Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Kiupelian Ara, Kiupelian Vardan, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Shalvoy James A. Esq., against 1 To 10 Does, Fruci 8 Associates Ii Pllc, Gemayel George, Greenkraft Inc., Malone Bailey Llp, (total of 8) See All represented by Fickel Connie, Lazo Marc Youssef, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Holly J. Fujie presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management121 days |
|
Filing DateJune 19, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions121 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Objection to proposed judgment; Filed by: Ara Kiupelian (Plaintiff); Vardan Kiupelian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Memorandum opposition to demurrer; Filed by: Ara Kiupelian (Plaintiff); Vardan Kiupelian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Motion; Filed by: George Gemayel (Defendant); Greenkraft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed B309826; Filed by: Clerk
Date: April 05, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Opposition to demurrer; Filed by: Ara Kiupelian (Plaintiff); Vardan Kiupelian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: George Gemayel (Defendant); Greenkraft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Ara Kiupelian (Plaintiff); Vardan Kiupelian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Ara Kiupelian (Plaintiff); Vardan Kiupelian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Request for judicial notice; Filed by: Ara Kiupelian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: George Gemayel (Defendant); Greenkraft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Ara Kiupelian (Plaintiff); Vardan Kiupelian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Opposition to Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: Greenkraft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Ara Kiupelian (Plaintiff); Vardan Kiupelian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Reply Reply in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: George Gemayel (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-08T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: Greenkraft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: George Gemayel (Defendant); Greenkraft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Fruci 8 Associates II, PLLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: Ara Kiupelian (Plaintiff); Vardan Kiupelian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: George Gemayel (Defendant); Greenkraft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: George Gemayel (Defendant); Greenkraft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: June 19, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 19, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: June 19, 2019Complaint
Date: June 19, 2019Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: June 20, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 09, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: September 09, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: October 07, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: October 16, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: October 17, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: December 06, 2019Notice of Motion - TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: December 06, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDFD COMPLAINT; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES
Date: January 30, 2020Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 06, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 06, 2020Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 06, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: April 03, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)
Date: February 14, 2020Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 28, 2020Notice of Motion
Date: April 03, 2020Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: April 03, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 08, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER
Date: July 23, 2020Reply - REPLY REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: July 30, 2020Reply - REPLY REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: July 30, 2020Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: August 28, 2020Objection - OBJECTION TO PROPOSED JUDGMENT
Date: September 03, 2020Notice - NOTICE FILING PROOFS OF SERVICE
Date: September 09, 2020Reply - REPLY REPLY TO OBJECTION TO PROPOSED JUDGMENT
Date: September 09, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PROPOSED JUDGMENT)
Date: September 11, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO NEW DOE...)
Date: September 17, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 09/18/2020
Date: September 18, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: September 18, 2020Judgment - JUDGMENT JUDGMENT
Date: October 07, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: October 15, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: October 13, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: October 22, 2020Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: October 26, 2020Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: November 02, 2020Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: October 29, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: November 05, 2020Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: November 16, 2020Motion to Tax Costs
Date: November 17, 2020Substitution of Attorney
Date: November 17, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: December 03, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: December 02, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: December 03, 2020Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (3RD)
Date: December 04, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: December 09, 2020Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: December 10, 2020Notice - NOTICE FILING PROOFS OF SERVICE
Date: December 17, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: December 18, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: December 22, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: January 08, 2021Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil)
Date: December 28, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: January 11, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: January 13, 2021Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: January 22, 2021Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: January 22, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 22, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF JAMES A. SHALVOY RE STATUS OF DOE DEFENDANTS
Date: January 26, 2021Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: February 08, 2021Memorandum - MEMORANDUM OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: February 16, 2021Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: February 22, 2021Memorandum - MEMORANDUM OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER
Date: February 16, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES)
Date: October 29, 2021Request - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: November 05, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES)
