Challenge) of )
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Answer (DEFENDANT AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:001st Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Remand from Federal Court
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (-[Res ID: _3281])
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Peremptory Challenge))
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order (-[Res ID: _3281])
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Stipulation for Protective Order and Protective Order-Confidential Designation Only
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (-[Res ID: _3281])
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Peremptory Challenge) of 08/09/2019)
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Peremptory Challenge))
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Answer (DEFENDANT AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex Parte Application of Plaintiff, Alejandro Arzola, for a Co...))
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/25/2020)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (-[Res ID: _3281])
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (-[Res ID: _3281])
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order))
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR A STAY OF THE DEPOSITION ...))
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Notice (DEFENDANTS? AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES LLC AND BEATRIZ GOMEZ?S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order (-[Res ID: _3281])
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/22/2021)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 37 Hearing on Motion for Protective Order - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Hearing on Motion for Protective Order - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court |
|
May 27, 2021 | Hearing |
in Department 37 Hearing on Motion for Protective Order - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 37 Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
May 18, 2021 | Hearing |
in Department 37 Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
May 18, 2021 | Hearing |
Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Jury Trial |
|
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 37 Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
May 11, 2021 | Hearing |
in Department 37 Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
May 11, 2021 | Hearing |
Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Final Status Conference |
|
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 37 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
April 14, 2021 | Hearing |
in Department 37 Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.