Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Dale Denver Thomas Iv Dba Residential Construction Co., Fabie Tile & Marble Inc. A California Corporation, L.A. Overhead Door Inc. A California Corporation, M & F Hardwood Floors Inc, Pacific Coast Ironworks Inc., (total of 7) See All filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Beto'S Drywall & Plaster Interior Finishes, Complete Plastering, Cooper River Holdings Inc. Dba Millennium Fire Protection, Dale Denver Thomas Iv Dba Residential Construction Co., Dobkap Enterprises Inc. Dba Atlas Swimming Pool Company, (total of 26) See All represented by Ainslie Adam Anthony, Barta Robert Marc, Cohen Adrienne Dee, Crossin Peter Hugh, Ebner Darren M., (total of 30) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica with Helen Zukin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHelen Zukin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management378 days |
Filing DateNovember 08, 2019 |
CategoryOther Professional Malpractice (Not Medical Or Legal) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: PBS Engineers, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order; Filed by: Heritage Woodworks, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re. Complex Civil Case Questionnaire;) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00On the Complaint filed by Michael Levine, et al. on , Default entered on , Vacated - .
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Complex Civil Case Questionnaire; Filed by: Denver Thomas Dale, IV (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Denver Thomas Dale, IV (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: L.A. Overhead Door, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: PBS Engineers, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Sure Light Electric, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: L.A. Overhead Door, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Denver Thomas Dale, IV (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT; Filed by: WMW, Inc., dba Weather Masters Waterproofing (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Declaration of M. Witt ISO Demurrer and Mot to Strike; Filed by: PBS Engineers, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Denver Thomas Dale, IV (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Heritage Woodworks, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: PBS Engineers, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Folger Roofing & Construction Company, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Rapid Duct Testing & Air Balancing, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: PBS Engineers, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: WMW, Inc., dba Weather Masters Waterproofing (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Rapid Duct Testing & Air Balancing, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order; Filed by: Rapid Duct Testing & Air Balancing, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Fabie Tile & Marble, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: PBS Engineers, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: E & J Lopez Plumbing, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: PBS Engineers, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Denver Thomas Dale, IV (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Denver Thomas Dale, IV (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Michael Levine (Plaintiff); Zorbey Ozdilek (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Continuance of Hearing) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: WMW, Inc., dba Weather Masters Waterproofing (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: Michael Levine (Plaintiff); Zorbey Ozdilek (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: WMW, Inc., dba Weather Masters Waterproofing (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Rapid Duct Testing & Air Balancing, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Beto's Drywall & Plaster Interior Finishes (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by: Ben McDonald (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: E&J Lopez Plumbing, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Rapid Duct Testing & Air Balancing, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Michael Levine (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Andrew Hollins (Attorney)
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Sure Light Electric, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Todd Skinner dba Concrete Plastering (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Todd Skinner dba Concrete Plastering (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matters) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Denver Thomas Dale, IV (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Denver Thomas Dale, IV (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-07-05T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: E & J Lopez Plumbing, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: PBS Engineers, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: WMW, Inc., dba Weather Masters Waterproofing (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Michael Levine (Plaintiff); Zorbey Ozdilek (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: L.A. Overhead Door, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Heritage Woodworks, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Todd Skinner dba Concrete Plastering (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Status Conference Statement; Filed by: E&J Lopez Plumbing, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: David Trumbull (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Rapid Duct Testing & Air Balancing, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00On the Complaint filed by Michael Levine, et al. on , Default entered on , Vacated - .
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: WMW, Inc., dba Weather Masters Waterproofing (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Denver Thomas Dale, IV (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Michael Levine (Plaintiff); Zorbey Ozdilek (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Rapid Duct Testing & Air Balancing, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Sure Light Electric, Inc., a California Corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: WESTCHESTER GLASS INC. (Defendant); As to: Denver Thomas Dale, IV (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: L.A. Overhead Door, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Sure Light Electric, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: WESTCHESTER GLASS INC. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Appearance; Filed by: E&J Lopez Plumbing, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Michael Levine (Plaintiff); Zorbey Ozdilek (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00Joinder; Filed by: L.A. Overhead Door, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-29T00:00:00On the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Michael Levine, et al. on , Default entered on , Vacated - .
