Case Last Refreshed: 18 hours ago
Callahan, Carter Randall, Cashel, Inc., Raja Development Co., Inc., filed a(n) Other Complaint (Not Spec) Unlimited (42) case represented by Willis, Geoffrey Keith, against Napa Sanitary District, represented by Pritikin, Kenneth Wayne, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts Superior with Victoria D. Wood presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 06, 2019 |
CategoryOther Complaint (Not Spec) Unlimited (42) |
Last RefreshedMay 02, 2024 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions109 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Notice of Entry of Amended Judgment
Date: April 25, 20242024.04.22 - Proposed Amended Judgment
Date: April 22, 2024Notice of Ruling
Date: April 16, 2024Notice Of Remote Appearance
Date: April 02, 202495133NOTIC000e86
Date: April 02, 202494731Objec01552e
Date: March 27, 202494731Reply0020f9
Date: March 27, 202494716REPLY013366
Date: March 26, 202494716OBJEC007f7e
Date: March 26, 2024Proof of Service re Oppo to Mtn for Atty Fees
Date: March 20, 2024RJN ISO Opp to Mtn for Atty Fees
Date: March 20, 2024Decl. of Turnipseed iso Oppo Mx for Atty Fees
Date: March 20, 2024Decl. of Damron iso Oppo to Mx for Atty Fees
Date: March 20, 2024County Defs Oppo to Mtn for Atty Fees
Date: March 20, 2024Carlisle Decl ISO Opp to Mtn for Atty Fees
Date: March 20, 2024Proof of Service re Oppo to Mtn to Tax Costs
Date: March 20, 2024RJN ISO Opp to Mtn to Tax Costs
Date: March 20, 2024Oppo to Mtn to Tax Costs
Date: March 20, 202492990Reque019ae7
Date: February 29, 202492990Motio00a227
Date: February 29, 202491675PLAIN00de86
Date: February 09, 2024Memorandum Of Costs and Worksheet
Date: January 23, 202489387Notic00e3d4
Date: January 04, 2024Ntc of Remote Appearance at MJOP
Date: January 03, 2024Notice Of Remote Appearance at MJOP
Date: December 15, 2023County Defs Reply iso MJOP
Date: December 14, 2023POS re County Defs Reply iso MJOP
Date: December 14, 202388026OPPOS0047b8
Date: December 08, 2023Napa's CM Statement for CMC on Feb. 28
Date: February 10, 202370839STIPU008951
Date: February 13, 202350 - CMC Statement
Date: February 20, 202351 - Mem. of Costs on Appeal
Date: February 21, 2023Napa CM Statement for CMC on May 2
Date: April 17, 2023Napa's Notice of Remote Appearance At CMC on May 2
Date: April 27, 202374884Notic00703c
Date: April 28, 202374883Notic00ec6e
Date: April 28, 2023Napa's Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees
Date: May 16, 202352 - Motion for Leave to File FAC
Date: August 03, 2023Stipulation and Proposed Order
Date: August 15, 2023Stipulation and Proposed Order
Date: August 17, 2023Notice of Change of Handling Attorney
Date: August 23, 202382008PROOF01815e
Date: September 02, 202382008DEFEN005ff7
Date: September 02, 202382009DEFEN009dee
Date: September 02, 2023Napa Notice of Ruling
Date: September 12, 202356 - Reply re Motion for Leave to File FAC
Date: September 13, 2023Answer to TAC
Date: October 02, 202357 - Request to Withdraw
Date: October 11, 202358 - Proposed Order re Request for Withdrawal
Date: October 11, 2023Napa CM Stmt for CMC on Nov. 14
Date: October 30, 202385779CaseM00c2c5
Date: November 01, 2023County Defs RJN ISO MJOP
Date: October 31, 202385763CaseM0050a6
Date: October 31, 2023Decl of Carlisle ISO MJOP
Date: October 31, 2023POS re County Defendants MJOP
Date: October 31, 2023County Defs Mot for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: October 31, 2023Proposed Order re MJOP
Date: October 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Amended Judgment | |
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event |
Judgment Amended Judgment |
|
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Amended Judgment | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | 2024.04.22 - Proposed Amended Judgment | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion ATTORNEY FEES Judge: Young, Scott R.L. |
|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to tax costs
Judge: Young, Scott R.L. |
|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Appearance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.