Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Online Legal Couriers, Wimberly Jason, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Payton Chantal R. Esq., against Farhoumand Samir, Farhoumand Sima, Keith A Fink Associates, Keith A Fink Associates General Accoun, Warrior Fitness Enterprises Llc, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Richard J. Burdge Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard J. Burdge Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 09, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time453 days |
Complaint
Date: May 09, 2019Opposition to Defendants Petition to Compel Arbitration; Filed by: Jason Wimberly (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Objection to Supplemental Declaration of Samir Farhoumand; Filed by: Jason Wimberly (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Jason Wimberly (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Request for Refund of Reporter Appeal Transcript Deposit; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Signed and Filed by:
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Declaration of Gina Lindell; Filed by: Jason Wimberly (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) NOA:; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: WARRIOR FITNESS ENTERPRISES, LLC, (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid APPELLANT PAID $383.25; Filed by:
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00Notification Re Missing Document; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Appeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid PAID BY ONLINE LEGAL COURIERS FOR DANIEL T. HO; Filed by:
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed B302000; Filed by: Clerk
Date: July 08, 2020Appeal Record Delivered; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript;B302000, NOA ;; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Appeal - Certificate of Clerk Re: Missing Record For Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Affidavit for Rlse Funds/Req for Payment Rptr Appeal Trnscpt; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration of Jason Wimberly; Filed by: Jason Wimberly (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal NOA: B302000; Filed by: Clerk
Date: July 08, 2020Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 2 Volumes Certified (for Notice of Appeal, filed ); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-27T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: May 09, 2019Complaint
Date: May 09, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: May 09, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 09, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: May 28, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: May 28, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 12, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: July 15, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION
Date: August 21, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 21, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 27, 2019Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: September 04, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)
Date: September 04, 2019Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF JASON WIMBERLY
Date: September 18, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF GINA LINDELL
Date: September 18, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 18, 2019Objection - OBJECTION TO SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF SAMIR FARHOUMAND
Date: September 18, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 23, 2019Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: September 25, 2019Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: October 24, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)
Date: September 25, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: November 12, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: November 22, 2019Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: November 12, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION ...)
Date: December 05, 2019Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: December 12, 2019Appeal Document - NOTIFICATION RE MISSING DOCUMENT
Date: February 05, 2020Appeal - Certificate of Clerk Re: Missing Record For Appeal
Date: February 21, 2020Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal
Date: February 21, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: August 04, 2020Complaint Filed by Jason Wimberly (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Jason Wimberly (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Jason Wimberly (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Appeal - Certificate of Clerk Re: Missing Record For Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Jason Wimberly (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Jason Wimberly (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Jason Wimberly (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by WARRIOR FITNESS ENTERPRISES, LLC, (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Opposition ( to Defendants Petition to Compel Arbitration) Filed by Jason Wimberly (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Jason Wimberly (Plaintiff)
Date: August 04, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Jason Wimberly (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B302000) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Jason Wimberly (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Objection (to Supplemental Declaration of Samir Farhoumand) Filed by Jason Wimberly (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Declaration (of Gina Lindell) Filed by Jason Wimberly (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Notification Re Missing Document Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (;B302000, NOA ;) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Ex Parte Application ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 2 Volumes Certified (for Notice of Appeal, filed ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-30T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (of Jason Wimberly) Filed by Jason Wimberly (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA: B302000) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Samir Farhoumand In Support of Petition For Arbitration)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Appeal - Certificate of Clerk Re: Missing Record For Appeal
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration))
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration ( of Samir Farhoumand in Support of Reply to Petition to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA: 10/24/19 B302000)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Opposition ( to Defendants Petition to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Brief (PLAINTIFF?S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B302000)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Ex Parte Application ...))
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Motion to Compel Arbitration (pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 1281.2)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Samir Farhoumand In Support of Supplemental Reply to Petition to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (of Jason Wimberly)
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Notification Re Missing Document
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:10/24/19)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Objection (to Supplemental Declaration of Samir Farhoumand)
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration))
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Declaration (of Gina Lindell)
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (;B302000, NOA 10/24/19;)
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 2 Volumes Certified (for Notice of Appeal, filed 10/24/19)
Date: 2020-03-30T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: August 04, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.