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Richard G Somes (Attorney)
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Temperature Equipment Corporation, a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: M & F HARDWOOD FLOORS INC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2023-06-05T00:00:00Status Conference Statement; Filed by: E&J Lopez Plumbing, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-17T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: PBS Engineers, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6); Filed by: PBS Engineers, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-05-11T00:00:00Status Conference Statement; Filed by: E & J Lopez Plumbing, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-08T00:00:00Order Notice of Assignment of Cases for All Purposes; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Denver Thomas Dale, IV (Defendant)
Date: 2023-03-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Michael Levine (Plaintiff); Zorbey Ozdilek (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-07-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Michael Levine (Plaintiff); Zorbey Ozdilek (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: WMW, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Michael Levine (Plaintiff); Zorbey Ozdilek (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Michael Levine (Plaintiff); Zorbey Ozdilek (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: L.A. Overhead Door, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2023-05-24T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report; Filed by: Michael Levine (Plaintiff); Zorbey Ozdilek (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-09-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Denver Thomas Dale, IV (Cross-Complainant)
Date: October 04, 2023Case Management Statement; Filed by: Fabie Tile & Marble, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: E&J Lopez Plumbing, Inc. (Defendant); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2023-09-21T00:00:00Trial Preparation Order (Jury Trial); Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 05, 2023Department 207 at 9355 Burton Way, Beverly Hills, CA 90210
Date: 2022-02-24T00:00:00Department 207 at 9355 Burton Way, Beverly Hills, CA 90210
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: August 05, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: August 09, 2022Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: August 10, 2022Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: August 10, 2022Answer
Date: August 30, 2022Answer
Date: September 02, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) FILE...)
Date: September 06, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: September 12, 2022Answer
Date: September 15, 2022Answer
Date: September 16, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: September 19, 2022Answer
Date: September 28, 2022Order - ORDER PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL RELATED DATES
Date: November 29, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 01, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: December 01, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 20, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 28, 2022Answer
Date: March 06, 2023Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT
Date: March 06, 2023Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: March 06, 2023Cross-Complaint
Date: March 06, 2023Answer
Date: March 13, 2023Cross-Complaint
Date: March 13, 2023Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: March 29, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: April 03, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: MEDIATION AND DISCOVERY)
Date: April 04, 2023Notice of Change of Handling Attorney
Date: April 21, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 26, 2023Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: April 26, 2023Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: May 11, 2023Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND ALL TRIAL RELATED DATES
Date: May 15, 2023Answer
Date: May 19, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 24, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: May 24, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: May 25, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: June 02, 2023Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: June 05, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: June 05, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: MEDIATION AND DISCOVERY)
Date: June 07, 2023Complaint
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Objection (La Overhead Door Comp Any Incs Jeld wen V Superior Court Objection)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Dane H. Taylor)
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-01-09T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Demurring or Moving Party in Support of Automatic Extension)
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00First Amended Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Complex Civil Case Questionnaire
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-08-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Complex Civil Case Questionnaire;) of 08/10/2020)
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re. Complex Civil Case Questionnaire;))
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Order (to set aside default of Heritage Woodworks)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order)
Date: 2020-10-06T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (to Set Aside Default)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-29T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Order (Determining Settlement by Defendant L.a. Overhead Door, Inc. To Be in Good Faith)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Denver Thomas Dale, IV (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Michael Levine (Plaintiff); Zorbey Ozdilek (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: WMW, Inc., dba Weather Masters Waterproofing (Defendant)
Date: 2023-06-02T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Denver Thomas Dale, IV (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: PBS Engineers, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-07-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Sure Light Electric, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Denver Thomas Dale, IV (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Temperature Equipment Corporation, a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Michael Levine (Plaintiff); Zorbey Ozdilek (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: PBS Engineers, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike filed by Folge...)
Date: 2022-08-05T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Temre Fischer (Attorney)
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Temperature Equipment Corporation, a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Joinder; Filed by: L.A. Overhead Door, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Cross-Complaint; Filed by: WESTCHESTER GLASS INC. (Defendant); As to: Roes 1-100 (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: PBS Engineers, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-11-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability of Counsel)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Denver Dale's Demurrer to FAC)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant Denver Dale's Motion to Strike Portions of FAC)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Declaration (of M. Witt ISO Demurrer and Mot to Strike)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion - Other MOTION ...))
