Case Last Refreshed: 4 weeks ago
Ebert, Tom, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Brereton, Bradford Charles, Brodsky, Sasha, Korte, Gabrielle Jan, Shahabi, Sasha, against American Abalone Farms, Inc., American Abalone Farms, Llc, Ho, James, Ocean Queen Usa, Inc., Xie, Henson, (total of 5) See All represented by Gumina, Paul Lewis, in the jurisdiction of Santa Cruz County. This case was filed in Santa Cruz County Superior Courts Superior with Volkmann, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVolkmann, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management218 days |
Filing DateDecember 10, 2019 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract / Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationSanta Cruz County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
I'm sorry, but I cannot see the text you provided. Could you please provide the text so that I can summarize it for you?
Plaintiff Tom Eberts Objection To Statement of Decision
Date: March 25, 2024Defendants Objections to Stmnt of Decision
Date: March 25, 20242024-2-26 CLOSING BRIEF
Date: February 27, 2024Defendants RJN for closing brief w exhibits
Date: February 26, 2024Defendants Closing Trial Brief Final
Date: February 26, 2024Notice of Remote App_Chung v. APLUS
Date: February 07, 2024Proposed Order
Date: February 25, 2022Stipulation for Order
Date: February 25, 2022CMC 030122
Date: March 01, 202203-01-22 CMC-signed
Date: March 01, 2022First Amended Complaint 030422
Date: March 05, 2022Summons 030422
Date: March 05, 2022POS 030422
Date: March 05, 202203-8-22 Notice Remote App.
Date: March 08, 2022Answer to FAC
Date: April 19, 2022Request for Entry of Default - Henson
Date: April 20, 2022042022 Decl. of Paul L. Gumina
Date: April 20, 2022POS - Henson Xie
Date: April 21, 2022Request for Default 04.21.22
Date: April 21, 2022062022 CMC Statement
Date: June 20, 2022Mediation Brief 062722
Date: June 27, 2022Defendants Amended Trial Brief
Date: November 28, 2023Defendants Opp to Ps MIL 8
Date: November 28, 2023Defendants Opp to Ps MIL 3
Date: November 28, 2023Defendants Opp to Ps MIL 7
Date: November 28, 2023Defendants Opp to Ps MIL 6
Date: November 28, 2023Defendants Opp to Ps MIL 4
Date: November 28, 2023Defendants Opp to Ps MIL 5
Date: November 28, 2023CMC Statement #19CV03672
Date: August 15, 2022081622 CMC-signed
Date: August 16, 2022Notice of Trial 08.30.22
Date: August 30, 2022Proposed Order
Date: March 07, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: March 07, 2023Decl iso Ex Parte App
Date: March 07, 2023PLG Dec Opp Ex Parte
Date: March 08, 2023Decl of SS iso Motion
Date: March 08, 2023NOM and MTC PMK of AAF
Date: March 08, 2023Decl of PLG in Opposition w Exhibits
Date: March 14, 2023Memo of Ps As in Opposition Final
Date: March 14, 2023Plaintiff Reply Brief
Date: March 14, 2023Decl of SS iso Plaintiff Reply Brief
Date: March 14, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance (RA-010)
Date: June 19, 2023Opposition to Remote Proceeding
Date: June 20, 2023Defendants Witness List
Date: June 28, 2023Defendants Exhibit List
Date: June 28, 2023Plaintiff Trial Exhibit List
Date: June 29, 2023Plaintiff Tom Eberts Witness List
Date: June 29, 2023Plaintiff Tom Ebert's trial Brief
Date: June 29, 2023Scan0811202315524001
Date: August 11, 2023DefendantsTrial Brief
Date: August 15, 2023DefendantsAmendedExhibitList
Date: August 15, 2023DefendantsOpp to Ps MIL Two
Date: August 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Receipt for Records/Exhibits. | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Remote Appearance by Parties | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Objection - No Fee Filed by: Plaintiff Ebert, Tom |
|
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Objection - No Fee Filed by: Defendant American Abalone Farms, LLC ; Defendant Ho, James; Defendant Ocean Queen USA, Inc. |
|
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Tom Eberts Objection To Statement of Decision | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Defendants Objections to Stmnt of Decision | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Order Filed | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Statement of Decision |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.