Date: November 23, 2021Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - AFFIRMED B309826
Date: April 05, 2022Case Management Statement Filed by Ara Kiupelian (Plaintiff); Vardan Kiupelian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Opposition (to demurrer) Filed by Ara Kiupelian (Plaintiff); Vardan Kiupelian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT) Filed by George Gemayel (Defendant); Greenkraft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Ara Kiupelian (Plaintiff); Vardan Kiupelian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Ara Kiupelian (Plaintiff); Vardan Kiupelian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by George Gemayel (Defendant); Greenkraft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Memorandum (opposition to demurrer) Filed by Ara Kiupelian (Plaintiff); Vardan Kiupelian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Ara Kiupelian (Plaintiff); Vardan Kiupelian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Ara Kiupelian (Plaintiff); Vardan Kiupelian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Ara Kiupelian (Plaintiff); Vardan Kiupelian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by George Gemayel (Defendant); Greenkraft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Amended Complaint Filed by Ara Kiupelian (Plaintiff); Vardan Kiupelian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Judgment (Judgment) Filed by George Gemayel (Defendant); Greenkraft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Notice (filing proofs of service) Filed by Ara Kiupelian (Plaintiff); Vardan Kiupelian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by George Gemayel (Defendant); Greenkraft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Proposed Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st) Filed by Ara Kiupelian (Plaintiff); Vardan Kiupelian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) to S...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by George Gemayel (Defendant); Greenkraft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by George Gemayel (Defendant); Greenkraft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by George Gemayel (Defendant); Greenkraft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Proof of Service as to New Doe...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) Filed by Ara Kiupelian (Plaintiff); Vardan Kiupelian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Ara Kiupelian (Plaintiff); Vardan Kiupelian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Ara Kiupelian (Plaintiff); Vardan Kiupelian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Objection (to proposed judgment) Filed by Ara Kiupelian (Plaintiff); Vardan Kiupelian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Tax Costs) Filed by Greenkraft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Notice (filing proofs of service) Filed by Ara Kiupelian (Plaintiff); Vardan Kiupelian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Ara Kiupelian (Plaintiff); Vardan Kiupelian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs Filed by Ara Kiupelian (Plaintiff); Vardan Kiupelian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Notice (of continuance) Filed by Ara Kiupelian (Plaintiff); Vardan Kiupelian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Ara Kiupelian (Plaintiff); Vardan Kiupelian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Status Report Filed by Greenkraft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Fruci 8 Associates II, PLLC (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (3rd)) Filed by Ara Kiupelian (Plaintiff); Vardan Kiupelian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees Filed by George Gemayel (Defendant); Greenkraft, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Notice (notice of continuance) Filed by Ara Kiupelian (Plaintiff); Vardan Kiupelian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Ara Kiupelian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Reply (Reply in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees) Filed by George Gemayel (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Request (for judicial notice) Filed by Ara Kiupelian (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Affirmed (B309826) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-06-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDFD COMPLAINT; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...))
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Opposition (TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Strike First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Amended Complaint (2nd)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Demurrer to First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike))
Date: 2020-02-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-08T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/08/2020)
Date: 2020-05-08T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Opposition (to demurrer)
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Opposition to Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Opposition (TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES)
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Opposition to Motion to Strike Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) to S...))
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Notice (filing proofs of service)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Objection (to proposed judgment)
Date: 2020-09-03T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Objection to Proposed Judgment)
Date: 2020-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Proposed Judgment))
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 09/18/2020)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Judgment (Judgment)
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-03T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (3rd))
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Notice (filing proofs of service)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Notice (of continuance)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Notice (notice designating record on appeal)
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Memorandum (opposition to motion to strike)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Notice (notice of continuance)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2021-04-13T00:00:00Declaration (OF JAMES A. SHALVOY RE STATUS OF DOE DEFENDANTS)
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Status Report (PLAINTIFFS STATUS REPORT RE STATUS OF APPEAL)
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (To Continue Hearing on Defendants' Demurrer and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Memorandum (opposition to demurrer)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00Request (for judicial notice)
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Reply (Reply in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees)
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees))
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs))
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Tax Costs)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/20/2021)
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-09-29T00:00:00Reply (to opposition to motion to strike and or tax costs)
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.