Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Block Wendy O., Wendy O. Block Trustee Of The Wendy O. Block Living Trust Dated August 17 2015;, So. Cal. Custom Construction & Design Inc. A California Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lisnow Robert, Muller Olaf J, against Block Wendy O., Wendy O. Block Trustee Of The Wendy O. Block Living Trust Dated August 17 2015;, represented by Trembley Christopher, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica with Elaine W. Mandel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElaine W. Mandel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management180 days |
Filing DateJuly 17, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions239 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Wendy O. Block (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Wendy O. Block (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Wendy O. Block (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Reply Reply of Defendant in Support of Demurrer to Complaint; Filed by: Wendy O. Block (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: July 17, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: July 17, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: July 17, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: July 17, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: January 13, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: December 27, 2019Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: January 23, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 23, 2020Objection - OBJECTION EVIDENTIARY TO DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER K. TREMBLEY
Date: February 18, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF DEMURRER WITH POINTS AND AUTHORITIES
Date: February 18, 2020Reply - REPLY REPLY OF DEFENDANT IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Date: March 05, 2020Answer
Date: April 01, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: April 01, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: April 01, 2020Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS
Date: April 23, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: April 23, 2020Association of Attorney
Date: April 29, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: May 01, 2020Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)
Date: May 01, 2020Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: June 08, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF MOTION TO STRIKE AND MOTION
Date: June 08, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: June 08, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: September 16, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 18, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: September 18, 2020Notice - NOTICE TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE CROSSCOMPLAINT
Date: September 18, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE CROSSCOMPLAINT
Date: September 18, 2020Notice - NOTICE JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT
Date: September 22, 2020Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE (SLAPP)
Date: September 24, 2020Reply - REPLY OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER
Date: September 24, 2020Unknown - AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: October 13, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: November 12, 2020Notice of Settlement
Date: December 04, 2020Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: February 05, 2021Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: April 14, 2021Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Reply (Reply of Defendant in Support of Demurrer to Complaint)
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff Demurrer with Points and Authorities)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - without Mot...))
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Objection (Evidentiary to Declaration of Christopher K. Trembley)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-12-27T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: April 14, 2021Amended Cross-Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Opposition (TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE CROSSCOMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Special Motion to Strike (SLAPP))
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Notice (Joint Status Conference Report)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing on Motion to Strike Portions of Cross Complaint CCP 425.15-Anti Slapp)
Date: 2020-05-06T00:00:00Reply (Opposition to Demurrer)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Reply (of Opposition to Motion to Strike)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Notice (of Motion to Strike and Motion)
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Notice (TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE CROSSCOMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 11/12/2020)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Notice (of Errata by Cross Defendant on its Notice of Special Motion to Strike CCP 425.16 Anti Slapp)
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-06-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...))
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2020-12-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.