Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Consolidated Property Services Inc., Fernandez Ruiz Francisco A., Hayden John T., Samuel Khacheryan Dba Brads Carpet And True Word, Ramos Margarita, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Dordick Gary Alan, Mesaros Christopher Paul, against Consolidated Property Services Inc., Hayden John T., Lb Property Management, Ruiz Francisco A. Fernandez, Samuel Khacheryan Dba Brads Carpet And True Word, (total of 6) See All represented by Bergsten Robert Troy, Carron Paul Andrew, Johnson Jerri L., Lamond Christian F, Marks Gregory W, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Christopher K. Lui presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 25, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: John T. Hayden (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Francisco A. Fernandez Ruiz (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Reply Reply to Opposition; Filed by: John T. Hayden (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Declaration OF DR. THOMAS L. HEDGE, JR, MD; Filed by: LB Property Management (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Paul Carron; Filed by: John T. Hayden (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Summons Cross-Complaint; Issued and Filed by: John T. Hayden (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Consolidated Property Services, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Motion for Trial Preference; Filed by: Margarita Ramos (Plaintiff); As to: John T. Hayden (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Consolidated Property Services, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Objection Defendant's Objection to Declarations; Filed by: John T. Hayden (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date; Filed by: SAMUEL KHACHERYAN DBA BRADS CARPET AND TRUE WORD (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: LB Property Management (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: John T. Hayden (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: LB Property Management (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Consolidated Property Services, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Margarita Ramos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Separate Statement of Discovery in Dispute; Filed by: LB Property Management (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: SAMUEL KHACHERYAN DBA BRADS CARPET AND TRUE WORD (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: LB Property Management (Defendant); As to: Margarita Ramos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Margarita Ramos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Margarita Ramos (Plaintiff)
Date: May 27, 2022Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: April 25, 2019Complaint
Date: April 25, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 25, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: April 25, 2019PI General Order
Date: April 29, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: June 13, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: June 17, 2019Answer
Date: July 19, 2019Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: July 23, 2019Cross-Complaint
Date: July 23, 2019Answer
Date: July 23, 2019Demand for Jury Trial
Date: July 23, 2019Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: August 22, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 14, 2019Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL
Date: January 24, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: October 02, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: April 01, 2020Answer
Date: May 11, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: August 05, 2020Motion for Trial Preference
Date: September 18, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PAUL CARRON
Date: September 23, 2020Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: September 23, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANT CONSOLIDATED PROPERTY SERVICES, INC.'S EX PARTE APP...)
Date: September 24, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: September 25, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: September 28, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT
Date: September 28, 2020Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: October 08, 2020Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: October 09, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: October 22, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: October 22, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: October 22, 2020Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: October 22, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE)
Date: October 23, 2020Answer
Date: November 06, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: November 06, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: November 24, 2020Answer
Date: November 24, 2020Association of Attorney
Date: January 04, 2021Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: November 25, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: November 25, 2020Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: December 04, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: December 07, 2020Answer
Date: December 09, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (SAMUEL KHACHERYAN'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCI...)
Date: December 07, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: December 14, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: December 15, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANT SAMUEL KHACHERYAN'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)
Date: December 15, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: December 28, 2020Offer to Compromise and Acceptance Under Code of Civil Procedure Section 998
Date: February 18, 2021Answer
Date: February 24, 2021Separate Statement
Date: February 25, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL IME
Date: February 25, 2021Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL IME
Date: February 25, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANT/CROSS-DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT CONSOLIDATED PROP...)
Date: February 26, 2021Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: March 01, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: March 04, 2021Opposition to Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: March 15, 2021Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO DECLARATIONS
Date: March 15, 2021Separate Statement
Date: March 19, 2021Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: March 19, 2021Motion to Quash
Date: March 19, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: March 29, 2021Separate Statement
Date: April 06, 2021Answer
Date: April 12, 2021Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH
Date: April 20, 2021Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISCOVERY IN DISPUTE
Date: April 30, 2021Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: April 21, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF DR. VIRGINIA ZUVERZA-CHAVARRIA, PHD, ABPP-CN
Date: April 30, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF DR. THOMAS L. HEDGE, JR, MD
Date: April 30, 2021Proof of Service by Mail - NOTICE OF PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: April 30, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF DR. JUAN CARLOS JIMENEZ, MD, MBA, FACS
Date: April 30, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF DR. ALAN W. WEINBERGER, M.D.
