Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Quintero Maria Barajas, Quintero Oscar, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mikhov Steve B, against Kia Motors America Inc., represented by Chinery Jacqueline Bruce, Mashburn Michael, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with John P. Doyle presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management91 days |
|
Filing DateApril 17, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions69 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Motion in Limine No. 12; Filed by: MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 8; Filed by: MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling RE: TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE; Filed by: KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 2; Filed by: MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 4; Filed by: MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 6; Filed by: MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 5; Filed by: MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 1; Filed by: MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 3; Filed by: MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Declaration re: Attorney's Fees; Filed by: MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-27T00:00:00Court's Ruling Motion for Attorney's Fees; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-07-20T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter; Filed by:
Date: 2023-07-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: July 21, 2023Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: April 17, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 17, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: April 17, 2019Complaint
Date: April 17, 2019Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: April 18, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: April 18, 2019Demand for Jury Trial
Date: May 07, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: May 07, 2019Motion re: - MOTION RE: TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS’ COMPLAINT
Date: May 23, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: May 23, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: June 12, 2019Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: June 25, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: July 02, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: July 15, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: August 19, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: August 23, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE))
Date: September 09, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: September 10, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: December 05, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE))
Date: December 16, 2019Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: December 18, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEFENDANT KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC.'S DEMURRER - WI...)
Date: December 18, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT
Date: January 08, 2020Separate Statement
Date: January 10, 2020Answer
Date: January 14, 2020Separate Statement
Date: April 22, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: March 12, 2020Separate Statement
Date: March 06, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: July 16, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING(S))
Date: March 23, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE)
Date: April 23, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: August 03, 2020Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: July 31, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: September 24, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: December 17, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE))
Date: October 13, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE))
Date: March 02, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE))
Date: March 16, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: April 02, 2021Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: April 02, 2021Separate Statement
Date: April 02, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: April 06, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ERRATA
Date: April 06, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: June 02, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: June 17, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: July 16, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE))
Date: August 02, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: February 28, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: March 02, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: May 23, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: October 03, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: June 08, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: October 18, 2022Motion for Reconsideration
Date: November 23, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: November 23, 2022Request - REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
Date: January 05, 2023Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
Date: January 11, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE)
Date: January 06, 2023Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 11; Filed by: MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Continuance) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-07-14T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-27T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 9; Filed by: MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Continuance of Hearing(s)) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 7; Filed by: MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration; Filed by: MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-23T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 13; Filed by: MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 10; Filed by: MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE
Date: January 18, 2023Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: January 19, 2023Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7
Date: January 23, 2023Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5
Date: January 23, 2023Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10
Date: January 23, 2023Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 11
Date: January 23, 2023Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1
Date: January 23, 2023Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8
Date: January 23, 2023Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12
Date: January 23, 2023Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4
Date: January 23, 2023Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6
Date: January 23, 2023Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3
Date: January 23, 2023Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2
Date: January 23, 2023Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9
Date: January 24, 2023Opposition - OPPOSITION TO KIA'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7
Date: February 01, 2023Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO KIA'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8
Date: February 01, 2023Statement of the Case
Date: February 06, 2023Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS AND SPECIAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Date: February 06, 2023Trial Brief
Date: February 06, 2023Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST JOINT WITNESS LIST
Date: February 06, 2023Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER LIST OF STIPULATED FACTS
Date: February 06, 2023Witness List - JOINT WITNESS LIST
Date: February 06, 2023Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 13
Date: February 07, 2023Exhibit List
Date: February 07, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: February 14, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: August 27, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: September 22, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE; TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE))
Date: September 22, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: October 21, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: October 27, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 13, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE))
Date: February 18, 2022Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant's Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application Filed by KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st) Filed by MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Continuance) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of Hearing(s))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00amended complaint Filed by MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Complaint Filed by MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00Answer Filed by KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Continuance)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Notice ( of Entry of Judgement) Filed by MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant's Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Amended Complaint Filed by MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE STATUS CONFERENCE) Filed by MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; Trial Readiness Conference))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Summary Adjudication; Statu...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Errata) Filed by KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose); Hearing on Motion to Compel ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; Motion Hearing Setting Confer...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; OSC Re Why Sanctions of $500 ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT) Filed by MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication Filed by KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Readiness Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE: TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE) Filed by KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-18T00:00:00Motion for Reconsideration Filed by MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 10) Filed by MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 4) Filed by MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration; Trial Readiness Confer...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 9) Filed by MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 12) Filed by MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 2) Filed by MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 3) Filed by MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 7) Filed by MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 8) Filed by MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 5) Filed by MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 1) Filed by MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 11) Filed by MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 6) Filed by MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Amended Complaint (2nd)
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Notice ( of Case Management Conference and Order to Show Cause re Proof of Service)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Notice ( of Entry of Judgement)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant Kia Motors America, Inc.'s Demurrer - wi...))
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Continuance of Hearing(s)) of )
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00amended complaint
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Motion (to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Compaint)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant's Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP ...))
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose)))
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Motion re: (To Strike Portions Of Plaintiffs? Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant's Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP ...))
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Reply (In Support Of Its Demurrer To The Fourth And Fifth Causes Of Action Of Plaintiffs? Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Reply ( In Support of Its Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs? Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose)))
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of Hearing(s)))
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Continuance))
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose)))
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose); Hearing on Motion to Compel ...))
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2020-07-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; Motion Hearing Setting Confer...))
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose)))
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Errata)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Continuance) of )
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose)))
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; OSC Re Why Sanctions of $500 ...))
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 8 Of Defendant Kia America, Inc.: For Order Excluding Nhtsa Consent Order)
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose)))
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose)))
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; Trial Readiness Conference)))
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 7 Of Defendant Kia America, Inc.: For Order Prohibiting Golden Rule Argument)
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Summary Adjudication; Statu...))
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation And Protective Order ? Confidential Designation Only)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00Notice ( of Case Management Conference and Order to Show Cause re Proof of Service)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Reply (In Support Of Its Demurrer To The Fourth And Fifth Causes Of Action Of Plaintiffs? Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Motion re: (To Strike Portions Of Plaintiffs? Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Reply ( In Support of Its Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs? Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant's Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP ...))
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose)))
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant's Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP ...))
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Motion (to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Compaint)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Amended Complaint (2nd)
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose)))
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant Kia Motors America, Inc.'s Demurrer - wi...))
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Notice ( of Entry of Judgement)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Continuance of Hearing(s)) of 03/23/2020)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of Hearing(s)))
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Continuance) of 04/23/2020)
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Continuance))
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose); Hearing on Motion to Compel ...))
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; Trial Readiness Conference)))
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 8 Of Defendant Kia America, Inc.: For Order Excluding Nhtsa Consent Order)
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT)
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose)))
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; OSC Re Why Sanctions of $500 ...))
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 7 Of Defendant Kia America, Inc.: For Order Prohibiting Golden Rule Argument)
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose)))
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose)))
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation And Protective Order ? Confidential Designation Only)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose)))
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose; Motion Hearing Setting Confer...))
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Errata)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Summary Adjudication; Statu...))
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose)))
Date: 2021-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Continuance of Hearing(s)) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by MARIA BARAJAS QUINTERO (Plaintiff); OSCAR QUINTERO (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-16T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) Filed by KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant Kia Motors America, Inc.'s Demurrer - wi...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.