Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Alday Jose Manuel, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Moon Kane, Ter-Astvatsatryan Lilit, against Fantasy Dyeing & Fishing Inc., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Amy D. Hogue presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAmy D. Hogue Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management267 days |
Filing DateApril 30, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Complaint
Date: April 30, 2019Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Jose Manuel Alday (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Jose Manuel Alday (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: November 12, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)
Date: November 07, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: January 07, 2020Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: November 22, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: January 22, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: January 22, 2020Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: March 02, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: March 02, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: March 13, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: March 13, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 20, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 10, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/10/2020
Date: April 10, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: April 10, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: September 04, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: July 01, 2020Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)
Date: July 31, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: July 31, 2020Notice of Rejection - Miscellaneous Judgments - NOTICE OF NON-ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Date: September 16, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: September 16, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND/OR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE ENTR...)
Date: September 30, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: October 19, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: October 19, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND/OR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE ENTR...)
Date: November 02, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: December 14, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: December 14, 2020Default Judgment
Date: December 14, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: December 21, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: December 22, 2020Judgment - JUDGMENT BY COURT
Date: December 22, 2020Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: January 05, 2021Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: January 06, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: January 06, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF LILIT TER-ASTVATSATRYAN RE: INTEREST ON JUDGMENT
Date: January 07, 2021Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: January 12, 2021Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)
Date: January 12, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: January 28, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING
Date: February 03, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 04, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 18, 2021Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: February 24, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION)
Date: February 24, 2021Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: March 25, 2021Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: April 05, 2021Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Initial Status Conference))
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Status Conference Statement
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Declaration (of H. Scott Leviant)
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Amended Complaint (2nd)
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Newly Assigned Case))
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Order
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/01/2019)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Other - (Plaintiff's Application to Dismiss the Class Claims Without Prejudice)
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Report (/Statement -)
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Plaintiff's Notice of Initial Status Conference and Complex Determination
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Motion for Leave (to File Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities)
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (at the Initial Status Conference)
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00First Amended Class And Representative Action Complaint
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court))
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Notice (of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Hearing)
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment))
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference and/or Order to Show Cause re Entr...))
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Judgment (by Court)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles))
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 01/28/2021)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Declaration (OF LILIT TER-ASTVATSATRYAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (2nd))
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference and/or Order to Show Cause re Entr...))
Date: 2020-09-30T00:00:00Default Judgment
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/10/2020)
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Declaration (OF JOSE MANUEL ALDAY IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 07/01/2020)
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Declaration (OF LILIT TER-ASTVATSATRYAN RE: INTEREST ON JUDGMENT)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Non-Entry of Default
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference and/or Order to Show Cause re Entr...))
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.