Date: April 30, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF DR. CHARLES H. CHOE, MD
Date: April 30, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SONIE M. GOLDEN
Date: May 10, 2021Notice of Ruling; Filed by: SAMUEL KHACHERYAN DBA BRADS CARPET AND TRUE WORD (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: SAMUEL KHACHERYAN DBA BRADS CARPET AND TRUE WORD (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Declaration OF DR. JUAN CARLOS JIMENEZ, MD, MBA, FACS; Filed by: LB Property Management (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Margarita Ramos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: John T. Hayden (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Consolidated Property Services, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: SAMUEL KHACHERYAN DBA BRADS CARPET AND TRUE WORD (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: John T. Hayden (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Declaration OF DR. CHARLES H. CHOE, MD; Filed by: LB Property Management (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Margarita Ramos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Declaration Declaration in support of Motion to Compel IME; Filed by: LB Property Management (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Margarita Ramos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Quash; Filed by: Margarita Ramos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Consolidated Property Services, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: SAMUEL KHACHERYAN DBA BRADS CARPET AND TRUE WORD (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of JR in Support of Motion for GFS; Filed by: LB Property Management (Defendant)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Declaration OF DR. ALAN W. WEINBERGER, M.D. Filed by: LB Property Management (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: May 18, 2021Motion to Vacate - MOTION TO VACATE TRIAL PREFERENCE
Date: May 10, 2021Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: May 20, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL
Date: May 20, 2021Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: May 20, 2021Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: May 24, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: May 24, 2021Proof of Service Not Plaintiff’s / Defendant’s Claim
Date: May 24, 2021Reply - REPLY REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO VACATE
Date: May 26, 2021Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: June 01, 2021Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: June 02, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JR IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR GFS
Date: June 03, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: June 14, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: July 21, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: January 19, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH A. HERNANDEZ RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL
Date: February 14, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: January 26, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: February 17, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: February 18, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: March 08, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: March 29, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: April 01, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: April 01, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: April 27, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: April 28, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: May 27, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: May 27, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: May 27, 2022Complaint
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Motion for Trial Preference
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application (of David Lee in Support of Ex parte Application)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant Consolidated Property Services, Inc.'s Ex Parte App...))
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Defendant Samuel Khacheryan's Ex Parte Application for an Ord...) of )
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Declaration (OF DR. THOMAS L. HEDGE, JR, MD)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of JR in Support of Motion for GFS)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Samuel Khacheryan's Ex Parte Application for an Order Advanci...))
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (on Motion to Set Aside Order Granting Trial Preference)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant/Cross-Defendant/Cross-Complainant Consolidated Prop...))
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (on Ex parte Application)
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Proof of Service
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant and Cross-Defendant, Consolidated Property Services...))
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Declaration (OF DR. CHARLES H. CHOE, MD)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Declaration (OF DR. VIRGINIA ZUVERZA-CHAVARRIA, PhD, ABPP-CN)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Sandra Guerra, CSR #10977)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Paul Carron)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial and All Related Trial Dates)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration in support of Motion to Compel IME)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Objection (Defendant's Objection to Declarations)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time...))
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF DR. SANDRA ARROYO, PSY.D., PSYCHOLOGIST)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant LB Property Management's Motion to Compel to Compel...))
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for An Order Advancing Hearings On Motions to Compel)
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Opposition to Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant Samuel Khacheryan dba Brads Carpet and True Word's ...))
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Opposition)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-12-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Sandra Guerra, CSR #10977)
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Sonie M. Golden)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL)
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Motion re: (Setting Aside Court's November 30, 2020 Order Granting Setting Preference.)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant LB Property Management's Ex Parte Application for O...))
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Plaintiff's Motion for Trial Preference))
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Advance the Hearing Date and Shorten Time for Hearing of Motion)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00Offer to Compromise and Acceptance Under Code of Civil Procedure Section 998
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant, Cross-Defendant, and Cross-Complainant Samuel Khac...))
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff's Reply to Joint Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Trial Setting Preference)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Declaration (OF Jodi C. Rosner in Support of Defendant's Ex parte Application)
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Granting the Motion to Vacate Trial Preference)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: Margarita Ramos (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Marco Neilly, CSR #13564)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Proof of Service Not Plaintiff?s / Defendant?s Claim
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Sandra Guerra, CSR #10977)
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Cross-Defendant/Defendant Consolidated Property Services, Inc...))
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Separate Statement (of Discovery in Dispute)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Motion to Compel IME of the Plaintiff;)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and ...))
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Declaration re: Due Diligence (Declaration of Reasonable Diligence)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant LB Property Management's Ex Parte Application for a...))
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Heather Pitovec, CSR #10551)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) (ROE 30)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant/Cross-Defendant/Cross-Complainant Consolidated Prop...))
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING PLAIN...))
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Declaration (OF DR. ALAN W. WEINBERGER, M.D.)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00Reply (REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO VACATE)
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant Samuel Khacheryan's Motion to Continue Trial))
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (at Ex parte application)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (on Ex parte Application)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application (of Jodi C. Rosner)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (on Plaintiff's Motion to Quash)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Declaration (OF DR. JUAN CARLOS JIMENEZ, MD, MBA, FACS)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant Samuel Khacheryan's Ex Parte Application for an Ord...))
