Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Schrage Leonard, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Freundlich Kenneth D., Kaiser Michael Jason, against Parker Milliken Clark O'Hara & Samuelian, represented by Tokumori Gary, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Dalila Corral Lyons presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management147 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 03, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions160 days |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Statement of the Case
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 03, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: July 03, 2019Complaint
Date: July 03, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: August 15, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF GARY TOKUMORI
Date: August 21, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF DEMURRER TO PLTF. COMPLAINT
Date: August 21, 2019Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE TO COMPLAINT
Date: August 21, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF DEMURRER
Date: August 21, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: September 12, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: September 23, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: September 20, 2019Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/23/2019
Date: September 23, 2019Notice of Related Case - NOTICE OF RELATED CASE WITH 19STCV23371=D-72 AND BC579623=D-9 (LEAD)
Date: September 30, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 11/19/2019
Date: November 19, 2019Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/19/2019
Date: November 19, 2019Status Report
Date: November 22, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: November 27, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; STATUS CONFER...)
Date: December 10, 2019Substitution of Attorney
Date: December 23, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE CONTINUANCE)
Date: April 24, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: May 29, 2020Status Report - JOINT STATEMENT FOR STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: July 07, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: July 15, 2020Statement of the Case
Date: November 03, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: August 04, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: November 10, 2020Statement of the Case
Date: March 03, 2021Message Board Posting - MESSAGE BOARD POSTING RE: CONTINUED HEARING SET FOR 4/20/21
Date: April 16, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE; INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: March 10, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC); STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: April 27, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RESETTING STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: June 15, 2021Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: June 15, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: June 16, 2021Statement of the Case
Date: August 03, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: August 10, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF 8/26/2021 HEARING)
Date: August 23, 2021Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: August 23, 2021Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: September 01, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF 9/14/2021 HEARINGS)
Date: September 01, 2021Statement of the Case - JOINT STATEMENT FOR NOVEMBER 15, 2021STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: November 05, 2021Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: November 12, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF 11/15/2021 HEARINGS)
Date: November 12, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC); STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: November 18, 2021Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AND CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: November 22, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: January 21, 2022Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: February 03, 2022Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: February 22, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Declaration of Gary Tokumori; Filed by: Parker Milliken Clark O'hara & Samuelian, (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Leonard Schrage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Notice (of Demurrer) Filed by Parker Milliken Clark O'hara & Samuelian, (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Leonard Schrage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Leonard Schrage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Leonard Schrage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Leonard Schrage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Message Board Posting Re: Continued hearing set for ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Leonard Schrage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Leonard Schrage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Curtis Chuey Jung (Attorney)
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review re Continuance) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Joint Statement for Status Conference; Filed by: Leonard Schrage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Leonard Schrage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Notice (of Demurrer to Pltf. Complaint) Filed by Parker Milliken Clark O'hara & Samuelian, (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Leonard Schrage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Leonard Schrage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Leonard Schrage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Leonard Schrage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Joint Statement For November 15, 2021Status Conference; Filed by: Leonard Schrage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Leonard Schrage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Declaration (of Gary Tokumori) Filed by Parker Milliken Clark O'hara & Samuelian, (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 22, 2022Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by Leonard Schrage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Status Confer...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Status Report Filed by Leonard Schrage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC); Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Answer Filed by Parker Milliken Clark O'hara & Samuelian, (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Leonard Schrage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Parker Milliken Clark O'hara & Samuelian, (Defendant)
Date: February 03, 2022Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by Leonard Schrage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: February 22, 2022Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Curtis Chuey Jung (Attorney)
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re E-Service Provider) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC); Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Resetting Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Continuance of Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by Leonard Schrage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by Leonard Schrage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Continuance of Hearings)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re E-Service Provider)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: February 22, 2022Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Message Board Posting (Re: Continued hearing set for ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of Hearings)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Joint Statement For November 15, 2021Status Conference Filed by Leonard Schrage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continuance of Hearing for Status Conference) Filed by Leonard Schrage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of Hearing)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Continuance)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Message Board Posting (Re: Continuance for Hearing set on ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Leonard Schrage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Joint Statement for Status Conference Filed by Leonard Schrage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re Continuance) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Leonard Schrage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Leonard Schrage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Notice (of Demurrer)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Notice (of Demurrer to Pltf. Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/23/2019)
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/19/2019)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Reply (Defendant Parker, Milliken, Clark, O'Hara & Samuelian's Reply to Opposition to Demurrer)
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Related Case (with 19STCV23371=D-72 and BC579623=D-9 (lead))
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order) of 11/19/2019)
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Status Confer...))
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00in Department 20, Kevin C. Brazile, Presiding
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Continuance of Status Conference))
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continuance of Hearing for Status Conference)
Date: 2020-03-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Continuance))
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re Continuance) of 04/24/2020)
Date: 2020-04-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re E-Service Provider) of 05/21/2020)
Date: 2020-05-21T00:00:00Joint Statement for Status Conference
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re E-Service Provider))
Date: 2020-05-21T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Court's Minute Order re E-Service Provider and Non-Appearance Csae Review)
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Message Board Posting (Re: Continued hearing set for 4/20/21)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC); Status Conference))
Date: 2021-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Message Board Posting (Re: Continuance for Hearing set on 4/01/21)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (NOTICE OF LODGING OF [PROPOSED] STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER)
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Resetting Status Conference))
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Joint Statement For November 15, 2021Status Conference
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of 8/26/2021 Hearing))
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00stipulation and Protective Order - Confidential Designation Only
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of 9/14/2021 Hearings))
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Continuance of 11/15/2021 Hearings))
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (to Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Gary Tokumori)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: Leonard Schrage (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review re E-Service Provider) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-21T00:00:00Message Board Posting Re: Continuance for Hearing set on ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00in Department 20, David J. Cowan, Presiding
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.