Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Santner John, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Cox Wayne, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Inglewood with Ronald F. Frank presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonald F. Frank Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2019 |
CategorySmall Claims (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseInglewood |
Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 29, 2020Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 29, 2020Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: June 14, 2019Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy) - Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: September 25, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: October 17, 2019Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/17/2019
Date: October 17, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: March 05, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 03/26/2020
Date: March 26, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)
Date: March 26, 2020Notice (name extension) - Notice Of Bankruptcy stay and Bankruptcy Discharge
Date: April 13, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 04/22/2020
Date: April 22, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)
Date: April 22, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/29/2020
Date: December 29, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)
Date: December 29, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: December 29, 2020Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)
Date: July 09, 2020Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/14/2019; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 04/22/2020; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 03/26/2020; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/05/2020; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/17/2019; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 07/09/2020; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 05/27/2020; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.