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (of First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Second amended Complaint
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (To Cross-Complainant Denver Thomas Dale IV's Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Joinder to Motion (Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00General Denial
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Order (determining settlement by defendant L.A. overhead door, inc. to be in good faith)
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Motion to Challenge the Good Faith of a Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00Notice (of Rescheduling Demurrer and Motion to Strike Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-06-07T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Chan Reader re : Motion to Strike as to 2nd Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00in Department M
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' First Ame...))
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00in Department M
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Rejection)
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-16T00:00:00Motion to Quash Service of Summons
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF BEN MCDONALD IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Defendant Folger Roofing's Motion to Compel PMK Deposition of RWFI)
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Plaintiffs' Objection to Reply Brief ISO Motion to Compel
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Order (Notice of Assignment of Cases for All Purposes)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...))
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendant Ben McDonald's Motion to Quash Summons)
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Reply (DEFENDANT BEN MCDONALDS REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS)
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons))
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of Hearing))
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Continuance of Hearing) of 11/19/2021)
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continued Demurrer)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Status Conference Statement
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Demurrer by Folger Roofing to SAC)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Demurrer by Rapid Duct Testing to SAC)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion to Strike portions of SAC by Temperature Equipment Control)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion to Strike portions of SAC by Rapid Duct Testing)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Notice of Joinder to Folger Roofing's Demurrer)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Demurrer by LA Overhead to SAC)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Reply (TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Reply (Reply in Support of Motion to Strike SAC)
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Reply (Reply in Support of Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Notice (that the Court has Calendared Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Reply (TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER)
Date: 2021-12-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Reply (REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSOTION TO THE NOTICE OF JOINDER TO FOLGER ROOFING AND CONSTRUCTION)
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs' opposition to Denver Dale's Motion to Strike Portions of the SAC)
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs' opposition to Denver Dale's Demurrer to the SAC)
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Reply (To Plaintiffs Opposition To Demurrer To Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Reply (To Plaintiffs Opposition To Motion To Strike Portions Of Second Amended Complaint)
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00in Department 207, Helen Zukin, Presiding
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00in Department 207, Helen Zukin, Presiding
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00in Department 207, Helen Zukin, Presiding
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference))
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00in Department M
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00in Department 207, Helen Zukin, Presiding
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Answer
Date: August 15, 2022Answer
Date: August 17, 2022General Denial
Date: August 17, 2022Answer
Date: August 18, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PBS ENGINEERS' DEMURRER TO THE 4TH AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: August 23, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 23, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 29, 2022Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION
Date: August 29, 2022Answer
Date: November 10, 2022Status Conference Statement
Date: November 08, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: MEDIATION)
Date: November 29, 2022Status Conference Statement
Date: March 17, 2023Notice of Appearance
Date: March 17, 2023Answer
Date: March 28, 2023Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Reply (Reply in support of Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Opposition (to Montalba Architect Defendants' Demurrer to SAC)
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs' Opposition to PBS Engineers' Demurrer to the SAC)
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs' Opposition to PBS Engineers' Motion to Strike Portions of the SAC)
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00in Department 207, Helen Zukin, Presiding
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00in Department 207, Helen Zukin, Presiding
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00in Department 207, Helen Zukin, Presiding
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Reply (PBS ENGINEERS, INC REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Rulings (after CMC and hearing on Motion for Protective Order))
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion for Protective ...))
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00in Department 207, Helen Zukin, Presiding
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00in Department 207, Helen Zukin, Presiding
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion...))
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Objection (Plaintiffs' Objections to PBS Engineers' Reply Briefs ISO Demurrer and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00in Department 207, Helen Zukin, Presiding
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion...))
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00in Department 207, Helen Zukin, Presiding
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00in Department 207, Helen Zukin, Presiding
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00in Department 207, Helen Zukin, Presiding
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00in Department 207, Helen Zukin, Presiding
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL (postage due, uneven thickness)
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 01/28/2022)
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00in Department 207, Helen Zukin, Presiding
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2022-01-28T00:00:00in Department 207, Helen Zukin, Presiding
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Denver Thomas Dale's Opposition to Demurrer)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00in Department 207, Helen Zukin, Presiding
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Order ([Proposed] Case Management Order)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00in Department 207, Helen Zukin, Presiding
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-11-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Reply (BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Demurring Party Regarding Meet and Confer)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Reply (Defendant Denver Thomas Dale IV dba Residential Construction Co.'s reply)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-02-19T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.