Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
On, Barbara, On, Omar Jay, filed a(n) Civil case against Richey, Donald F, Stephen A Vannucci, Md, Inc, represented by Glynn, Clement Leo, Rapp, Adam Michael, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Sandra L. McLean presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandra L. McLean Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions44 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time226 days |
Response - No Fee
Date: January 13, 2020Objection - No Fee
Date: February 07, 2020Notice
Date: January 28, 2020Declaration
Date: January 21, 2020Order of Examination
Date: July 22, 2020Application and Order for Exam-Judgment Debtor
Date: February 25, 2020Memorandum
Date: February 03, 2020Response - No Fee
Date: February 03, 2020Reply
Date: January 21, 2020Letter(s) Submitted to Court
Date: February 06, 2020Reply
Date: February 10, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: July 29, 2020Declaration
Date: July 29, 2020Stipulation - No Fee
Date: August 11, 2020Motion - Fee
Date: September 17, 2020Order
Date: September 15, 2020Opposition - No Fee
Date: August 20, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: September 17, 2020Memorandum
Date: February 03, 2020Application and Order for Exam-Judgment Debtor
Date: February 27, 2020Notice
Date: February 10, 2020Declaration
Date: May 04, 2020Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment
Date: March 12, 2020Reply
Date: May 13, 2020First Paper - Unlimited Civil
Date: May 04, 2020Motion - Fee
Date: March 27, 2020Memorandum of Costs
Date: March 05, 2020Opposition - No Fee
Date: May 06, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: March 27, 2020Declaration
Date: May 06, 2020Declaration
Date: March 27, 2020Ruling on Disqualification - Peremptory Challenge CCP 170.6
Date: June 10, 2020Notice of Reassignment
Date: June 15, 2020Declaration
Date: June 04, 2020Objection - No Fee
Date: May 06, 2020Opposition - No Fee
Date: May 06, 2020Declaration
Date: May 07, 2020Opposition - No Fee
Date: May 07, 2020Motion - Fee
Date: September 18, 2020Motion hearings - Postdispo
Date: June 24, 2020Objection - No Fee
Date: May 06, 2020Declaration
Date: May 22, 2020Memorandum of Costs-Summary
Date: July 29, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: September 18, 2020Notice of Reassignment
Date: May 26, 2020Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: May 27, 2020Motion - Fee
Date: May 22, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling
Date: May 28, 2020Declaration
Date: May 13, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling
Date: September 21, 2020Declaration
Date: May 13, 2020Reply
Date: May 13, 2020Response - No Fee
Date: September 30, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling
Date: May 26, 2020Opposition - No Fee
Date: September 30, 2020Opposition - No Fee
Date: September 30, 2020Ruling on Disqualification - Peremptory Challenge CCP 170.6
Date: May 26, 2020Order of Examination
Date: June 17, 2020Reply
Date: October 06, 2020Motion hearings - Postdispo
Date: June 24, 2020Judgment
Date: February 13, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling
Date: August 21, 2020Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: September 02, 2020Declaration
Date: August 20, 2020Request
Date: May 11, 2020Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: May 20, 2020Declaration
Date: May 04, 2020Petition Hearing
Date: January 29, 2020Declaration
Date: September 17, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 27, 2020Declaration
Date: August 11, 2020Objection - No Fee
Date: September 16, 2020Declaration
Date: May 06, 2020Judgment
Date: August 17, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: May 07, 2020Petition Hearing
Date: February 05, 2020Judgment
Date: September 17, 2020Declaration
Date: May 07, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: July 29, 2020Declaration
Date: March 27, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling
Date: September 18, 2020Declaration
Date: September 30, 2020Declaration
Date: July 29, 2020Declaration
Date: May 13, 2020Petition - No Fee
Date: December 31, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: April 28, 2020Declaration
Date: May 13, 2020Motion hearings - Postdispo
Date: October 14, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling
Date: September 23, 2020Declaration
Date: September 18, 2020Letter(s) Submitted to Court
Date: August 21, 2020Other
Date: February 03, 2020Motion hearings - Postdispo
Date: October 14, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling
Date: February 21, 2020Judgment
Date: August 13, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Petitioners' Motion to Set Aside Judgment of Kafele T Hodari Motion hearings - Postdispo Petitioners' Motion to Set Aside and Vacate Judgment in Favor of Kafele T Hodari, MD, Inc Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration of W. David Corrick in Support of Petitioners' Motion to Set Aside and Vacate Judgment Motion hearings - Postdispo Petitioners' Motion to Set Aside and Vacate Judgment in Favor of F Paul Sajben, MD, Inc Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling Petitioners' motions to vacate the Judgments entered in favor of F. Paul Sajben, M.D., Inc. on 8/17/20 and in favor of Kafele T. Hodari, M.D., Inc. on 9/17/20 are denied. Petitioners have failed to meet their burden of proof that the Judgments are not final and conclusive as between the parties. Misik v. D'Arco (2011) 197 Cal. App. 4th 1065, 1071. Petitioners' argument that Misik is distinguished is not persuasive. Petitioners' argument that they may bring a separate action against the general partners is irrelevant. And even if the Judgments were vacated, the Court's Order denying the motion to amend the Judgment is a final, and appealable order. Petitioners' argument that the Bankruptcy trustee may seek to hold the general partners liable for the partnership debts is not before this Court, and is not grounds to set aside a Judgment based on a final, appealable Order. Sajben and Hodari shall each submit an Order consistent with this ruling. |
|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petitioners' Combined Reply Brief to Oppositions to Motion to Set Aside and Vacate Judgments as to Sajben and Hodari Reply |
|
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stephen A. Vannucci, M.D., Inc.'s Response in Support of Petitioners Omar Jay On and Barbara On's Motions to Set Aside and Vacate Judgments Response - No Fee |
|
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Kafele T. Hodari, MD, Inc's Opposition to Motion to Set Aside and Vacate Judgment in Favor of Kafele T Hodari, MD, Inc Opposition - No Fee |
|
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion to Set Aside and Vacate Judgment in Favor of F Paul Sajben MD Opposition - No Fee |
|
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Daniel M Poniatowski in Support of Kafele T Hodari, MD, Inc's Opposition to Motion to Set Aside and Vacate Judgment in Favor of Kafele T Hodari, MD, Inc Declaration |
|
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Kafele T Hodari, MD, Inc's Opposition to Motion to Set Aside and Vacate Judgment Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.