Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Binder Ed, Summers Robert, Cenveo Worldwide Limited A Delaware Corporation, Cenveo Worldwilde Limited A Delaware Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Harvin Emily K., Malynn Todd Matthew, against Lithographix Inc., Minguez Ariel, Summers Robert, represented by Boren Stephen Zachary, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Dennis J. Landin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis J. Landin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management204 days |
Filing DateJune 27, 2019 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions204 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Separate Statement; Filed by: CENVEO WORLDWIDE LIMITED, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Opposition to demurrer; Filed by: CENVEO WORLDWIDE LIMITED, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Order Ruling Re: Demurrer; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: ROBERT SUMMERS (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Carlton Childs (Cross-Defendant); As to: ROBERT SUMMERS (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: ROBERT SUMMERS (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: ROBERT SUMMERS (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: ROBERT SUMMERS (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Cenveo Worldwilde Limited, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Carlton Childs (Cross-Defendant); As to: ROBERT SUMMERS (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: ROBERT SUMMERS (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: CENVEO WORLDWIDE LIMITED, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Reply In Support Of Motion; Filed by: CENVEO WORLDWIDE LIMITED, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: ROBERT SUMMERS (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: CENVEO WORLDWIDE LIMITED, a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling RE: RELATED CASES; Filed by: ROBERT SUMMERS (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: December 16, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: December 16, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: December 30, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER
Date: December 30, 2019Reply - REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: January 06, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 06, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: January 13, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: January 15, 2020Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: January 17, 2020Separate Statement
Date: January 30, 2020Order - ORDER RULING RE: DEMURRER
Date: January 31, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: January 31, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: February 04, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: February 04, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: February 04, 2020Amended Complaint - 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 18, 2020Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS TRADE SECRET DISCLOSURE
Date: February 18, 2020Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: February 25, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: March 03, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT
Date: March 09, 2020Answer
Date: March 10, 2020Answer
Date: March 13, 2020Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CONTINUED MEDIATION AND STANDDOWN
Date: March 24, 2020Order - ORDER ON JOINT STIP
Date: March 24, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 25, 2020Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: June 02, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER
Date: June 04, 2020Notice of Related Case
Date: June 17, 2020Amended Complaint - 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: June 26, 2020Unknown - AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: June 29, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: July 15, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: July 17, 2020Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: RELATED CASES
Date: July 21, 2020Separate Statement
Date: July 21, 2020Answer
Date: August 03, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 10, 2020Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: August 10, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER; DECLARATION OF TODD M. MALYNN
Date: September 09, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: September 15, 2020Reply - REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 15, 2020Notice of Settlement
Date: September 23, 2020Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR ENTRY OF ORDER
Date: September 23, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL
Date: September 29, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: October 02, 2020Separate Statement
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring or Moving Party In Support of Automatic Extension)
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Declaration (of Demurring or Moving Party In Support of Automatic Extension)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order ((JOINT) TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER)
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Documents, Further Responses, or Compliance with Request for Production of Documents)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (re First Amended Complaint;)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - without Mot...))
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Case Management Conference and Hearing On Demurrer to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 01/31/2020)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Reply (Memorandum In Support of Demurrer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Order (Ruling Re: Demurrer)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Opposition (to demurrer)
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00Notice (of initial case management conference)
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE: RELATED CASES)
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Reply (In Support Of Motion)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Documents, Further Responses, or ...))
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 07/15/2020)
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Order (on joint stip)
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Amended Complaint (2nd)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (1st))
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (re continued mediation and standdown)
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (And Protective Order)
Date: 2020-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Notice (OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT)
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:003rd Amended Complaint
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiffs Trade Secret Disclosure)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER; DECLARATION OF TODD M. MALYNN)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Notice (Of Continuance Of Hearing And Order)
Date: 2020-06-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation Re Amended Pleadings Order)
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Declaration (of Aaron M. Gladstein in Support of Defendants' Demurrer to Third Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.