Case Last Refreshed: 17 hours ago
Alexander Charles, Henry Mulak, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Steven Marcus Tindall, against Varsity Tutors, Llc, represented by Guillermo Marquez Tello, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Superior with Patricia M. Lucas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatricia M. Lucas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 01, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a first amended complaint filed in the Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara. The plaintiff, Henry Mulak, is a resident and citizen of California who was employed by Varsity Tutors LLC, a Missouri limited liability com...
Conference: Case Management
Date: August 13, 2019Conference: Further Case Management
Date: January 21, 2020Conference: Case Progress
Date: June 17, 2020Motion: Stay
Date: August 07, 2020Opposition/Objections
Date: September 13, 2023Response/Reply
Date: September 13, 2023Appendix
Date: September 13, 2023Declaration: In Opposition
Date: September 13, 2023Declaration: In Opposition
Date: September 13, 2023Opposition/Objections
Date: October 04, 2023Declaration: In Opposition
Date: September 13, 2023Errata
Date: October 02, 2023Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: February 16, 2024Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: October 13, 2023Response/Reply
Date: October 04, 2023Response/Reply
Date: October 04, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: October 16, 2023Notice
Date: March 22, 2024Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: March 15, 2024Declaration: In Opposition
Date: September 13, 2023Separate Statement
Date: September 13, 2023Response/Reply
Date: October 04, 2023Notice: Settlement
Date: October 16, 2023Notice
Date: February 23, 2024Opposition/Objections
Date: September 13, 2023Response/Reply
Date: October 04, 2023Request
Date: October 10, 2023Minute Order
Date: October 18, 2023Notice
Date: October 16, 2023Minute Order
Date: February 21, 2024Minute Order
Date: March 20, 2024Declaration: In Support
Date: October 16, 2023Answer: Amended Complaint
Date: July 15, 2019Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee
Date: May 30, 2019Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: May 01, 2019Order
Date: August 18, 2020Objection: Evidence
Date: September 13, 2023Opposition/Objections
Date: September 13, 2023Notice
Date: August 09, 2022Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: December 02, 2022Notice
Date: March 27, 2023Memorandum of Costs
Date: October 06, 2022Minute Order
Date: November 10, 2021Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 04, 2021Minute Order
Date: May 10, 2023Minute Order
Date: August 03, 2022Notice
Date: September 07, 2022Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 04, 2023Minute Order
Date: July 28, 2021Notice
Date: December 14, 2022Notice
Date: January 28, 2022Notice
Date: December 12, 2022Minute Order
Date: December 08, 2022Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: April 03, 2023Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 29, 2022Notice: Change Address/Firm Name
Date: May 20, 2022Notice
Date: August 09, 2022Notice
Date: July 29, 2021Notice
Date: April 04, 2023Notice
Date: November 15, 2021Notice
Date: May 15, 2023Notice: Appearance
Date: May 04, 2023Proof of Service
Date: July 24, 2023Declaration
Date: August 02, 2023Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: August 02, 2023Motion: Summary Judgment
Date: August 02, 2023Declaration
Date: August 02, 2023Motion: Summary Judgment
Date: August 02, 2023Request
Date: August 02, 2023Declaration
Date: August 02, 2023Appendix
Date: August 03, 2023Errata
Date: August 03, 2023Appendix
Date: August 03, 2023Appendix
Date: August 03, 2023Separate Statement
Date: August 02, 2023Appendix
Date: August 03, 2023Appendix
Date: August 03, 2023Exhibit List (Party)
Date: August 02, 2023Request: Judicial Notice
Date: August 02, 2023Appendix
Date: August 03, 2023Declaration: In Support
Date: August 02, 2023Declaration: In Support
Date: August 02, 2023Separate Statement
Date: August 02, 2023Letter Received
Date: August 11, 2023Proof of Service
Date: August 31, 2023Declaration: In Support
Date: August 31, 2023Separate Statement
Date: August 31, 2023Notice
Date: September 06, 2023Notice
Date: September 05, 2023Errata
Date: September 12, 2023Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: January 06, 2020Minute Order
Date: January 21, 2020Minute Order
Date: August 13, 2019Motion: Stay
Date: July 01, 2020Stipulation and Order
Date: June 19, 2020Order
Date: January 27, 2020Order
Date: August 07, 2020Minute Order
Date: August 07, 2020Order
Date: January 27, 2020Response/Reply
Date: July 17, 2020Stipulation
Date: January 06, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 30, 2019Stipulation and Order
Date: August 13, 2020Stipulation and Order
Date: August 13, 2020Opposition/Objections
Date: July 10, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Further CMC set for 7/24/24 at 2:30pm in D19 |
|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Joint Case Management Conference Statement |
|
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Further CMC set for 3/20/24 at 2:30pm in D19 |
|
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Joint Case Management Statement |
|
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application Varsity Tutors LLC's Ex Parte Application for Order Striking Plaintiff's Expert Report submitted ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to MSJ/MSADJ |
|
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order: Proposed PROPOSED Order Granting Varsity Tutors LLC's Ex Parte Application for Order Striking Plaintiff's Expert Report submitted ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to MSJ/MSADJ |
|
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice: Settlement Plaintiff's Notice of Conditional Settlement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.