Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Catalan Morales Josefina, Pineda Rojas Froylan Aka Froylan Pineda, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mikhov Steve B, against Nissan North America Inc. A California Corporation, represented by Thomas Anthony S., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with David Sotelo presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management130 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 25, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: FROYLAN PINEDA ROJAS (Plaintiff); JOSEFINA CATALAN MORALES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: FROYLAN PINEDA ROJAS (Plaintiff); JOSEFINA CATALAN MORALES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: FROYLAN PINEDA ROJAS (Plaintiff); JOSEFINA CATALAN MORALES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: FROYLAN PINEDA ROJAS (Plaintiff); JOSEFINA CATALAN MORALES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: FROYLAN PINEDA ROJAS (Plaintiff); JOSEFINA CATALAN MORALES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: FROYLAN PINEDA ROJAS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: FROYLAN PINEDA ROJAS (Plaintiff); JOSEFINA CATALAN MORALES (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Complaint
Date: July 25, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: July 25, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 25, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: July 25, 2019Demand for Jury Trial
Date: August 20, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: August 20, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 22, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: ADVANCEMENT OF THE 12/2/19 HEA...)
Date: November 07, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: November 18, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: November 27, 2019Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 11/18/2019
Date: November 18, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: December 16, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: December 16, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: December 17, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: July 28, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: July 29, 2020Separate Statement
Date: December 10, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE POST ADR)
Date: August 06, 2020Notice - NOTICE 12.9.20 PINEDA ROJAS NTC OF IDC RE MTC FURTHER RFP
Date: December 10, 2020Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: December 10, 2020Informal Discovery Conference - INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Date: February 11, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: February 19, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: March 09, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 10, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO COMPEL HEARINGI
Date: March 23, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF FILING PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE
Date: April 09, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: March 25, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: April 12, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: May 10, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: May 26, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF MINUTE ORDER 5.26.21
Date: June 09, 2021Statement of the Case
Date: August 11, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1
Date: July 22, 2021Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS JOINT PROPOSED CACI AND SPECIAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Date: August 11, 2021Witness List
Date: August 11, 2021Trial Brief
Date: August 11, 2021Exhibit List
Date: August 11, 2021Jury Instructions
Date: August 11, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 11, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: August 12, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: August 20, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)
Date: August 23, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL
Date: August 31, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: January 03, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL
Date: January 06, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: January 07, 2022Complaint
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Answer (Nissan North America, Inc's Answer to pltf's Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: advancement of the 12/2/19 hea...))
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 11/18/2019)
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Notice ( OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Post ADR))
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Notice (NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC.?S NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASES)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Minute Order 5.26.21)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Notice (Of Filing Petition For Writ Of Mandate)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Joint Statement regarding Stipulated Motions in Limine)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition To Motion In Limine NO. 1)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00Notice (12.9.20 Pineda Rojas NTC of IDC re MTC Further RFP)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO COMPEL HEARINGi)
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference (STATEMENT)
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Jury Instructions (JOINT PROPOSED CACI AND SPECIAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case))
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case) of 08/23/2021)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.