Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Timed Out Llc, Timed Out Llc A California Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Casas Joseph, Gruft Alexander T, against C.V. Holdings Inc. A California Corporation Dba Azul Ultra Lounge, C.V. Holdings Inc. Dba Azul Ultra Lounge, represented by Griffin John T., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Glendale Courthouse with Ralph C. Hofer presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management223 days |
|
Filing DateMarch 22, 2019 |
CategoryOther Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage Tort (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseGlendale Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 22, 2019Complaint
Date: March 22, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: March 22, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: March 22, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: March 25, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: May 14, 2019Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: March 25, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: June 11, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: August 02, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL
Date: July 10, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: August 22, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: August 30, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION FOR AUTOMATIC 30 DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING
Date: September 12, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: October 16, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: October 30, 2019Answer
Date: October 30, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: October 31, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: MEDIATION AND DISCOVERY)
Date: February 05, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: April 06, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: MEDIATION AND DISCOVERY)
Date: July 01, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: MEDIATION AND DISCOVERY)
Date: January 13, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF FUTURE HEARINGS AND NEW TRIAL DATE
Date: March 17, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: TIMED OUT, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: C.V. HOLDINGS, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: TIMED OUT, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: C.V. HOLDINGS, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: TIMED OUT, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Amended Complaint; Filed by: TIMED OUT, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: C.V. HOLDINGS, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: TIMED OUT, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of , Trial {Preparation Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: TIMED OUT, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by TIMED OUT, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Mandatory Settlement Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by TIMED OUT, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by TIMED OUT, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of , Trial {Preparation Order) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Mediation and Discovery)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause re: Failure to Comply with Trial Court De...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by TIMED OUT, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by TIMED OUT, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Complaint Filed by TIMED OUT, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Mediation and Discovery)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Answer Filed by C.V. HOLDINGS, INC., a California corporation dba Azul Ultra Lounge (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by TIMED OUT, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Mediation and Discovery)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Notice (Of Association of Counsel)
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause re: Failure to Comply with Trial Court De...))
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Mediation and Discovery))
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Mediation and Discovery))
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (To Continue Trial)
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Striking Portions of Plaintiff Timed Out, LLC's First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re: Mediation and Discovery))
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER ? CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION)
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Declaration (For Automatic 30 Day Extension Of Time To File Responsive Pleading)
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 10/31/2019, Trial {Preparation Order)
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.