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Motion to Vacate (Order for Trial Preference and Set Case Management Conference)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for ORder Seeking Clarificat...))
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (on Defendant's Ex parte Application)
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement ...))
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (on Ex parte Application)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Declaration (of Elizabeth A. Hernandez Re Order to Show Cause Re Dismissal)
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Deanna Z. Haaker, CSR #10309)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Notice (OF ASSIGNMENT OF TRIAL ATTORNEY)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Order Continuing Trial a...))
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant, Cross-Defendant and Cross-Complainant Samuel Khach...))
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2022-04-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AT EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: June 14, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: June 15, 2021Answer
Date: June 17, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: August 04, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF TRIAL ATTORNEY
Date: October 25, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL A...)
Date: November 15, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: December 30, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: November 15, 2021Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: December 30, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application (of David Lee in Support of Ex parte Application)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant and Cross-Defendant, Consolidated Property Services...))
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial and All Related Trial Dates)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant Consolidated Property Services, Inc.'s Ex Parte App...))
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Paul Carron)
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff's Reply to Joint Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Trial Setting Preference)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Declaration re: Due Diligence (Declaration of Reasonable Diligence)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Plaintiff's Motion for Trial Preference))
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Samuel Khacheryan's Ex Parte Application for an Order Advanci...))
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant Samuel Khacheryan's Motion to Continue Trial))
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Motion re: (Setting Aside Court's November 30, 2020 Order Granting Setting Preference.)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration in support of Motion to Compel IME)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Motion to Compel IME of the Plaintiff;)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant/Cross-Defendant/Cross-Complainant Consolidated Prop...))
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application (of Jodi C. Rosner)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (on Motion to Set Aside Order Granting Trial Preference)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant LB Property Management's Ex Parte Application for a...))
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant/Cross-Defendant/Cross-Complainant Consolidated Prop...))
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Objection (Defendant's Objection to Declarations)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-03-19T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Marco Neilly, CSR #13564)
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Cross-Defendant/Defendant Consolidated Property Services, Inc...))
Date: 2021-03-26T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of JR in Support of Motion for GFS)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Opposition)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for ORder Seeking Clarificat...))
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (at Ex parte application)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Heather Pitovec, CSR #10551)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement ...))
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant, Cross-Defendant and Cross-Complainant Samuel Khach...))
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Deanna Z. Haaker, CSR #10309)
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Order Continuing Trial a...))
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Notice (OF ASSIGNMENT OF TRIAL ATTORNEY)
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: 2021-12-30T00:00:00Declaration (of Elizabeth A. Hernandez Re Order to Show Cause Re Dismissal)
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Sandra Guerra, CSR #10977)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant LB Property Management's Motion to Compel to Compel...))
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and ...))
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (on Plaintiff's Motion to Quash)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Declaration (OF DR. ALAN W. WEINBERGER, M.D.)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Declaration (OF DR. CHARLES H. CHOE, MD)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Declaration (OF DR. THOMAS L. HEDGE, JR, MD)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Separate Statement (of Discovery in Dispute)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Declaration (OF DR. JUAN CARLOS JIMENEZ, MD, MBA, FACS)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Declaration (OF DR. VIRGINIA ZUVERZA-CHAVARRIA, PhD, ABPP-CN)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF DR. SANDRA ARROYO, PSY.D., PSYCHOLOGIST)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Motion to Vacate (Order for Trial Preference and Set Case Management Conference)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING PLAIN...))
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Sonie M. Golden)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) (ROE 30)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant Samuel Khacheryan's Ex Parte Application for an Ord...))
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (on Ex parte Application)
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL)
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (on Ex parte Application)
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for An Order Advancing Hearings On Motions to Compel)
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Declaration (OF Jodi C. Rosner in Support of Defendant's Ex parte Application)
Date: 2021-05-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant LB Property Management's Ex Parte Application for O...))
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Reply (REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO VACATE)
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Sandra Guerra, CSR #10977)
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant Samuel Khacheryan dba Brads Carpet and True Word's ...))
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Advance the Hearing Date and Shorten Time for Hearing of Motion)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (on Ex parte Application)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Sandra Guerra, CSR #10977)
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Granting the Motion to Vacate Trial Preference)
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Defendant, Cross-Defendant, and Cross-Complainant Samuel Khac...))
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time...))
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (on Defendant's Ex parte Application)
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Motion to Vacate (TO VACATE ORDER FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE AND SET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE;)
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-04-21T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Motion to Compel IME Of The Plaintiff;)
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-10-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.