Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hernandez Martin, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Keshishyan Romina, against J.F. Shea Construction Inc., J.F. Shea Construction Management Inc., Walsh Construction Company, Walsh Construction Group Llc, Walsh Shea Corridor Constructors, (total of 5) See All represented by Carter Kimberly Chantal, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Richard L. Fruin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard L. Fruin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management140 days |
Filing DateMay 29, 2019 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Complaint
Date: May 29, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: May 29, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 29, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: May 29, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: June 27, 2019Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: July 03, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: July 03, 2019Answer - ANSWER WALSH/SHEA CORRIDOR CONSTRUCTORS, WALSH CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
Date: July 03, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 01, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: October 01, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: October 04, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: October 16, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: March 13, 2020Separate Statement
Date: March 13, 2020Exhibit List
Date: March 13, 2020Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 13, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 03, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 20, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: May 20, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: May 29, 2020Motion to Bifurcate
Date: January 12, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: January 12, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/12/2021
Date: January 12, 2021Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: January 19, 2021Motion to Bifurcate - MOTION TO BIFURCATE (AMENDED)
Date: February 02, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 02, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 25, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: March 25, 2021Case Management Statement; Filed by: Walsh/Shea Corridor Constructors (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Kimberly Chantal Carter (Attorney)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Martin Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (- Entire action/complaint, with prejudice) Filed by Martin Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex Parte Application of Plaintiff, Martin Hernandez, to Conti...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-05-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Martin Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Martin Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Kimberly Chantal Carter (Attorney)
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Martin Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Walsh/Shea Corridor Constructors (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Martin Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Martin Hernandez (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) Filed by Martin Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Walsh/Shea Corridor Constructors (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Martin Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Martin Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Martin Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Walsh/Shea Corridor Constructors (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Martin Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Martin Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Martin Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Martin Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Answer (Walsh/Shea Corridor Constructors, Walsh Construction Company)
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex Parte Application of Plaintiff, Martin Hernandez, to Conti...))
Date: 2020-05-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.